Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Greenstate Credit Union Fka Un Iversity Of Iowa Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Low, Christopher Lloyd, against Manning Jaleel Maurtay, in the jurisdiction of Black Hawk County. This case was filed in Black Hawk County Superior Courts District.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2024 |
CategoryContract - Debt Collection |
Last RefreshedMay 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBlack Hawk County, IA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseDistrict |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTICE | |
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
COMPUTER GENERATED NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SCHED CONF 06/06/24 2:30 PM |
|
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTICE | |
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTICE | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTICE POSTED 04/12/24 $38 |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTICE J MANNING 4/8/24 |
|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL ORIGINAL NOTICE | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.