Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Timothy Haderlie Petitioner, vs. Kelli Rasberry Respondent.
On March 27, 2023 a b1a- divorce with minor children case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Bonneville County. Judge Gauchay, Kent W. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 27, 2023
Last Refreshed
August 07, 2023
Filing Location
Bonneville County, ID
Judge
Category
B1a- Divorce With Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Protection Order Hearing
Judge: Gauchay, Kent W. |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit / Return of Service Return of Service - Civil |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
PO Order to Set or Reset Hearing
Judge: Gauchay, Kent W. |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Leave to Withdraw as Atty of Record
Judge: Gauchay, Kent W. |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing - Civil Respondent via zoom Motion for Temporary Orders Judge: Gauchay, Kent W. |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Emergency Ex Parte Temporary Orders Judge: Gauchay, Kent W. |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing - Civil Emergency Temporary Orders Judge: Gauchay, Kent W. |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Petitioner's Rule 401 Mandatory Disclosures |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion for Emergency Ex Parte Temporary Orders Judge: Gauchay, Kent W. |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Dustin Haderlie |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Kristopher D Meek |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for emergency temporary orders |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Temporary Order | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Dustin Haderlie |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion to Withdraw |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of non objection to respondent's motion to withdraw |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response to Petition for Divorce |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Family Law Case Information Sheet | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Report -Focus on Children - Defendant FTA - no response |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Report -Focus on Children-Plaintiff Appeared/Complied - zoom - 4/13/23 |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment and Acceptance of Service |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Divorce (With Minor Children) | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Attend Focus on Children | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Family Law Joint Temporary Restraining Order | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Family Law Case Information Sheet | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Motions for Temporary Orders |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | New Case - Divorce (With Minor Children) |