Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Travis Price Petitioner, vs. Vanessa Ramsey Respondent.
On December 12, 2017 an a9- child support /custody (unless filed by dhw) case was filed by Price, Travis James, against Ramsey, Vanessa May, in the jurisdiction of Elmore County. Judge Fleming, Theodore presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 12, 2017
Last Refreshed
August 11, 2023
Filing Location
Elmore County, ID
Judge
Category
A9- Child Support /Custody (Unless filed by DHW)
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Child Support
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Disposition Entered | |
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Modification Hearing
Judge: Fleming, Theodore |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition Stipulation or Motion to Modify Decree of Divorce Verified Stipulation to Modify Paternity, Custody, Visition, and Support of a Minor |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Disposition Entered | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment and Decree | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Supplemental Custody Order | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Entry of Judgment and Decree |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer To Petitioner's Verified Motion to Establish Paternity, Custody, Visitation, and Support of Minor Child |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit / Return of Service | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Attend Focus on Children | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued | |
December 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition/Complaint for Paternity Verified Motion To Establish Paternity, Custody, Visitation, and Support of a Minor Child |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event | New Case - Child Support/Custody - Unless Filed by DHW |