Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Schweihs Melinda, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Edward T Joyce Associates, against Centeno Edilfonso, Chase Home Finance Ll, Chase Manhattan Mortg, Chase Mortgage Corpor, Gonsalez Todd, (total of 8) See All represented by Burke Warren & Mackay, Leahy Eisenberg & Fraenke, Wiedner Frank J Mcauliffe, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Elizabeth M. Budzinski presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2017 |
CategoryIntentional Tort - Jury |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid -
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Intentional Tort Complaint Filed (Jury Demand)
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00Case Rerandomized To Motion Call
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00New Case Filing
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00Appearance Filed - Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Refile As New Case
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Substitute Or Add Attorney - Allowed -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Withdrawal Of Attorney From Case - Allowed -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Case Electronically Filed
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Case Returned For Case Management With A Trial Date
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Answer/Response/Reply
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00Answer To Motion Filed
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Motion To - Denied -
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof - Dnd -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Order To Stand - Allowed
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof - Dnd -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof - Dnd -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Alw-
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Alw-
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Alw-
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Order Plaintiff, Defendant Or Witness To Appear - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Case Set On Trial Setting Call In 2006
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Strike Or Withdraw Motion Or Petition - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Postcard Generated
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Electronic Notice Sent
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Notice Of Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Appearance Filed - No Fee Paid - (Jury Demand)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Restricted Image
Date: December 06, 2019Stipulation Filed
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Suppress Exhibits Or Documents - Allowed -
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00Impound/Seal
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Restricted Image
Date: December 13, 2019Impound/Seal
Date: December 13, 2019Appellate Court Mandate - Affirmed
Date: January 05, 2022Stipulation Filed
Date: December 17, 2019Placita And Cert Of Transcript Of Record For Appeal Filed
Date: December 30, 2019PLACITA AND CERTIFICATION OF TRANSCRIPT OF RECORD FOR APPEAL FILED
Date: December 30, 2019RESTRICTED IMAGE
Date: December 13, 2019STIPULATION FILED
Date: December 17, 2019IMPOUND/SEAL
Date: December 13, 2019RESTRICTED IMAGE
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00IMPOUND/SEAL
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Motion To Dismiss Filed
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Motion For Extension Of Time (Scr 323E) Filed
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Extend Time - Allowed -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Case Returned For Case Management With A Trial Date
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Case Continued On Trial Call
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Case Set On Assignment Call
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Brief Filed
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Motion To - Continued -
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Motion To - Continued -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Cnt -
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Motion To - Continued -
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof - Dnd -
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof - Dnd -
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Discovery - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00File Appearance Or Jury Demand, Answer Or Plead - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Strike From Motion Call - Allowed
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Order On Motion For Sanctions - Continued
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Exclude Evidence, Testimony Or A Witness - Continued -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Exclude Evidence, Testimony Or A Witness - Continued -
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Case Continued For Focused Case Management
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Answer Interrogatories - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Summary Judgment - Continued -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Motion To - Continued -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Strike Or Vacate An Order - Continued -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Certificate Of Mailing Filed
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Transfer To Judge Within Division
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Summary Judgment - Denied -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Summary Judgment - Denied -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Discovery Completed And Closed-Case Certified For Trial
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Strike Or Vacate An Order - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Court Date To Stand - Allowed
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Exclude Evidence, Testimony Or A Witness - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Interrogatories Filed
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Restricted Image
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Protective Order - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Motion To - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00File Affidavits - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Protective Order - Allowed -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Case Continued On Trial Call
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Mailed
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Case Continued On Trial Call
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Continuance
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Assign To Judge Within Division
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Motion To - Denied -
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Continuance
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Document Submitted via eFiling
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Dismiss By Stipulation Or Agreement
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Deposition Filed
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Restricted Image
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Notice Of Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Request For Preparation Of The Record
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00STIPULATION FILED
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00SUPPRESS EXHIBITS OR DOCUMENTS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF THE RECORD
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL FILED
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00RESTRICTED IMAGE
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00DEPOSITION FILED
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00MOTION TO - DENIED -
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00CONTINUANCE
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00CONTINUANCE
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING MAILED
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00RESTRICTED IMAGE
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DENIED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00COURT DATE TO STAND - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00DISCOVERY COMPLETED AND CLOSED-CASE CERTIFIED FOR TRIAL
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00TRANSFER TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00MOTION TO - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00FILE AFFIDAVITS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY OR A WITNESS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - ALW -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00AMENDED NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00ISSUE WRIT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY OR A WITNESS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR TRIAL - MOTION DEFENDANT - DENIED
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00COURT DATE TO STAND - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Continuance - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Answer Interrogatories - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Answer To Interrogatories Filed
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Answer Interrogatories - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Motion To - Continued -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Order To Stand - Allowed
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Answer To Interrogatories Filed
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Submit For Medical Examination - Continued -
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00Submit For Medical Examination - Denied -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Continued -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Strike Or Vacate An Order - Continued -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Protective Order - Continued -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Exchange Information - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Strike From Case Management Call - Allowed
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Answer To Supplemental Interrogatories Filed
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Certify Transcript Of Proceeds - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Comply - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Case Continued On Trial Call
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Certify Transcript Of Proceeds - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Continued -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Case Set On Assignment Call
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Courtesy Copies Required - Allowed
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Strike From The Call - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Certificate Filed
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Court Date To Stand - Allowed
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Answer To Supplemental Interrogatories Filed
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Case Continued For Trial - Motion Defendant - Denied
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Issue Writ - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Protective Order - Continued -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Notice Of Filing Filed
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Exclude Evidence, Testimony Or A Witness - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Emergency Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Strike,Withdraw Compl,Amended Compl,Portion Thereof -Alw-
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Motion To - Continued -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Strike Or Vacate An Order - Continued -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Motion To - Continued -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Response / Reply - Filed
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00File Amendment, Additional, Amended Pleadings - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Execute Or Perform - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00ANSWER TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON ASSIGNMENT CALL
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00CERTIFY TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00ANSWER TO SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-06-11T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00SUBMIT FOR MEDICAL EXAMINATION - DENIED -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-05-16T00:00:00SUBMIT FOR MEDICAL EXAMINATION - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00ORDER TO STAND - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00ANSWER INTERROGATORIES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES FILED
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00EXCHANGE INFORMATION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00ANSWER INTERROGATORIES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00TAKING OF DEPOSITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00AMENDED NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00COURT DATE TO STAND - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR TRIAL - MOTION DEFENDANT - DENIED
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00DISCOVERY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - DND -
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00BRIEF FILED
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Taking Of Deposition - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Case Continued For Case Management Conference - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Court Date To Stand - Allowed
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Amend Complaint Or Petition - Continued -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Case Continued For Trial - Motion Defendant - Denied
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Strike Or Vacate An Order - Continued -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Exhibits Filed
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Motion Scheduled
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Amended Notice Filed
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Produce Exhibits,Other Records,Documents,Person - Allowed -
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Notice Of Motion Filed
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY OR A WITNESS - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00PRODUCE EXHIBITS OR OTHER RECORDS OR DOCUMENTS OR PERSON - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00ANSWER INTERROGATORIES - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-07-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00ORDER ON MOTION FOR SANCTIONS - CONTINUED
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00EXCLUDE EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY OR A WITNESS - CONTINUED -
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR FOCUSED CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00EMERGENCY MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-07-05T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00CASE RETURNED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT WITH A TRIAL DATE
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00CASE SET ON ASSIGNMENT CALL
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED ON TRIAL CALL
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (SCR 323E) FILED
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00CASE SET ON TRIAL SETTING CALL IN 2006
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00POSTCARD GENERATED
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00ORDER PLAINTIFF, DEFENDANT OR WITNESS TO APPEAR - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - DND -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00ORDER TO STAND - ALLOWED
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - ALW -
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-01-16T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW COMPLAINT, AMENDED COMPLAINT OR PORTION THEREOF - CNT -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00ANSWER TO MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00CASE RETURNED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT WITH A TRIAL DATE
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00MOTION TO - DENIED -
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00COURTESY COPIES REQUIRED - ALLOWED
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00FILE AMENDMENT OR ADDITIONAL OR AMENDED PLEADINGS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00SUBSTITUTE OR ADD ATTORNEY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FROM CASE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00AMEND COMPLAINT OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00INTENTIONAL TORT COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID - (JURY DEMAND)
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00REFILE AS NEW CASE
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00CASE RERANDOMIZED TO MOTION CALL
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-21T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-06-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.