Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ryan Moss, Shabree Moss , vs. Innovative Homes of Idaho, LLC, Innovative Homes Properties, L.L.C., Innovative Home Properties, LLC, Pinnacle Homes, LLC, Zatelle Smith, Timothy Thomas .
On December 09, 2022 an aa- all initial district court filings (not e, f, and h1) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cassia County. Judge Tribe, Michael P. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 09, 2022
Last Refreshed
February 14, 2024
Filing Location
Cassia County, ID
Judge
Category
AA- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, and H1)
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2024 | Court Minutes | ||
February 13, 2024 |
Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs
Judge: Tribe, Michael P. |
||
February 13, 2024 |
Motion Granted For Attorney Fees Judge: Tribe, Michael P. |
||
January 10, 2024 |
Notice of Remote Hearing Memorandum of Fees and Costs |
||
December 04, 2023 | Memorandum of Costs & Attorney Fees | ||
December 04, 2023 |
Declaration of Counsel in Support of Memorandum of Fees and Costs |
||
November 07, 2023 |
Order re: Objection to Claim of Exemption |
||
November 06, 2023 | Court Minutes | ||
November 06, 2023 |
Oral Decision
Judge: Tribe, Michael P. |
||
October 31, 2023 | Notice of Remote Hearing | ||
October 31, 2023 | Court Minutes | ||
October 31, 2023 |
Objection to Claim of Exemption IN PERSON Judge: Tribe, Michael P. |
||
October 27, 2023 |
Declaration of Counsel |
||
October 27, 2023 |
Brief Filed Supplemental Brief in Support of Objection to the Claim of Exemption |
||
October 25, 2023 |
Subpoena Returned (ICCU) |
||
October 25, 2023 | Affidavit / Return of Service | ||
October 19, 2023 |
Order to Continue Hearing on Objection to the Claim of Exemption |
||
October 18, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
October 17, 2023 |
Objection to Claim of Exemption
Judge: Tribe, Michael P. |
||
October 17, 2023 | Court Minutes | ||
October 10, 2023 |
Subpoena for Records (ICCU) |
||
October 10, 2023 | Affidavit / Return of Service | ||
October 06, 2023 |
Notice of Remote Hearing Objection to the Claim of Exemption |
||
October 06, 2023 |
Objection to the Claim of Exemption |
||
October 06, 2023 | Claim of Exemption or Third Party Claim | ||
September 20, 2023 |
Writ %ICCU |
||
September 20, 2023 |
Order for Writ of Execution |
||
September 20, 2023 |
Writ Issued TFCSO |
||
September 19, 2023 |
Application for Writ of Execution |
||
September 19, 2023 |
Affidavit of Amount Due for Writ of Execution |
||
June 15, 2023 |
Notice of Unavailable/Available Dates ~Plaintiffs' |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Partial Judgment Or Opinion Filed (Default) |
||
May 31, 2023 |
Affidavit in Support of Default -Partial Judgment |
||
May 31, 2023 |
Order Re: Trial Scheduling |
||
May 31, 2023 |
Application for Entry of Default Partial Judgment |
||
May 05, 2023 |
Order Denying Motion to Set Aside Default |
||
May 02, 2023 | Court Minutes | ||
May 02, 2023 |
Motion Denied Re: To Set Aside Default Judge: Tribe, Michael P. |
||
May 02, 2023 |
Motion to Set Aside Default
Judge: Tribe, Michael P. |
||
April 25, 2023 |
Objection to Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default |
||
March 29, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
March 29, 2023 | Answer | ||
March 29, 2023 |
Memorandum In Support of Motion to Set Aside Default |
||
March 29, 2023 |
Motion to Set Aside Default |
||
March 29, 2023 | Civil Case Information Sheet | ||
March 29, 2023 | Notice of Appearance | ||
March 29, 2023 |
Affidavit in Support of Motion - Timothy A. Thomas |
||
March 27, 2023 | Default | ||
March 24, 2023 |
Declaration in Support of Motion ~Bren E. Mollerup) for Entry of Default |
||
March 24, 2023 | Motion for Entry of Default | ||
February 23, 2023 |
Summons Returned - Innovative Homes of Idaho, LLC |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Summons Returned Summons - Zatelle H. Smith |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Summons Returned Amended Summons - Timothy A. Thomas |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service - Innovative Home Properties, LLC |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Summons Returned - Innovative Homes Properties, LLC |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service - Innovative Homes of Idaho, LLC |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service - Timothy A. Thomas |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service - Zatelle H. Smith |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Summons Returned - Pinnacle Homes, LLC |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service - Pinnacle Homes, LLC |
||
February 23, 2023 |
Affidavit / Return of Service - Innovative Homes Properties,LLC |
||
February 02, 2023 | Summons | ||
February 02, 2023 |
Summons Issued Amended Timothy A. Thomas |
||
February 02, 2023 |
Summons Issued Amended- Zatelle H. Smith |
||
December 12, 2022 | Summons | ||
December 12, 2022 |
Summons Issued Innovative Home Properties, L.L.C. |
||
December 12, 2022 |
Summons Issued Innovative Homes of Idaho, LLC |
||
December 12, 2022 |
Summons Issued Pinnacle Homes, LLC |
||
December 12, 2022 |
Summons Issued Innovative Home Properties, LLC |
||
December 09, 2022 | New Case - District Civil | ||
December 09, 2022 | Civil Case Information Sheet | ||
December 09, 2022 | Complaint Filed |