Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Picciolini Christian, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Arnstein & Lehr, against Liberman Zachary Todd, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Elizabeth M. Budzinski presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2017 |
CategoryLibel/Slander |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
EXHIBITS FILED
Date: March 16, 2018LIBEL/SLANDER COMPLAINT FILED (JURY DEMAND)
Date: October 16, 2017EXHIBITS FILED
Date: May 10, 2018CASE CONTINUED ON TRIAL CALL
Date: May 10, 2018JUDGMENT BY PROVE-UP
Date: May 11, 2018FILE AFFIDAVITS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: March 23, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: March 23, 2018DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: March 23, 2018MOTION SCHEDULED
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: May 10, 2018CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT DATE GENERATED
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00ASSIGN TO JUDGE WITHIN DIVISION
Date: May 11, 2018CASE SET ON PROVE UP CALL
Date: March 23, 2018FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-03-19T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -
Date: May 11, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-03-16T00:00:00CASE CONTINUED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.