Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Idaho Central Credit Union, filed a(n) Aa- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, And H1) case represented by Kerl, Ron, against Eriyakimu, Magogwa, Light Mission Pentecostal Church, Inc., Makacha, Onesmu, Nkeshimana, Joseph, Sindayihebura, Charles, (total of 6) See All represented by Melton, Kirk Alan, in the jurisdiction of Twin Falls County. This case was filed in Twin Falls County Superior Courts with Cluff, Benjamin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 07, 2022 |
CategoryAa- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, And H1) |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationTwin Falls County, ID |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 |
Motion to Amend
Judge: Harris (District), Roger B. |
||
November 27, 2023 | Objection to Motion to Amend | ||
November 13, 2023 | Notice of Hearing | ||
November 06, 2023 |
Court Minutes
Judge: Harris (District), Roger B. |
||
November 06, 2023 |
Oral Decision
Judge: Harris (District), Roger B. |
||
November 06, 2023 |
DC Hearing Held: Court Reporter: # of Pages: Jackie Walters Judge: Harris (District), Roger B. |
||
November 02, 2023 |
Cross Claim Cross-Complaint |
||
November 02, 2023 | Motion to Amend Complaint | ||
November 02, 2023 |
Declaration in Support of Motion Declaration of Counsel In Support of Motion to Amend Pleadings |
||
October 23, 2023 | Notice of Remote Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.