Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Three Mile Properties, LLC. , vs. James Fauver .
On November 29, 2022 an aa4 real property (more than $10,000) case was filed by Three Mile Properties, Llc., represented by Creason, Samuel Toevs, against Fauver, James F, in the jurisdiction of Nez Perce County. Judge Evans, Michelle M presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 29, 2022
Last Refreshed
November 10, 2023
Filing Location
Nez Perce County, ID
Judge
Category
AA4 Real Property (more than $10,000)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 |
Motion Hearing - Civil Mtn for Order Approving Entry Upon Land - Zoom Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
||
October 19, 2023 |
Motion for Order Approving entry Upon Land - Plaintiff's |
||
October 19, 2023 | Notice of Remote Hearing | ||
October 19, 2023 |
Declaration of Ty Paffile |
||
October 16, 2023 | Certificate of Service | ||
October 16, 2023 | Notice of Appeal | ||
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Trial - Civil
Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages: Nancy Towler, less than 100 pages |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Decision or Opinion Memorandum Opinion and Order on Plaintiff's Second Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial - Civil Zoom Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Third Declaration of Shayne Thatcher |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages: Nancy Towler, less than 100 pages Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment and Def's Mtn to Dismiss - Zoom Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Response Memorandum |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response - Defendant's Second Response to the Plaintiff's Second Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Second Declaration of Ronnie Taylor |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Second Declaration of James F. Fauver |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - Defendant's Second Motion to Dismiss |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Second Declaration of Shayne Thatcher |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum In Support of Motion | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Second |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing |
|
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Decision or Opinion Memorandum Opinion and Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages: Nancy Towler, less than 100 pages Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Zoom Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Brief - Re Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Declaration of James F. Fauver |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Declaration of Ronnie Taylor |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of James F. Fauver |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Summary Judgment |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Ronnie Taylor |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Summary Judgment |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Zoom Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages: Nancy Towler, less than 100 pages Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment - Plaintiff's |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of L. Shayne Thatcher |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Memorandum Re Def's Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment - Plaintiff's |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case for Trial and Pre-Trial Conference |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment (atty fees) |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion to Compel |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Samuel T. Creason Re Attorney Fees |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs & Attorney Fees | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Court Minutes | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel ZOOM Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages: Linda Carlton, less than 100 pages Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Samuel Creason in Support of Motion to Compel |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel
Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Telephone Conference Status/Scheduling Judge: Evans, Michelle M |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Remote Hearing |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Samuel T. Creason in Support of Motion to Compel |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Defendant's Written Response |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit / Return of Service | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | New Case - District Civil |