Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Profitt, Loris J, Profitt, Shann Eugene, The Lord Will Provide, Inc., filed a(n) Aa- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, And H1) case represented by Hally, Jonathan David, against City Of Lewiston, represented by Stromberg, Bentley Guy, in the jurisdiction of Nez Perce County. This case was filed in Nez Perce County Superior Courts with Green, Adam H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2023 |
CategoryAa- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, And H1) |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationNez Perce County, ID |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2024 |
Court Trial - Civil Day 3 Judge: Green, Adam H. |
||
December 12, 2024 |
Court Trial - Civil Day 2 Judge: Green, Adam H. |
||
December 11, 2024 |
Court Trial - Civil Day 1 Judge: Green, Adam H. |
||
October 28, 2024 |
Pre Trial Final (via Zoom) (Nikki clerking) Judge: Green, Adam H. |
||
March 01, 2024 |
Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Attendance at Mediation & Defendant's Motion to Excuse Attendance |
||
March 01, 2024 |
Court Minutes
Judge: Green, Adam H. |
||
March 01, 2024 |
Motion to Compel Those with Authority to Settle to Attend the Court-Ordered Mediation and Defendant's Motion to Excuse Attendance (via zoom-Britt clerking) Judge: Green, Adam H. |
||
March 01, 2024 |
Motion to Compel Those with Authority to Settle to Attend the Court-Ordered Mediation (via zoom-Britt clerking) Judge: Green, Adam H. |
||
February 29, 2024 |
Reply in Support of Motion to Excuse Attendance |
||
February 28, 2024 |
Opposition to Plaintiffs Opposition to City's Motion to Excuse Attendance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.