Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
April Hamilton , vs. Walmart, INC, John/Jane Does I-X .
On March 09, 2023 an aa- all initial district court filings (not e, f, and h1) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Canyon County. Judge Courtney, Andrea presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 09, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2023
Filing Location
Canyon County, ID
Judge
Category
AA- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, and H1)
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Courtney, Andrea |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Conference
Judge: Courtney, Andrea |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Courtney, Andrea |
|
September 14, 2023 | Case Closed | ||
September 14, 2023 |
Dismissed with Prejudice
Judge: Wiebe, Susan E. |
||
September 13, 2023 |
Stipulation to Dismiss With Prejudice |
||
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service (Second Supplemental Responses)-Plaintiff |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance -Defendant |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Protective Order Judge: Courtney, Andrea |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Pretrial, Status Conference and Jury Trial Judge: Courtney, Andrea |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Protective Order |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance Walmart |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Courtney, Andrea |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Deadline Extension |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Scheduling and Planning |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation To Extend Discovery Deadline |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Scheduling Conference |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service - Plaintiff |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Discovery Requests (1st Set)-Plaintiff |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Discovery Requests -Walmart |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer To Amended Complaint And Demand For Jury Trial-Walmart |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance M. Muller for Walmart |
|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Acceptance of Service 03/17/23 Walmart, Inc. Sub-Served M. Muller |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Another Summons Issued | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed and Demand for Jury Trial |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | New Case - District Civil | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued |