Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Duane Craig,Sharon Craig , vs. River Valley Homes, LLC,Brandon Longhurst .
On November 17, 2022 an aa4 real property (more than $10,000) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bonneville County. Judge Whyte, Michael J. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 17, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 06, 2023
Filing Location
Bonneville County, ID
Judge
Category
AA4 Real Property (more than $10,000)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 1st setting Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Conference 1st setting Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 2nd Setting Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Conference 2nd Setting Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
September 12, 2023 |
Judgment of Dismissal
Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
||
September 12, 2023 |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
||
September 11, 2023 |
Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice |
||
September 07, 2023 | Notice of Vacating Hearing | ||
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Hearing |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing For Attorney Fees and Costs Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Vacating Hearing | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection to Memorandum of Costs and Attorneys' Fees |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Memorandum of Attorney Fees and Costs |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs & Attorney Fees | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Decision and Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions; Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration; Defendants'' Motion for Protective Order Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing for Sanctions, to Reconsider,and Protective Order Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection to Motion to Reconsider and Motion for Protective Order |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Brandon Longhurst in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum in Support of Objection to Motion to Reconsider and Motion for Protective Order |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Counsel in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Hearing |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice Vacating and Resetting Hearing |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Vacating Deposition |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel - in Opposition |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Reconsider and for a Protective Order |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum In Support of Motion to Reconsider and for a Protective Order |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion for Sanctions |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order, Notice of Trial Setting and Pretrial Order Amended Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum -Second |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Supplement to Memorandum Decision and Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Decision and Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Of Counsel In Opposition To Motion To Compel |
|
April 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Supplemental Discovery Responses | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing On Motion to Compel |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion to Compel |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order, Notice of Trial Setting and Pretrial Order
Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Deposition Duces Tecum |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Whyte, Michael J. |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service River Valley Homes, LLC |
|
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Brandon Longhurst |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Issue and Request for Trial Setting |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply to Counterclaim | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer and Counterclaim |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Intent to Take Default -River Valley Homes |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Intent to Take Default- Brandon Longhurst |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Take Default Brandon Longhurst |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Take Default River Valley Homes, LLC |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit / Return of Service Affidavit of Service (Longhurst) |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service (RVH) | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Another Summons Issued RVH |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Verified Complaint |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Another Summons Issued Longhurst |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued (RVH) |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | New Case - District Civil for Real Property | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued (Longhurst) |