Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cutler, Kenna Catherine, filed a(n) Aa- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, And H1) case represented by Wilkinson, Dennis Paul, against Holbrook, David Nathan, London Drug, represented by Sonnefeld, Donald Alvin, in the jurisdiction of Caribou County. This case was filed in Caribou County Superior Courts with Brown, Mitchell W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2023 |
CategoryAa- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, And H1) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCaribou County, ID |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Brown, Mitchell W. |
|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Brown, Mitchell W. |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing - Civil for Receiver Judge: (s) Brown, Mitchell W., Dunn, Stephen S. |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing will be held in Bannock County Judge: (s) Brown, Mitchell W., Dunn, Stephen S. |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion Cari Crane |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion Stacie Peterson |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum in Support of Objection to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment |
|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Response to Discovery Requests |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.