Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AAA COLLECTIONS INC VS DENNIS SAGE
On March 29, 2024 a contract - debt collection case was filed by Aaa Collections Inc, represented by Snell, Ryan Wayne, against Sage Dennis D, in the jurisdiction of Black Hawk County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 29, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 09, 2024
Filing Location
Black Hawk County, IA
Filing Court House
District
Category
CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
OTHER EVENT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
OTHER EVENT MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTICE D SAGE 4/8/24 |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL ORIGINAL NOTICE | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FILED | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | VERIFICATION OF ACCOUNT |