Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS JUSTIN W HAUGE
On March 08, 2024 a contract - debt collection case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Linn County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 08, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 29, 2024
Filing Location
Linn County, IA
Filing Court House
District
Category
CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 05/02/2024 09:30 AM DCAD/BY |
|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTICE JUSTIN M HAUGE/BY SUBSERVICE/03-12-2024 |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFF OF SOLDIER AND SAILOR RELIEF MA |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF ACCOUNT VOA |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Other Event EXHIBIT |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
CIVIL ORIGINAL NOTICE NOTICE |
|
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed PETITION |