Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RHONDA L. JESSUM, PH.D. VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY, ET AL.
On January 07, 2019 a quiet title (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Craig D. Karlan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 07, 2019
Last Refreshed
December 31, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Santa Monica
Category
Quiet Title (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Quiet Title
Case Outcome Type
Unknown disposition
Status
Unknown
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO QUIET
TITLE; DECLARATORY RELIEF; INJUNCTIVE
RELIEF; DEFAMATION / SLANDER OF TITLE;
REFORMATION OF DEED LEGAL
DESCRIPTION BASED ON SCRIVENERS' ERROR
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 19SMCV00043 Hearing Date: January 2, 2024 Dept: N TENTATIVE RULING Defendants Mark Konopaske and Ann Wisniewskis Demurrer to Fourth Amended Complaint is SUSTAINED without leave to amend. ...
Judge: 11/28/2022 |
|
November 29, 2023 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Case Management Conference |
|
November 29, 2023 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike |
|
November 29, 2023 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) by Defendant County of Los Angeles to Defendants Ann Wisniewski and Mark Konopaske's Response and Objection to Plaintiff's "Notice of Related Case"; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Response AND OBJECTION OF DEFENDANTS ANN WISNIEWSKI and MARK KONOPASKE TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY PLAINTIFF RHONDA JESSUM; Filed by: Ann Wisniewski (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) |
|
July 21, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
July 21, 2023 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
July 21, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
July 21, 2023 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Stipulated Dismissal and Proposed Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRT / Tree People (Defendant) |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (4th) filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. on , entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to Jorge Sanchez Galvez |
|
July 07, 2023 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 07, 2023 | hearing | There being no judge available this date, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Trailed was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld, Presiding Case Management Conference - Not Held - Trailed Case Management Conference - Not Held - Trailed Judge: Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Remote Appearance for 7-21-23 CMC; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Hearing date Corrections: Name Extension changed from Notice of Hearing date Corrections to of Hearing date Corrections ; As To Parties changed from Gary Morrison (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Dara Ghasemiizadeh (Defendant), MRCA (Defendant), Linda Boorman (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), Lisa Maki (Defendant), Carol Morrison (Defendant), Los Angeles County (Defendant), Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant) to The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant), Dara Ghasemiizadeh (Defendant), MRCA (Defendant), Carol Morrison (Defendant), Gary Morrison (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), Los Angeles County (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), Lisa Maki (Defendant), Mounta | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Errata for Declaration to Support Demurrer; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Hearing date Corrections; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance - 7-7-23 hearing; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant) |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant); Carol Morrison (Defendant) |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration to Support Plaintiff's Opposition to County's Demurrer; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to County's Motion to Strike the 4AC; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. Service Cost Waived: No |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Declaration to Support Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant LA County's Motion to Strike; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Declaration to Support Plaintiff Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D.'s Opposition to Demurrers to 4AC; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to County and Adding Demurrers to the Fourth Amended Complaint; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to W and K Demurrer to 4AC; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Ann Wisniewski and Mark Konopaske's Demurrer to 4AC; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 12, 2023 | Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO COUNTY AND ADDING DEMURRERS TO THE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
June 12, 2023 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION TO SUPPORT PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT LA COUNTY'S MOTION TO STRIKE | ||
June 12, 2023 | Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO W AND K DEMURRER TO 4AC | ||
June 12, 2023 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
June 12, 2023 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION TO SUPPORT PLAINTIFF RHONDA L. JESSUM, PH.D.'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRERS TO 4AC | ||
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Declaration to Support Plaintiff's Motion for Preference to Expedite Pending Hearings; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 09, 2023 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION TO SUPPORT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PREFERENCE TO EXPEDITE PENDING HEARINGS | ||
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from Los Angeles County (Defendant) to Los Angeles County (Defendant) | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (4th) filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D., causes Voluntary Partial Dismissal: Only dismiss (the entire) Cause o Action 5 "Injunctive Relief", which is only as to Los Angeles County |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant); The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant); Carol Morrison (Defendant); Gary Morrison (Defendant); Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
June 05, 2023 | Request for Dismissal | ||
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Joinder to Motion to Strike 4th Amended Complaint; Filed by: Dara Ghasemiizadeh (Defendant) |
|
June 02, 2023 | Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION TO STRIKE 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) In Motion To Strike The Fourth Amended Complaint; Supporting Declaration Of Judy M. Lam; Filed by: Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 01, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS INDERDYNE LLC AND JOSH CLARK TO EACH DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Joshua Clark (Defendant); Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant) |
|
June 01, 2023 | Opposition - OPPOSITION JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS INDERDYNE LLC AND JOSH CLARK TO EACH DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
June 01, 2023 | Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) IN MOTION TO STRIKE THE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JUDY M. LAM | ||
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Wilson ISO Motion to Strike; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 31, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) In Demurrers To Fourth Amended Complaint; Supporting Declaration Of Judy M. Lam; Filed by: MRCA (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Richard Dale Marks (Attorney): Middle Name changed from D. to Dale | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant); Carol Morrison (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Wilson ISO Demurrer; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Joinder to Motion Joinder of Defendants Ann Wisniewski and Mark Konopaske to Motion to Strike Fourth Amended Complaint of LA County; Filed by: Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) |
|
May 31, 2023 | Answer | ||
May 31, 2023 | Demurrer - without Motion to Strike | ||
May 31, 2023 | Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) | ||
May 31, 2023 | Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS ANN WISNIEWSKI AND MARK KONOPASKE TO MOTION TO STRIKE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LA COUNTY | ||
May 31, 2023 | Notice of Joinder - NOTICE OF JOINDER (NAME EXTENSION) IN DEMURRERS TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JUDY M. LAM | ||
May 31, 2023 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEFFREY WILSON ISO MOTION TO STRIKE | ||
May 31, 2023 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEFFREY WILSON ISO DEMURRER | ||
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No |
|
May 25, 2023 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
May 25, 2023 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Association of Attorney; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 23, 2023 | Association of Attorney | ||
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Notice Of Errata Re: Defendants Notice Of Unavailability Of Counsel; Filed by: Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 22, 2023 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL | ||
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice Of Unavailability Of Counsel: Name Extension changed from NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL to Of Unavailability Of Counsel ; As To Parties changed from Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) to Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL; Filed by: MRCA (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: MRCA (Defendant); New Firm Name: Maynard Nexsen LLP |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Judy M. Lam (Attorney): Organization Name: Maynard Nexsen LLP | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Address for Judy M. Lam (Attorney) customer request | |
May 01, 2023 | Notice of Change of Firm Name | ||
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Konopaske (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Dara Ghasemiizadeh (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Ann Wisniewski (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Gary Morrison (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Linda Boorman (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa Maki (Defendant) |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Kip C. Corely (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant) et al. Service Cost Waived: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Carol Morrison (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
April 24, 2023 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
April 24, 2023 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (4th); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
March 28, 2023 | Notice of Ruling | ||
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Fourth Amended Complaint (Filed Plaintiff on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) as to Defendants (Filed by Plaintiff on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) (Filed by Plaintiff on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) (as to Defendants (Filed by Plaintiff on )) - Held Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) (as to Defendants (Filed by Plaintiff on 12/12/2022)) - Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing - Other (- on Joinder of Defendants Inderdyne, LLC and Josh Clart to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint) - Held Hearing - Other (- on Joinder of Defendants Inderdyne, LLC and Josh Clart to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint) - Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Fourth Amended Complaint (Filed Plaintiff on )) - Held Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Fourth Amended Complaint (Filed Plaintiff on 12/14/2022)) - Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) ((Filed by Plaintiff on )) - Held Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) ((Filed by Plaintiff on 01/18/2023)) - Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld, Presiding Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (- to Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles)) - Held Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (- to Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles)) - Held Judge: Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld |
|
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) (Filed by Plaintiff on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Strike Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - to Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing - Other (- on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint) - Held Hearing - Other (- on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint) - Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) ((Filed by Plaintiff on )) - Held Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) ((Filed by Plaintiff on 12/12/2022)) - Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - to...) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to Strike (Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles)) - Held Hearing on Motion to Strike (Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles)) - Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing - Other (- on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint) - Held Hearing - Other (- on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint) - Held |
|
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - to...) | |
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Inderdyne, LLC and Josh Clart to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
March 23, 2023 | hearing | Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
March 23, 2023 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) - TO...) OF 03/23/2023 | ||
March 23, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) - TO...) | ||
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINITFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Dara Ghasemiizadeh (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2023 | Case Management Statement | ||
March 17, 2023 | Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' REPLY BRIEF TO PLAINITFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Joinder to Motion JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS ANN WISNIEWSKI AND MARK KONOPASKE TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY''S OPPOSITION; Filed by: Ann Wisniewski (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief BRIEF - UPDATE to Case Management Statement for 3-23-23 Hearing; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Leave to Amend Complaint; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 14, 2023 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
March 14, 2023 | Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS ANN WISNIEWSKI AND MARK KONOPASKE TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY''S OPPOSITION | ||
March 14, 2023 | Brief - BRIEF BRIEF - UPDATE TO CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FOR 3-23-23 HEARING | ||
March 14, 2023 | Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT | ||
March 14, 2023 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
March 14, 2023 | Notice of Appearance | ||
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa Maki (Defendant); Service Date: |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant); Carol Morrison (Defendant); Gary Morrison (Defendant) |
|
March 13, 2023 | Case Management Statement | ||
March 13, 2023 | Proof of Publication | ||
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant) |
|
March 07, 2023 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE | ||
March 07, 2023 | Case Management Statement | ||
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice NOTE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant) et al. |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 06, 2023 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
March 06, 2023 | Notice - NOTICE NOTE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT | ||
March 06, 2023 | Case Management Statement |
|
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint: Location changed from Department N to Department S | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Motion to Strike Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles): Location changed from Department S to Department N |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) (Filed by Plaintiff on ): Location changed from Department N to Department S |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) as to Defendants (Filed by Plaintiff on ): Location changed from Department S to Department N |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint: Location changed from Department S to Department N | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice: As To Parties: | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - to Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles): Location changed from Department S to Department N |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Fourth Amended Complaint (Filed Plaintiff on ): Location changed from Department N to Department S | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department N - Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld; Reason: Inventory Transfer | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) as to Defendants (Filed by Plaintiff on ): Location changed from Department N to Department S |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) (Filed by Plaintiff on ): Location changed from Department S to Department N |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department N to Department S | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department S - Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld; Reason: Inventory Transfer | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Fourth Amended Complaint (Filed Plaintiff on ): Location changed from Department S to Department N | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Motion to Strike Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles): Location changed from Department N to Department S |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Inderdyne, LLC and Josh Clart to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint: Location changed from Department S to Department N | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - to Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles): Location changed from Department N to Department S |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) (Filed by Plaintiff on ): Location changed from Department S to Department N |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint: Location changed from Department S to Department N | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Inderdyne, LLC and Josh Clart to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint: Location changed from Department N to Department S | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department S to Department N | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) (Filed by Plaintiff on ): Location changed from Department N to Department S |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint: Location changed from Department N to Department S | |
February 27, 2023 | Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice | ||
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order for Publication: Filed By: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order for Publication: Status Date changed from to ; Result Date changed from to ; As To Parties changed from Lisa Maki (Defendant) to Lisa Maki (Defendant) | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order; Filed by: SMMC (Defendant) |
|
February 09, 2023 | Order for Publication | ||
February 09, 2023 | Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER | ||
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Application for Publication: As To Parties changed from Lisa Maki (Defendant) to Lisa Maki (Defendant) | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Amended Complaint (3rd): As To Parties changed from MRCA (Defendant), Carol Morrison (Defendant), Linda Boorman (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), Mori Ghagemi (Defendant), SSM Conservancy (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), MRT / Tree People (Defendant), Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant), Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant), Gary Morrison (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant) to Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant), Carol Morrison (Defendant), Mori Ghagemi (Defendant), Linda Boorman (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), SSM Conservancy (Defendant), Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant), MRT / Tree People (Defendant), Lisa Maki (Defendant), Kip | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Amended Complaint (3rd): Name Extension changed from (3rd) to (3rd) ; As To Parties changed from Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), MRCA (Defendant), Linda Boorman (Defendant), Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant), Carol Morrison (Defendant), Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), SSM Conservancy (Defendant), Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant), Gary Morrison (Defendant), MRT / Tree People (Defendant), Mori Ghagemi (Defendant) to Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), Linda Boorman (Defendant), SSM Conservancy (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), Mori Ghagemi (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Gary Morrison (Defendant), MRT / Tree People (Defendant), Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant), Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kenn | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Application for Publication; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa Maki (Defendant) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Publication; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa Maki (Defendant) |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): As To Parties changed from Lisa Maki (Defendant) to Lisa Maki (Defendant) | |
February 03, 2023 | Application for Publication | ||
February 03, 2023 | Order for Publication | ||
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Stay All Deadlines as to Santa Monica Mountains Conservancy; Signed and Filed by: SMMC (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Stay All Deadlines as to Santa Monica Mountains Conservancy: Filed By: SMMC (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: |
|
February 02, 2023 | Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO STAY ALL DEADLINES AS TO SANTA MONICA MOUNTAINS CONSERVANCY | ||
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 100.00; Cost Waived: No |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint as Against Santa Monica Mountains Conservancy; Signed and Filed by: SMMC (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (3rd) filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. on , entered Order for Dismissal with prejudice as to SMMC |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Dara Ghasemiizadeh (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 01, 2023 | Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) | ||
February 01, 2023 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
February 01, 2023 | Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AS AGAINST SANTA MONICA MOUNTAINS CONSERVANCY | ||
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Leave to Amend 1-29-23 version of proposed Fourth Amended Complaint; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion re: WITHDRAWAL LEAVE TO AMEND; (PROPOSED) ) PLAINTIFF RHONDA L. JESSUM, PH.D.'S ) FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); SMMC (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 30, 2023 | Motion re: - MOTION RE: WITHDRAWAL LEAVE TO AMEND; (PROPOSED) ) PLAINTIFF RHONDA L. JESSUM, PH.D.'S ) FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
January 30, 2023 | Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 1-29-23 VERSION OF PROPOSED FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Nonappearance Case Review; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant); SMMC (Defendant) et al. |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: PLAINTIFF RHONDA L. JESSUM, P...) | |
January 26, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) (Filed by Plaintiff on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
January 26, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473) as to Defendants (Filed by Plaintiff on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld |
|
January 26, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) (Filed by Plaintiff on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: PLAINTIFF RHONDA L. JESSUM, P...) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 26, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Fourth Amended Complaint (Filed Plaintiff on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
January 26, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PLAINTIFF RHONDA L. JESSUM, P...) | ||
January 26, 2023 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: PLAINTIFF RHONDA L. JESSUM, P...) OF 01/26/2023 | ||
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal: As To Parties: | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, and file 4AC: As To Parties: | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default: As To Parties changed from Joshua Clark (Defendant) to Joshua Clark (Defendant) | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Address for Santa Monica Mountains Conservancy (Defendant) null | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- SMMC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from SSM Conservancy to SMMC | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 18, 2023 | Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address | ||
January 18, 2023 | Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal |
|
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant) |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Dara Ghasemiizadeh (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 09, 2023 | Answer | ||
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Address for Dara Ghasemiizadeh (Defendant) null | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Dara Ghasemiizadeh (Defendant); Service Cost: 145.60; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
January 06, 2023 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Note to Department N Clerk Regarding Inclusion and Exclusion of Defendants; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Note to Department N Clerk Regarding Inclusion and Exclusion of Defendants: Filed By: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: ; As To Parties: |
|
January 04, 2023 | Brief - NOTE TO DEPARTMENT N CLERK REGARDING INCLUSION AND EXCLUSION OF DEFENDANTS | ||
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 03, 2023 | Notice of Ruling |
|
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
December 22, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, and file 4AC: Name Extension changed from Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, and file 4AC to Complaint, and file 4AC ; As To Parties: | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Motion for Severance of Causes of Action V and VI: Filed By: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); Result: Withdrawn ; Result Date: |
|
December 14, 2022 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, and file 4AC; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 14, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh: Filed By: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); Result: Denied ; Result Date: |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons: Filed By: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); Result: Denied ; Result Date: |
|
December 14, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Motion for Severance of Causes of Action V and VI scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Mistrial | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh) - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh) - Held - Motion Denied |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Motion for Severance of Causes of Action V and VI) - Held - Mistrial Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Motion for Severance of Causes of Action V and VI) - Held - Mistrial |
|
December 14, 2022 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application E...) | |
December 14, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
December 14, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION E...) | ||
December 14, 2022 | Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, AND FILE 4AC | ||
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Joinder to Motion NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTION TO STRIKE; SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JUDY M. LAM; Filed by: Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant) |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Joinder to Motion NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEMURRERS; SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JUDY M. LAM; Filed by: Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant) |
|
December 13, 2022 | Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION NOTICE OF JOINDER IN DEMURRERS; SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JUDY M. LAM | ||
December 13, 2022 | Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION NOTICE OF JOINDER IN MOTION TO STRIKE; SUPPORTING DECLARATION OF JUDY M. LAM | ||
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant) |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation - No Order To Dismiss Santa Monica Mountains Conservancy; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); SSM Conservancy (Defendant) |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice NOTICE OF HEARINGS ON JOINDER OF MARK KONOPASKE AND ANN WIESNEWSKI TO THE DEMURRER OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY AND THE MOTION TO STRIKE OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY; Filed by: Ann Wisniewski (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant); Los Angeles County (Defendant); As to: Ann Wisniewski (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
December 12, 2022 | Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal | ||
December 12, 2022 | Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default |
|
|
December 12, 2022 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARINGS ON JOINDER OF MARK KONOPASKE AND ANN WIESNEWSKI TO THE DEMURRER OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY AND THE MOTION TO STRIKE OF LOS ANGELES COUNTY | ||
December 12, 2022 | Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO DISMISS SANTA MONICA MOUNTAINS CONSERVANCY | ||
December 12, 2022 | Case Management Statement | ||
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRE...) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRE...) | |
December 08, 2022 | hearing | Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Demurrer to Third Amended Complaint scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
December 08, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - to Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
December 08, 2022 | hearing | Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Wisniewski and Konopaske to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
December 08, 2022 | hearing | Hearing - Other - on Joinder of Defendants Inderdyne, LLC and Josh Clart to Defendant Los Angeles County's Motion Strike to Third Amended Complaint scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
December 08, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Strike Third Amended Complaint (Filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
December 08, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRE...) | ||
December 08, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRE...) OF 12/08/2022 | ||
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10): As To Parties: | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Strike (not initial pleading): As To Parties: | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS ANN WISNIEWSKI AND MARK KONOPASKE TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTYs MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT: As To Parties: | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Motion for Severance of Causes of Action V and VI) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Motion for Severance of Causes of Action V and VI) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS ANN WISNIEWSKI AND MARK KONOPASKE TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT: As To Parties: | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Joinder to Motion JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS INDERDYNE LLC AND JOSH CLARK TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTYs MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS TH AMENDED COMPLAINT: As To Parties: | |
December 05, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Motion for Severance of Causes of Action V and VI scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Jorge Sanchez Galvez (Defendant) |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Motion for Severance of Causes of Action V and VI; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); MRCA (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Status Conference Re: Pleadings; ...) | |
December 05, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh) - Not Held - Clerical Error Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh) - Not Held - Clerical Error |
|
December 05, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Motion for Severance of Causes of Action V and VI scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
December 05, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons) - Held - Continued Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons) - Held - Continued |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Status Conference (RePleadings) - Held Status Conference (RePleadings) - Held |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh) - Held - Continued Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh) - Held - Continued |
|
December 05, 2022 | hearing | Status Conference Re: Pleadings scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
December 05, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
December 05, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
December 05, 2022 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Kip C. Corely (Defendant); Linda Boorman (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
December 05, 2022 | Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE MOTION FOR SEVERANCE OF CAUSES OF ACTION V AND VI | ||
December 05, 2022 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
December 05, 2022 | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) | ||
December 05, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: PLEADINGS; ...) | ||
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition Opposition to Demurrer and Motion to Strike; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 02, 2022 | Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE | ||
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from to ; Status changed from Rejected to Filed | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Amendment to Complaint) | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from to ; As To Parties changed from SSM Conservancy (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Carol Morrison (Defendant), Los Angeles County (Defendant), Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant), Mori Ghagemi (Defendant), Linda Boorman (Defendant), Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant), MRT / Tree People (Defendant), Gary Morrison (Defendant), Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) to Los Angeles County (Defendant), Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant), MRT / Tree People (Defendant), Linda Boorman (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), Carol Morrison (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Amendment to Complaint) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 29, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT) OF 11/29/2022 | ||
November 29, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT) | ||
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by: Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant) |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Strike (not initial pleading): As To Parties: | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant) et al. |
|
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from Joshua Clark (Defendant), MRCA (Defendant), Gary Morrison (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), Carol Morrison (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Mori Ghagemi (Defendant), SSM Conservancy (Defendant), Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff), Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant), MRT / Tree People (Defendant), Linda Boorman (Defendant), Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), Los Angeles County (Defendant) to Gary Morrison (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), MRT / Tree People (Defendant), SSM Conservancy (Defendant), Carol Morrison (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant), Los Angeles County (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), Rhonda L. Je | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Rejected; Submitted by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); MRT / Tree People (Defendant); SSM Conservancy (Defendant) et al. | |
November 28, 2022 | Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION | ||
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
November 23, 2022 | Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) | ||
November 23, 2022 | Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) | ||
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS ANN WISNIEWSKI AND MARK KONOPASKE TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS ANN WISNIEWSKI AND MARK KONOPASKE TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTYs MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Ann Wisniewski (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Joinder to Motion JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS INDERDYNE LLC AND JOSH CLARK TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTYs MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS TH AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: Joshua Clark (Defendant); Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant) |
|
November 22, 2022 | Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS INDERDYNE LLC AND JOSH CLARK TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTYS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS TH AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
November 22, 2022 | Joinder to Motion - JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS ANN WISNIEWSKI AND MARK KONOPASKE TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY DEMURRER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
November 22, 2022 | Joinder to Motion - JOINDER OF DEFENDANTS ANN WISNIEWSKI AND MARK KONOPASKE TO DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTYS MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant); Carol Morrison (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from to ; As To Parties changed from MRT / Tree People (Defendant) to MRT / Tree People (Defendant); Status changed from Filed to Rejected | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal: Status Date changed from to ; Status changed from Rejected to Filed | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Rejected; Submitted by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRT / Tree People (Defendant) | |
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Kip C. Corely (Defendant) |
|
November 21, 2022 | Answer | ||
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from Carol Morrison (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), SSM Conservancy (Defendant), Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff), MRCA (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), Gary Morrison (Defendant), Linda Boorman (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant), MRT / Tree People (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Mori Ghagemi (Defendant), Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant), Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant) to MRCA (Defendant), MRT / Tree People (Defendant), SSM Conservancy (Defendant), Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant), Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), Linda Boorman (Defendant), Gary Morrison (Defendant), Kip C. Corely (Defendant), Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant), Carol Morrison (Defendant), | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant) et al. |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) |
|
November 16, 2022 | Case Management Statement | ||
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by: Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) |
|
November 15, 2022 | Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION | ||
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Kip C. Corely (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: SSM Conservancy (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Kip C. Corely (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant); SSM Conservancy (Defendant) et al. Service Cost Waived: No |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 14, 2022 | Case Management Statement | ||
November 14, 2022 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
November 14, 2022 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Amendment to Complaint (Fictit...) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Amendment to Complaint (Fictit...) | |
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Joshua Clark; On the Amended Complaint (3rd) filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. on |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant) |
|
November 08, 2022 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
November 08, 2022 | Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment | ||
November 08, 2022 | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment | ||
November 08, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTIT...) OF 11/08/2022 | ||
November 08, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTIT...) | ||
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant) |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Clark Default Judgment; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal / Rejected. the Name of Jorge Galvez is not Named in the 3rd Amended Complaint /: As To Parties: removed | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Joshua Clark; On the Amended Complaint (3rd) filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. on |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal / Rejected. the Name of Jorge Galvez is not Named in the 3rd Amended Complaint /: Name Extension changed from / Rejected. the Name does not match the Name on the 3rd Amended Complaint / to / Rejected. the Name of Jorge Galvez is not Named in the 3rd Amended Complaint /; As To Parties: removed | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
November 07, 2022 | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment | ||
November 07, 2022 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
November 07, 2022 | Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF CLARK DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Linda Boorman (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 178.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
November 03, 2022 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) by Electronic Service of Summons for (3rd) Amended Complaint: Name Extension changed from Electronic Service of Summons for (3rd) Amended Complaint to by Electronic Service of Summons for (3rd) Amended Complaint; As To Parties changed from Linda Boorman (Defendant) to Linda Boorman (Defendant) | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Electronic Service of Summons for (3rd) Amended Complaint: Name Extension changed from of Summons on (3rd) Amended Complaint to Electronic Service of Summons for (3rd) Amended Complaint; Document changed from Proof of Service by Mail to Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service); As To Parties changed from Linda Boorman (Defendant) to Linda Boorman (Defendant) | |
October 31, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail of Summons of (3rd) Amended Complaint; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Linda Boorman (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: SSM Conservancy (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal /Rejected, the Name does not Match the 3rd Amended Complaint / - Rejected; Submitted by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Affidavit of Jorge Galvez; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons: Exact Name: blank; As To Parties: removed | |
October 31, 2022 | hearing | Due to Clerical Error, Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Electronic Service of Summons for (3rd) Amended Complaint; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Linda Boorman (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No; Mailing Date: ; Cost Waived: No |
|
October 31, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal / Rejected, the name does not match the 3rd Amended Complaint / - Rejected; Submitted by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Ido Cohen (Defendant) | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: SSM Conservancy (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 90.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal / Rejected. the Name does not match the Name on the 3rd Amended Complaint / - Rejected; Submitted by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Ido Cohen (Defendant) | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail of Summons; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Kip C. Corely (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for Order of Summons - Ghasaemizadeh; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 31, 2022 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
October 31, 2022 | Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF SUMMONS OF (3RD) AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
October 31, 2022 | Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) - PROOF OF MAILING (SUBSTITUTED SERVICE) BY ELECTRONIC SERVICE OF SUMMONS FOR (3RD) AMENDED COMPLAINT | ||
October 31, 2022 | Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF SUMMONS - GHASAEMIZADEH | ||
October 31, 2022 | Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF JORGE GALVEZ | ||
October 31, 2022 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
October 31, 2022 | Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF SUMMONS | ||
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Brent Myers in Support of Rhonda Jessum; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application for Order of Publication of Summons; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 28, 2022 | Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS | ||
October 28, 2022 | Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF BRENT MYERS IN SUPPORT OF RHONDA JESSUM | ||
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Affidavit of William Stange in Support of Rhonda Jessum; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: MRCA (Defendant); MRT / Tree People (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant) et al. Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Affidavit of Edo Cohen in Support of Rhonda Jessum; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Affidavit of Paul Courtemanche in Support of Rhonda Jessum; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 27, 2022 | Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF EDO COHEN IN SUPPORT OF RHONDA JESSUM | ||
October 27, 2022 | Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF WILLIAM STANGE IN SUPPORT OF RHONDA JESSUM | ||
October 27, 2022 | Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF PAUL COURTEMANCHE IN SUPPORT OF RHONDA JESSUM | ||
October 27, 2022 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Linda Boorman (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Successor Owner to Kip Corley and Linda Boorman (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Ido Cohen (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. as to Kathryn Dickson and Gary Hunt |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Dara Ghasemiizadeh (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Santa Monica Mountains Conservancy (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Lisa Maki (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Dickson (Defendant); Gary Hunt (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Mountains Restoration Trust (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Brent Myers (Defendant) |
|
October 24, 2022 | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) | ||
October 24, 2022 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
October 24, 2022 | Request for Dismissal | ||
October 24, 2022 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint (3rd); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) et al. |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit List; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 21, 2022 | Exhibit List |
|
|
October 21, 2022 | Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD) | ||
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 11, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Amended Complaint 2nd: As To Parties changed from Los Angeles County (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Grant Kennedy (Defendant) to Joshua Clark (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), Los Angeles County (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Grant Kennedy (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Amended Complaint 2nd (2nd): Name Extension changed from 2nd to 2nd (2nd) | |
October 07, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied |
|
October 07, 2022 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
October 07, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave (Plaintiff's Motion) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied | |
October 07, 2022 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Amended Complaint 2nd: Name Extension changed from 2nd (2nd) to 2nd; Result Date: ; As To Parties changed from Grant Kennedy (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), Los Angeles County (Defendant), Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) to Mark Konopaske (Defendant), Los Angeles County (Defendant), Ann Wisniewski (Defendant), Joshua Clark (Defendant), The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant), Grant Kennedy (Defendant) | |
October 07, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied |
|
October 07, 2022 | hearing | Status Conference Re: Pleadings scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave (Plaintiff's Motion); Hearing on ...) | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Leave ((Plaintiff's Motion)) - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Motion for Leave ((Plaintiff's Motion)) - Held - Motion Denied Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on )) - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on 05/02/2022)) - Held - Motion Denied |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to Compel (Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on )) - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Motion to Compel (Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on 05/02/2022)) - Held - Motion Denied |
|
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Trial Setting Conference - Held Trial Setting Conference - Held |
|
October 07, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION); HEARING ON ...) | ||
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Gary Hunt and Kathryn Dickson; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 03, 2022 | Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF GARY HUNT AND KATHRYN DICKSON | ||
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to Compel (Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on )) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel (Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on 05/02/2022)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Leave ((Plaintiff's Motion)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Leave ((Plaintiff's Motion)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on )) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on 05/02/2022)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Kip C. Corely (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Joshua Clark; On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. on |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Kathryn Dickson (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Gary Hunt (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Rhonda Jessum Regarding Request for Clark Entry of Default; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Mountains Recreation Conservation Authority (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment | ||
September 29, 2022 | Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF RHONDA JESSUM REGARDING REQUEST FOR CLARK ENTRY OF DEFAULT | ||
September 29, 2022 | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) | ||
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
September 26, 2022 | hearing | Reset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM |
|
September 26, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave (Plaintiff's Motion) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
September 26, 2022 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
September 26, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply Defendant County of Los Angeles Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Compel Joinder of Necessary Parties; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Hearings set for September 30,...) | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Hearings set for September 30,...) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 26, 2022 | hearing | Reset - Court Unavailable, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
September 26, 2022 | hearing | Reset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion to Compel Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM |
|
September 26, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
September 26, 2022 | hearing | Reset - Court Unavailable, Hearing on Motion for Leave (Plaintiff's Motion) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
September 26, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: HEARINGS SET FOR SEPTEMBER 30,...) | ||
September 26, 2022 | Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER | ||
September 26, 2022 | Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL JOINDER OF NECESSARY PARTIES | ||
September 26, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: HEARINGS SET FOR SEPTEMBER 30,...) OF 09/26/2022 | ||
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Address for Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant) updated | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant): First Name: blank; Last Name: blank; Organization Name: Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant); Carol Morrison (Defendant); Gary Morrison (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 21, 2022 | Answer | ||
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Signed and Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Inderdyne, LLC aka Grant Kennedy aka APN: 4448-027-059 (Defendant) |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply to Defendant County's Opposition to Plaintiff Jessum's Leave to Amend Complaint; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on )) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on 05/02/2022)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to Compel (Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on )) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel (Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on 05/02/2022)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
September 20, 2022 | Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANT COUNTY'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF JESSUM'S LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT |
|
|
September 20, 2022 | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) | ||
September 20, 2022 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion to Compel Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on 05/02/2022) |
|
September 20, 2022 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on 05/02/2022) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant County Of Los Angeles' Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To Amend Complaint; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Opposition - DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT | ||
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant); Service Cost: 266.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Carol Morrison (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Gary Morrison (Defendant); Service Cost: 266.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Konopaske (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 266.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Ann Wisniewski (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 266.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); Service Cost: 266.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Carol Morrison (Defendant); Service Cost: 266.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Grant Kennedy (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: Yes |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Grant Kennedy (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 266.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Gary Morrison (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Konopaske (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: Yes |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Ann Wisniewski (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 266.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
September 14, 2022 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
September 14, 2022 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
September 14, 2022 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Ann Wisniewski (Defendant) |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Konopaske (Defendant) |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: The Trust of Gary and Carol Morrison (Defendant) |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Carol Morrison (Defendant) |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Clark (Defendant) |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Grant Kennedy (Defendant) |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Gary Morrison (Defendant) |
|
August 22, 2022 | Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) | ||
July 07, 2022 | Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND | ||
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amend; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint 2nd; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant); Joshua Clark (Defendant); Grant Kennedy (Defendant) et al. |
|
July 07, 2022 | Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT 2ND | ||
July 05, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM |
|
July 05, 2022 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
July 05, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference) | |
July 05, 2022 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
July 05, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
July 05, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
July 05, 2022 | Minute Order - (AMENDED) | ||
July 05, 2022 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Trial Setting Conference |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application Trial Scheduling ...) | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application - Trial Scheduling Requests: Filed By: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: |
|
June 09, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application Trial Scheduling Requests scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Trial Scheduling Requests) - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Trial Scheduling Requests) - Held - Motion Denied Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
June 09, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TRIAL SCHEDULING ...) | ||
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application Trial Scheduling ...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SCHEDULING REQUESTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
June 08, 2022 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SCHEDULING REQUESTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES | ||
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SCHEDULING REQUESTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application - Trial Scheduling Requests; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
June 07, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application Trial Scheduling Requests scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
June 07, 2022 | Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION - TRIAL SCHEDULING REQUESTS | ||
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application - Trial Scheduling Requests Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition TO MOTION FOR AMENDED ANSWER; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties: removed | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D., causes Partial dismissal pertaining ONLY to the Quiet Title Cause of Action |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition TO COMPEL JOINDER; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 17, 2022 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR AMENDED ANSWER | ||
May 17, 2022 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO COMPEL JOINDER | ||
May 17, 2022 | Request for Dismissal | ||
May 17, 2022 | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | ||
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO COMPEL JOINDER) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO MOTION FOR AMENDED ANSWER) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FO...) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Leave NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; AND DECLARATION OF WARREN WELLEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF: As To Parties: removed | |
May 16, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Joinder (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FO...) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION TO COMPEL JOINDER; DECLARATIONS OF WARREN WELLEN, ARNEL DULAY, AND ROBERT CASTILLO IN SUPPORT: As To Parties changed from Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) to Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) | |
May 16, 2022 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer (Filed by Los Angeles County on ) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
May 16, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FO...) | ||
May 16, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FO...) OF 05/16/2022 | ||
May 16, 2022 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FO...) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FO...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 03, 2022 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference) | |
May 03, 2022 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
May 03, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) | ||
May 03, 2022 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 03, 2022 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Trial Setting Conference |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Leave NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; AND DECLARATION OF WARREN WELLEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION TO COMPEL JOINDER; DECLARATIONS OF WARREN WELLEN, ARNEL DULAY, AND ROBERT CASTILLO IN SUPPORT; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 02, 2022 | Motion for Leave - MOTION FOR LEAVE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; AND DECLARATION OF WARREN WELLEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF | ||
May 02, 2022 | Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION TO COMPEL JOINDER; DECLARATIONS OF WARREN WELLEN, ARNEL DULAY, AND ROBERT CASTILLO IN SUPPORT | ||
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (NOTICE OF MOTION; MOTION TO COMPEL JOINDER; DECLARATIONS OF WARREN WELLEN, ARNEL DULAY, AND ROBERT CASTILLO IN SUPPORT) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF; AND DECLARATION OF WARREN WELLEN IN SUPPORT THEREOF) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
December 21, 2021 | Notice of Ruling | ||
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Filed by Plaintif...) |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Filed by Plaintiff) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Filed by Plaintif...) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department N Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication ((Filed by Plaintiff)) - Held Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication ((Filed by Plaintiff)) - Held Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Summary Adjudication: Filed By: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: |
|
December 16, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION (FILED BY PLAINTIF...) | ||
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Filed by Plaintif...) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication ((Filed by Plaintiff)) - Held Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Filed by Plaintif...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication |
|
December 16, 2021 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Trial Setting Conference |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication ((Filed by Plaintiff)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication ((Filed by Plaintiff)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department N Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
December 10, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication ((Filed by Plaintiff)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
December 10, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
December 10, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
December 10, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication ((Filed by Plaintiff)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
December 08, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Filed by Plaintiff) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review) | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
December 08, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
December 08, 2021 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Filed by Plaintiff) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM |
|
December 08, 2021 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 08, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Date and Time Change; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
December 07, 2021 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
December 07, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE OF COURT DATE AND TIME CHANGE | ||
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Court Date and Time Change) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Court Date and Time Change) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant); Mailing Date: ; Cost Waived: No |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Errata Correction of Reply to County's Opposition to Jessum MSA; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to County Opposition to MSA; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to County's Opposition to Jessum MSA (corrected); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ERRATA CORRECTION OF REPLY TO COUNTY'S OPPOSITION TO JESSUM MSA | ||
December 03, 2021 | Reply - REPLY TO COUNTY OPPOSITION TO MSA | ||
December 03, 2021 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
December 03, 2021 | Reply - REPLY TO COUNTY'S OPPOSITION TO JESSUM MSA (CORRECTED) | ||
December 03, 2021 | Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) | ||
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of Errata Correction of Reply to County's Opposition to Jessum MSA) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply (to County Opposition to MSA) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply (to County's Opposition to Jessum MSA (corrected)) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply (to County Opposition to MSA) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of Errata Correction of Reply to County's Opposition to Jessum MSA) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply (to County's Opposition to Jessum MSA (corrected)) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Objection Written Objections to County Opposition Evidence; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2021 | Objection - OBJECTION WRITTEN OBJECTIONS TO COUNTY OPPOSITION EVIDENCE | ||
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Objection (Written Objections to County Opposition Evidence) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Objection (Written Objections to County Opposition Evidence) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADNDICATION: As To Parties: removed | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice OF ERRATA; CORRECTED COPIES OF: 1. Declaration of Arnel Dulay 2. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 25, 2021 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
October 25, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA; CORRECTED COPIES OF: 1. DECLARATION OF ARNEL DULAY 2. DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF ERRATA; CORRECTED COPIES OF: 1. Declaration of Arnel Dulay 2. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF ERRATA; CORRECTED COPIES OF: 1. Declaration of Arnel Dulay 2. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADNDICATION; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 15, 2021 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
October 15, 2021 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADNDICATION | ||
October 15, 2021 | Separate Statement | ||
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADNDICATION) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADNDICATION) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition (TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation - No Order Stipulation to Alternative Briefing Schedule Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
June 09, 2021 | Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO ALTERNATIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation to Alternative Briefing Schedule Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation to Alternative Briefing Schedule Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Adjudication) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 28, 2021 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
May 28, 2021 | Notice of Ruling | ||
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application for Permission to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication for Declaratory Relief Cause of Action as to Los Angeles County: Filed By: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Exceed Page Limit) | |
May 27, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Exceed Page Limit scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Rafael A. Ongkeko, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Exceed Page Limit) - Held Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Exceed Page Limit) - Held Judge: Rafael A. Ongkeko |
|
May 27, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT) | ||
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Exceed Page Limit)) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 27, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N, Rafael A\. Ongkeko, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Exceed Page Limit) - Held Judge: Rafael A. Ongkeko |
|
May 27, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Exceed Page Limit) - Held Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Exceed Page Limit)) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 26, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Exceed Page Limit scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition Defendant County Of Los Angeles Opposition To Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application To Exceed Page Limit For Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application for Permission to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication for Declaratory Relief Cause of Action as to Los Angeles County: As To Parties changed from Los Angeles County (Defendant) to Los Angeles County (Defendant) | |
May 26, 2021 | Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Defendant County Of Los Angeles Opposition To Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application To Exceed Page Limit For Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Adjudication) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Defendant County Of Los Angeles Opposition To Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application To Exceed Page Limit For Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Adjudication) Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application for Permission to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication for Declaratory Relief Cause of Action as to Los Angeles County; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
May 25, 2021 | Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF CAUSE OF ACTION AS TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY | ||
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (for Permission to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication for Declaratory Relief Cause of Action as to Los Angeles County) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (for Permission to Exceed Page Limit for Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication for Declaratory Relief Cause of Action as to Los Angeles County) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference) | |
April 13, 2021 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
April 13, 2021 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
April 13, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication (Filed by Plaintiff) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 13, 2021 | Notice of Ruling | ||
April 13, 2021 | Request for Judicial Notice | ||
April 13, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) | ||
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
April 13, 2021 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 13, 2021 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Trial Setting Conference |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department STL-C MSC Timeslot (Judge James R. Dunn) MSC Timeslot (Judge James R. Dunn) |
|
January 20, 2021 | hearing |
in Department STL-C MSC Timeslot (Judge James R\. Dunn) |
|
January 20, 2021 | hearing |
in Department STL-C, James R\. Dunn, Presiding MSC Timeslot (Judge James R\. Dunn) Judge: James R. Dunn |
|
January 20, 2021 | hearing |
Department STL-C at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 MSC Timeslot |
|
October 26, 2020 | hearing | MSC Timeslot Judge James R. Dunn scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at STL-C | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Mandatory Settlement Conference;) | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Mandatory Settlement Conference;) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
October 26, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE;) OF 10/26/2020 | ||
October 26, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE;) | ||
October 26, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Mandatory Settlement Conference;) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Mandatory Settlement Conference;)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Mandatory Settlement Conference;)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re Mandatory Settlement Conference;) of 10/26/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 09, 2020 | Notice of Ruling | ||
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Laura Thais Jacobson (Attorney): Middle Name changed from T. to Thais | |
October 08, 2020 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Address for Laura Thais Jacobson (Attorney) updated | |
October 08, 2020 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Trial Setting Con...) | |
October 08, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
October 08, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; TRIAL SETTING CON...) | ||
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Trial Setting Con...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 08, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued |
|
October 08, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
October 08, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication; Trial Setting Con...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 08, 2020 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication |
|
October 08, 2020 | hearing |
Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Trial Setting Conference |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
September 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
September 02, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
September 02, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
September 02, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
September 02, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | On the Cross-Complaint filed by Kenneth R. Chiate on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Kenneth R. Chiate as to Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request for Dismissal: As To Parties changed from Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) to Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) | |
August 14, 2020 | Request for Dismissal | ||
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Cross-Complainant) |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N Non-Jury Trial (with an estimate of 5 days) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Non-Jury Trial (with an estimate of 5 days) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
July 20, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N Non-Jury Trial (with an estimate of 5 days) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
July 20, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Non-Jury Trial (with an estimate of 5 days) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
July 07, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
July 07, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | On the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. as to Kenneth R. Chiate |
|
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 05, 2020 | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | ||
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
April 30, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
April 30, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel |
|
April 28, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel |
|
April 28, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
April 27, 2020 | Request for Dismissal | ||
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
April 16, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
April 16, 2020 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
April 16, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
April 16, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020 | ||
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 16, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Court Order Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/16/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
April 10, 2020 | Substitution of Attorney | ||
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
April 07, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
April 07, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party |
|
March 17, 2020 | Notice of Ruling | ||
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
March 17, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party |
|
March 17, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
March 11, 2020 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
March 11, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
March 11, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss) | |
March 11, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial with an estimate of 5 days scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
March 11, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Held Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Held Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
March 11, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS) | ||
March 11, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Held Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 05, 2020 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
March 03, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 03, 2020 | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order | ||
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Dismissal; Filed by: Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
February 27, 2020 | Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL | ||
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Dismissal) Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Dismissal) Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
January 15, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
January 15, 2020 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
January 06, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
January 03, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant); As to: Kenneth R. Chiate (Cross-Complainant); Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Declaration of Rhonda Jessum Regarding Meet and Confer Requirements; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant); As to: Kenneth R. Chiate (Cross-Complainant); Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Separate Statement | ||
January 02, 2020 | Request for Judicial Notice | ||
January 02, 2020 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RHONDA JESSUM REGARDING MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENTS | ||
January 02, 2020 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
January 02, 2020 | Motion for Summary Judgment | ||
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Declaration of Rhonda Jessum Regarding Meet and Confer Requirements) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration (Declaration of Rhonda Jessum Regarding Meet and Confer Requirements) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
December 05, 2019 | Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY | ||
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Change of Handling Attorney) Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Change of Handling Attorney) Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss Only if Quiet Titlie Cause of Action (Without Prejudice) for Only Defnednat Kenneth R Chiate; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 04, 2019 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
December 04, 2019 | Motion to Dismiss - MOTION TO DISMISS ONLY IF QUIET TITLIE CAUSE OF ACTION (WITHOUT PREJUDICE) FOR ONLY DEFNEDNAT KENNETH R CHIATE | ||
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss (Only if Quiet Titlie Cause of Action (Without Prejudice) for Only Defnednat Kenneth R Chiate) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss (Only if Quiet Titlie Cause of Action (Without Prejudice) for Only Defnednat Kenneth R Chiate) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
November 19, 2019 | hearing |
in Department N Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
November 19, 2019 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction |
|
August 15, 2019 | hearing |
in Department N Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction |
|
August 15, 2019 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Address for Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) updated | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 18, 2019 | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information | ||
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 08, 2019 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 08, 2019 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial with an estimate of 5 days scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
July 08, 2019 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
July 08, 2019 | Request for Judicial Notice | ||
July 08, 2019 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) | ||
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 08, 2019 | hearing |
in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Craig D. Karlan |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
July 05, 2019 | Case Management Statement | ||
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 03, 2019 | Case Management Statement | ||
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kenneth R. Chiate (Cross-Complainant) |
|
June 21, 2019 | Case Management Statement | ||
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Cross-Complainant) |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of unavailability; Filed by: Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 30, 2019 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | ||
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of unavailability) Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of unavailability) Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
May 28, 2019 | Motion to Dismiss | ||
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 23, 2019 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 22, 2019 | Answer | ||
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation; Signed and Filed by: Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation: Filed By: Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
April 02, 2019 | Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION | ||
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief, Quiet Title to Real Property, Defamation/Slander of Title, Permanent Injunctive Relief, and Deed legal Description Reformation Based on Scrivener's Error: Status Date changed from to ; As To Parties changed from Los Angeles County (Defendant), Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) to Los Angeles County (Defendant), Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) | |
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant); Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event | First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief, Quiet Title to Real Property, Defamation/Slander of Title, Permanent Injunctive Relief, and Deed legal Description Reformation Based on Scrivener's Error; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant); Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- Request Request for Notice of Lis Pendens: As To Parties: removed | |
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Request For Notice Of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Rhonda Jessum's Response to Defendant and Cross-Complainant Kenneth R. Chiate's Special Interrogatories - Set One; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2019 | Notice - (AMENDED) | ||
March 22, 2019 | Response - (AMENDED) | ||
March 22, 2019 | Notice of Lis Pendens - (AMENDED) | ||
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request For Notice Of Lis Pendens Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff and Cross-Defendant Rhonda Jessum's Response to Defendant and Cross-Complainant Kenneth R. Chiate's Special Interrogatories - Set One Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lis Pendens Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of unavailability; Filed by: Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2019 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | ||
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of unavailability) Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice (Notice of unavailability) Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant); Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2019 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 15, 2019 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Dismiss scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 15, 2019 | Motion to Dismiss | ||
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Form Interrogatories - General; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2019 | Response - RESPONSE TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL | ||
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response (to Form Interrogatories - General) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response (to Form Interrogatories - General) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Form Interrogatories - General; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response (to Form Interrogatories - General) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response (to Form Interrogatories - General) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Cross-Complainant Request for Special Interrogatories; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Response to Admissions Requested By Cross-Complainant; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 06, 2019 | Response - Response to Cross-Complainant Request for Special Interrogatories | ||
March 06, 2019 | Response - Response to Admissions Requested By Cross-Complainant | ||
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response (to Admissions Requested By Cross-Complainant) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response (to Cross-Complainant Request for Special Interrogatories) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response (to Admissions Requested By Cross-Complainant) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response (to Cross-Complainant Request for Special Interrogatories) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant); As to: Kenneth R. Chiate (Cross-Complainant) |
|
March 04, 2019 | Answer | ||
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Cross-Defendant) |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
February 28, 2019 | Proof of Service by Mail | ||
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
February 08, 2019 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
February 07, 2019 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
February 07, 2019 | Demurrer - without Motion to Strike | ||
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Los Angeles County (Defendant) |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, QUIET TITLE, NUISANCE, CONVERSION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; Filed by: Kenneth R. Chiate (Cross-Complainant); Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant); As to: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
February 04, 2019 | Cross-Complaint - CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, QUIET TITLE, NUISANCE, CONVERSION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF | ||
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, QUIET TITLE, NUISANCE, CONVERSION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF Filed by Kenneth R. Chiate (Cross-Complainant); Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Request Request for Notice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 16, 2019 | Request - Request Request for Notice of Lis Pendens | ||
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request (Request for Notice of Lis Pendens) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request (Request for Notice of Lis Pendens) Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant); Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 07, 2019 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Updated -- First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief, Quiet Title to Real Property, Defamation/Slander of Title, Permanent Injunctive Relief, and Deed legal Description Reformation Based on Scrivener's Error: Status Date changed from to | |
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff); As to: Los Angeles County (Defendant); Kenneth R. Chiate (Defendant) |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse | |
January 07, 2019 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
January 07, 2019 | Summons - Summons on Complaint | ||
January 07, 2019 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
January 07, 2019 | Complaint - (AMENDED) | ||
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
First Amended Complaint for Declaratory Relief, Quiet Title to Real Property, Defamation/Slander of Title, Permanent Injunctive Relief, and Deed legal Description Reformation Based on Scrivener's Error Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Rhonda L. Jessum, Ph.D. (Plaintiff) |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk |
|