Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Labahn, Brittney, Labahn, Jeff, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Mccrea, Jordan, against Noble Homes And Construction, represented by Stenquist, Jon Allen, in the jurisdiction of Canyon County. This case was filed in Canyon County Superior Courts with Roker, Matthew J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategoryAa4 Real Property (More Than $10,000) |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCanyon County, ID |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Roker, Matthew J. |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Roker, Matthew J. |
|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Conference
Judge: Roker, Matthew J. |
|
October 23, 2023 |
Proposed Order Denied for Plaintiff's Fees, Costs, and Statutory Damages NO CERT Judge: Petty, Gene A. |
||
October 23, 2023 |
Decision or Opinion on Motion for Reconsiderations Judge: Roker, Matthew J. |
||
October 13, 2023 |
Scheduling Order
Judge: Roker, Matthew J. |
||
October 10, 2023 | Stipulation for Scheduling and Planning | ||
August 24, 2023 | Court Minutes | ||
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Disallow Fees and Costs - Defendant's | ZOOM | Judge: Roker, Matthew J. |
|
August 22, 2023 |
Reply Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Reconsideration and Motion to Disallow Fees and Costs - Defendant's |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.