Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mclellen, Rhonda K, Ridnour, Robin D, Romine, Deborah Lynn, filed a(n) Aa- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, And H1) case represented by Mclaughlin, Daniel Toby, against Khalsa, Leon, represented by Clemmons, Amy Christina, in the jurisdiction of Bonner County. This case was filed in Bonner County Superior Courts with Jensen, Susie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2022 |
CategoryAa- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, And H1) |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBonner County, ID |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2024 |
Jury Trial 5 Days Judge: Jensen, Susie |
||
June 26, 2024 |
Pre-trial Conference (5 Day Jury Trial on 7-15-24) Judge: Jensen, Susie |
||
December 06, 2023 |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages: No Court Reporter Less Than 100 Pages Judge: Jensen, Susie |
||
December 06, 2023 |
Court Minutes Motion to Stay Pending Outcome of Appeal in Companion Case Judge: Jensen, Susie |
||
December 06, 2023 |
Motion Granted to Stay Case Judge: Jensen, Susie |
||
December 06, 2023 |
Motion to Stay Pending Outcome of Appeal in Companion Case In Person Judge: Jensen, Susie |
||
December 06, 2023 |
Motion to Stay Pending Outcome of Appeal in Companion Case Judge: Jensen, Susie |
||
December 04, 2023 |
Reply to Response to Motion for Stay of Proceeding Pending Outcome of Appeal in Companion Case (Plaintiffs') |
||
November 29, 2023 |
Declaration in Response to Motion to Stay |
||
November 29, 2023 |
Response to Motion to Stay Proceedings-Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.