Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Berglund Mark, South Bay Restaurant Group Inc., Raymundo Ana, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Hong Mi Hyang, Mitchell Timothy Paul, against Berglund Mark, South Bay Restaurant Group Inc. Dba Samba Brazilian Steakhouse A California Corporation, represented by Gutierrez Gigi R., Lamprou Chrisoula, Kennedy Kevin P, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2019 |
CategoryPremise Liability (E.G., Dangerous Conditions Of Property, Slip/Trip And Fall, Dog Attack, Etc.) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Ruling; Filed by: South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike; Filed by: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; Filed by: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: October 11, 2023Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: October 03, 2023Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: February 21, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 21, 2019Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: February 21, 2019Complaint
Date: February 21, 2019Other - - Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates
Date: February 26, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: April 12, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: March 20, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT - JURY AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: April 12, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: April 12, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 16, 2019Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 24, 2019Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: October 17, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM
Date: October 21, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE
Date: November 05, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: January 14, 2020Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
Date: February 07, 2020Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: February 21, 2020Objection - OBJECTION MARK BERGLUND JELD-WEN, INC. V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: February 24, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: February 24, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: February 24, 2020Answer
Date: February 24, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: June 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS DUE TO EMERGENCY ORDERS RE:...)
Date: September 17, 2020Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM DEPOSITION
Date: September 21, 2020Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: October 16, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: November 12, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (...)
Date: November 13, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: December 02, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: January 06, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: January 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: January 21, 2021Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: February 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: December 29, 2021Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: July 19, 2022Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer
Date: August 25, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: September 12, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: September 28, 2022Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT, SOUTH BAY RESTAURANT GROUP, INC. DBA SAMBA BRAZILIAN STEAKHOUSE'S REPLY
Date: September 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)
Date: September 26, 2022Notice - PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL
Date: November 10, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed by South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Default entered as to Mark Berglund; On the Complaint filed by Ana Raymundo on
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Mi Hyang Hong (Attorney)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff); As to: Mark Berglund (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Objection MARK BERGLUND JELD-WEN, INC. V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION; Filed by: Mark Berglund (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Mark Berglund (Defendant); As to: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Mark Berglund (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00On the Complaint filed by Ana Raymundo on , Default entered on , Vacated - .
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Reply to Opposition to Motion to Amend the Complaint; Filed by: Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike) Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-12T00:00:00Objection (MARK BERGLUND JELD-WEN, INC. V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION) Filed by Mark Berglund (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-09-28T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Amend the Complaint) Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Mark Berglund (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Timothy Paul Mitchell (Attorney)
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER) Filed by South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Amend (Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint) Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amen...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel) Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Rescheduling Hearings due to Emergency Orders Re:...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order) Filed by South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-11-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by Mark Berglund (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by South Bay Restaurant Group, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Ana Raymundo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Mark Berglund (Defendant)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Deposition)
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-04-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER)
Date: 2020-06-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Rescheduling Hearings due to Emergency Orders Re:...))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE))
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Unavailability of Counsel)
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice (of change of handling attorney within firm)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Stipulation to Set Aside Default
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (...))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-09-21T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Set Aside Default)
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Declaration (of Service)
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00Objection (MARK BERGLUND JELD-WEN, INC. V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION)
Date: 2020-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-06-24T00:00:00Notice (Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Or Order)
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.