Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ESTATE OF JUNE ELLEN RIDDLE
On March 12, 2024 an estate case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Monona County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 12, 2024
Last Refreshed
March 16, 2024
Filing Location
Monona County, IA
Filing Court House
District
Category
Estate
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING EXECUTOR | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT MARK ROBERT RIDDLE APPOINTED AS EXECUTOR |
|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF APPROVAL OF WILL | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTICE | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
OATH MARK ROBERT RIDDLE |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF DECEASED | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION IN PROBATE - ESTATE CONSERVATORSHIP OR TRUST | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY ALLEN NEPPER |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | TESTIMONY OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL ORIGINAL NOTICE | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | PETITION FILED | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
OTHER ORDER ORDER FOR DIRECTIONS OF SERVICE |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
MOTION DIRECTION FOR SERVICE |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
CIVIL ORIGINAL NOTICE AMENDED ORIGINAL NOTICE |
|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
PETITION FILED PETITION IN EQUITY |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
PETITION FILED AT LAW & REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL ORIGINAL NOTICE | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | TESTIMONY OF SUBSCRIBING WITNESS | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF APPOINTMENT | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
PETITION IN PROBATE - ESTATE CONSERVATORSHIP OR TRUST DOD 11/08/23 |
|
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | OATH | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING EXECUTOR | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY | |
March 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF DECEASED DATED 03/04/2020 |