Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re: the Guardianship of Juniper Violet Koontz
A Gu - Guardianship case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. Judge Judi L. Calhoun presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 13, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 18, 2023
Filing Location
Delaware County, IN
Category
GU - Guardianship
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Notice Filed ---- 11/13/2023 : Juniper Violet Koontz Order Granting Temporary Guardianship ---- 11/13/2023 : Juniper Violet Koontz Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 11/13/2023 : Juniper Violet Koontz |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letters of Guardianship Issued Temporary Adult Guardianship |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Notice Filed ---- 11/13/2023 : Ralph Edward Dowling Order Granting Temporary Guardianship ---- 11/13/2023 : Ralph Edward Dowling Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 11/13/2023 : Ralph Edward Dowling |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Event (x5) Letters issued to Attorney on Record via Court Admin Office |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Oath Filed Oath |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Waiver/Consent to Proposed Action Filed Waiver of Bond and GAL |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of GU |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Hearing scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 1:30 PM. |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Temporary Guardianship Issued by: HON Judi Calhoun, Judge |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition to Establish Guardianship Filed Petition for GU |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Filed GU Instructions |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information ACR Registry |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Guardianship Information Sheet Filed GU Registry |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Exclusion of Confidential Information ACR Evaluation |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appearance Filed Appearance |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing |