Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Founders Insurance Compan, filed a(n) Declaratory Judgement case represented by Shelmadine Shari Law Offi, against Watts Tameika, Mcdowell Janice, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Thomas R. Allen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2019 |
CategoryDeclaratory Judgement |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
|
DISMISS ENTIRE CAUSE - PLAINTIFF -
Date: October 17, 2019APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: August 30, 2019ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: July 30, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: September 17, 2019SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: September 23, 2019CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: July 29, 2019APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -
Date: July 29, 2019ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: August 30, 2019WAIVER FILED
Date: August 30, 2019SUMMONS - RETD N.S.
Date: July 16, 2019DECLARATORY JUDGMENT COMPLAINT FILED
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.