Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MJD ENTERPRISES, LLC , vs. Roger and Virginai Haworth,Seth Russell,Robert and Toni Schaefer,Kenneth and Janet Fudge,Joe and Heidi Villegas .
On October 31, 2022 an aa4 real property (more than $10,000) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Clearwater County. Judge Green, Adam H. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 31, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2023
Filing Location
Clearwater County, ID
Judge
Category
AA4 Real Property (more than $10,000)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial - Civil
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
July 29, 2023 | Case Closed | ||
July 28, 2023 | Court Minutes | ||
July 27, 2023 |
Declaration of Mailing |
||
July 25, 2023 |
Order Allowing Attorney to Withdraw |
||
July 25, 2023 | Judgment of Dismissal | ||
July 25, 2023 |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages:
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
||
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Modification Hearing
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Before Trial Schaefer |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation to Dismiss Haworth 2 |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Before Trial Villegas |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Before Trial Haworth |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Before Trial Fudge |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Before Trial Russell |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Withdraw |
|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed Amended |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service of Discovery Requests Second Set |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Discovery Second Set |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order Amended |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages:
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Decision and Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing - Civil
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages:
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion of Carolyn Young (Reply) |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Mark Snyder |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Carolyn Young |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Motion | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Samuel T. Creason |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Kenneth Fudge |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion For Leave to Amend Complaint |
|
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Decision or Opinion Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages:
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Memorandum in Support |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum In Support of Motion | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion Irby |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion Snyder |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion Harper |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's for Summary Judgment |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion Shores |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion of Samuel T. Creason |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendants' for Summary Judgment |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion Alex Irby |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum In Support of Motion | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Service |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice of Remote Hearing |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Discovery Requests | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Discovery Requests | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Scheduling and Planning | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages:
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Discovery Requests | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Discovery Requests | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service of Discovery Requests | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint - Seth Russell |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued - Robert Schaefer & Toni Gibbs-Schaefer |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued - Seth Russell |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued - Kenneth and Janet Fudge |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | New Case - District Civil for Real Property | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued - Joe Villegas & Heidi Villegas |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued - Roger Haworth & Virginia Haworth |