Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK VS TRUC LAM
On March 29, 2024 a contract - debt collection case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Polk County. Judge ROSENBERG SCOTT D presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 29, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 06, 2024
Filing Location
Polk County, IA
Filing Court House
District
Judge
Hon. ROSENBERG SCOTT D
Category
CONTRACT - DEBT COLLECTION
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
ANSWER DEFENDANT |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
RETURN OF ORIGINAL NOTICE SERVED TRUC LAM ON 04/07/2024. $65 |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
PETITION FILED DEBT COLLECTION |
|
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL ORIGINAL NOTICE | |
March 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
VERIFICATION OF ACCOUNT IDENTIFICATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR AND CERTIFICATE RE |