Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
filed a(n) Juror Contempt case against Wheagar Alvin J, in the jurisdiction of Linn County. This case was filed in Linn County Superior Courts District.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2024 |
CategoryJuror Contempt |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationLinn County, IA |
|
Filing Court HouseDistrict |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED PER COURT SHALL BE INCLUDED WITHIN THE JURY POOL FOR A FUTURE CASE |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance HEARING RESET TO 04/22/2024 02:00 PM DCNJ. |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Other ALVIN JACKSON WHEAGAR/03-04-2024/$39.88 |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | APPLICATION/INITIATE CONTEMPT/SHOW CAUSE - CIVIL | |
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SHOW CAUSE 04/01/2024 02:30 PM DCNJ./TO LCSO FOR SERVICE |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other Affidavit REGARDING JURY SERVICE |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other Event Juror History Report |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.