Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Cv - Circuit Court Civil case in the jurisdiction of Honolulu County. This case was filed in Honolulu County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 18, 2023 |
CategoryCv - Circuit Court Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHonolulu County, HI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of _______EFile Document upload of type Statement of | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed DocumentEFile Document upload of type Proposed Document | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice-SubmissionEFile Document upload of type Notice-Submission | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order** Re: #1 - Notice of Submission; Declaration of Counsel; Attachments 1- 3, filed on September 8, 2023 (Dkt. 45); #2 - Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Interlocutory Decree of Partition filed June 26, 2023, filed on September 8, 2023 (Dkt. 47); #3 - Proposed Order Denying Defendant Sheenah Sanchez's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed June 7, 2023, filed on September 8, 2023 (Dkt. 49); #4 - Proposed Judgment, filed on September 8, 2023 (Dkt. 51); and #5 - Proposed Stipulation Staying Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Interlocutory Decree of Partition filed June 26, 2023 Entered Concurrently Herewith; Order, filed September 8, 2023 (Dkt. 53) ** Minute Order 09/13/2023: The Court hereby strikes the following documents entitled: #1 - Notice of Submission; Declaration of Counsel; Attachments 1- 3, filed on September 8, 2023 (Dkt. 45); #2 - Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Interlocutory Decree of Partition filed June 26, 2023, filed on September 8, 2023 (Dkt. 47); #3 - Proposed Order Denying Defendant Sheenah Sanchez's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed June 7, 2023, filed on September 8, 2023 (Dkt. 49); #4 - Proposed Judgment, filed on September 8, 2023 (Dkt. 51); and #5 - Proposed Stipulation Staying Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Interlocutory Decree of Partition filed June 26, 2023 Entered Concurrently Herewith; Order, filed September 8, 2023 (Dkt. 53) for failure to comply with Rule 5.1 of the Hawaii Electronic Filing & Service Rules. Counsel shall amend and file the aforementioned documents in accordance with said rule. /s/ James H. Ashford ** A copy of this Minute Order was provided to the following via electronic filing or U.S. Postal Mail, postage prepaid: - Ronald P. Tongg, Esq. ** - Bosko Petricevic, Esq. | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed DocumentEFile Document upload of type Proposed Document | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed OrderEFile Document upload of type Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.