Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, as subrogee of Larry D. Almeida , vs. Hayden Lake Sewer District, Northwest Line Builders, LLC .
On May 04, 2023 an aa- all initial district court filings (not e, f, and h1) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kootenai County. Judge Meyer, Cynthia K.C. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 04, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 06, 2023
Filing Location
Kootenai County, ID
Judge
Category
AA- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, and H1)
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 4 days Judge: Meyer, Cynthia K.C. |
|
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Conference
Judge: Meyer, Cynthia K.C. |
|
August 17, 2023 |
Order Memorandum Decision and Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss |
||
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Minutes 07/19/23 Motion to Dismiss Judge: Meyer, Cynthia K.C. |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss ZOOM-Brereton-30 min Judge: Meyer, Cynthia K.C. |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant Hayden Lake Sewer District's Motion to Dismiss |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Defendant Hayden Lake Sewer District, Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Christine L. Reinert | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Brereton-30 min Judge: Meyer, Cynthia K.C. |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference
Judge: Meyer, Cynthia K.C. |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Protective Order Brereton-30 min Judge: Meyer, Cynthia K.C. |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Mediation | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Notice of Trial and Pretrial Conference Setting and Pretrial Order |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Northwest Line Builders Scheduling Form |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Plaintiff's Scheduling Form |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Jason Heitstuman in Support of Response to Hayden Lake Sewer District's Motion to Dismiss | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Hayden Lake Sewer District's Motion to Dismiss | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Hayden Lake Sewer District's Scheduling Form |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Pretrial Scheduling Conference |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Notice of Change of Firm and Address |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Defendant Northwest Line Builders Answer to Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Proposed Order RE: Motion to Appear via Zoom (preferred) or Telephonically for Hearing on Defendant Hayden Lake Sewer District's Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 07/19/23 @ 3:00pm | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Telephonic Hearing Motion to Appear via Zoom (preferred) or Telephonically for Hearing on Defendant Hayden Lake Sewer District's Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Christine L. Reinert | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum In Support of Motion Defendant Hayden Lake Sewer Districts Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Motion Declaration of Dustin Jacobson in Support of Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Defendant Hayden Lake Sewer Districts Motion to Dismiss |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance - Doll Jr. |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Summons Issued | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Hayden Lake Sewer District |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | New Case - District Civil | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Northwest Line Builders |