Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AVID ACCEPTANCE, LLC V. RACHEL BEERWART
On March 18, 2024 a contract - debt collection case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Cedar County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 18, 2024
Last Refreshed
March 22, 2024
Filing Location
Cedar County, IA
Filing Court House
District
Category
CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE HEARING 5/14/2024 2:00 PM DCCS |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | OATH | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING FOR SMALL ESTATATE ADMINISTRATION AND APPOINTING PERSONAL |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
PETITION IN PROBATE - ESTATE CONSERVATORSHIP OR TRUST DOD 2/7/2023 |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FILED | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL ORIGINAL NOTICE | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
BACKGROUND CHECK PERSONAL INFORMATION SHAREE DAWN SCHNITKER AKA STEWART |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | AFF OF FINANCIAL STATUS | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
BACKGROUND CHECK PERSONAL INFORMATION DONALD JOSEPH SCHNITKER |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
OATH DONALD JOSEPH SCHNITKER AND SHAREE DAWN SCHNITKER |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR STAND ALONE GUARDIANSHIP | |
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING HEARING 4/23/2024 2:00 PM DCCS |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
BACKGROUND CHECK RESULTS DONALD SCHNITKER |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE LISA GREEN FOR PROTECTED PARTY |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
BACKGROUND CHECK RESULTS SHAREE SCHNITKER AKA STEWART |