Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
De Leon Sonia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Altman Bryan Charles, Morse Amy-Lyn, Mikhov Steve, Wilson Scot Donaldson, against De Leon Sonia, Kia Motors America Inc., represented by Chinery Jacqueline Bruce, Lehrman Kate S., Tallent Erin, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Monica Bachner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management79 days |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions154 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: SONIA DE LEON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: SONIA DE LEON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SONIA DE LEON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Ruling on Submitted Matter]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No.4; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No.11; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.6 To Prohibit Testimony; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Jury Instructions JOINT; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.5; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No.2; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.9; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.7 To Prohibit Testimony; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 1; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Special Verdict JOINT PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Witness List UPDATED JOINT WITNESS LIST; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Exhibit List JOINT; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Witness List FURTHER UPDATED JOINT WITNESS LIST; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Kia's Motion in Limine No.16; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Kia's Motion in Limine No. 13; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Kia's Motion in Limine No.14; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Status Report STATUS REPORT RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Trial Brief MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff); Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions NO. 16; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Jury Instructions (given); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 17 re other customer complaints; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Motion for New Trial; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Objection KA's Objections to Proposed Judgment; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: April 03, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 03, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: April 03, 2019Complaint
Date: April 03, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: April 08, 2019Demand for Jury Trial
Date: April 24, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: April 24, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: May 01, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: May 06, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 05, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: June 10, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: June 21, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: August 21, 2019Order - RULING
Date: September 04, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 04, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT, KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC., TO THE FOURT...)
Date: September 04, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: October 29, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: September 24, 2019Separate Statement
Date: November 21, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF’S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 29, 2019Request for Refund / Order
Date: November 18, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 23, 2020Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 21, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: January 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF DEFENDANT, KIA MOTORS AMERICA, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: January 23, 2020Order - RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER
Date: January 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER]
Date: January 24, 2020Separate Statement
Date: February 26, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 06, 2020Order - RULING
Date: March 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 23, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/23/2020
Date: March 23, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 28, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/28/2020
Date: April 28, 2020Separate Statement
Date: May 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: May 07, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: June 26, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 06, 2020Summary of the Case
Date: July 27, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))
Date: August 03, 2020Separate Statement
Date: August 20, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE OF A PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE
Date: August 25, 2020Trial Brief - JOINT TRIAL PLAN [PURSUANT TO THE COURT’S OCTOBER 30, 2020 MINUTE ORDER]
Date: December 01, 2020Order - RULING
Date: September 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MOTION OF PLAINTIFF, SONIA DE LEON, TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPE...)
Date: September 10, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/30/2020
Date: October 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: October 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE REGARDING TRIAL PROCEDURES)
Date: December 07, 2020Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 07, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4
Date: December 10, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.7 TO PROHIBIT TESTIMONY
Date: December 10, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.5
Date: December 10, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.11
Date: December 10, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.8
Date: December 10, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.10
Date: December 10, 2020Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: December 18, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: December 10, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6 TO PROHIBIT TESTIMONY
Date: December 10, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3
Date: December 10, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2
Date: December 10, 2020Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO.9
Date: December 10, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: December 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: December 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: December 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6
Date: December 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7
Date: December 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: December 21, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: December 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT KIA MOTORS AMERICA,...)
Date: December 22, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: December 29, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: December 28, 2020Amended Complaint; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff); As to: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: SONIA DE LEON (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Separate Statement; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.10; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Statement of the Case; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Ruling; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Witness List JOINT; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine No.8; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Request BY PLAINTIFF TO USE A POWERPOINT IN OPENING STATEMENT; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No.3; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT LIST OF STIPULATED FACTS
Date: December 30, 2020Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT
Date: December 30, 2020Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTIONS BY PLAINTIFF TO KIA’S PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: December 30, 2020Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS JOINT
Date: December 30, 2020Statement of the Case
Date: December 30, 2020Exhibit List
Date: December 30, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/03/2021
Date: March 03, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: January 05, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: February 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 03, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 09, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE REGARDING TRIAL PROCEDURES)
Date: April 09, 2021Special Verdict - SPECIAL VERDICT JOINT PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM
Date: April 14, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: April 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: April 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 19, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/19/2021
Date: April 19, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 29, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 23, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2021
Date: April 29, 2021Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: May 06, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 18, 2021Brief - BRIEF UPDATED JOINT TRIAL PLAN
Date: June 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))
Date: May 12, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: July 02, 2021Witness List - WITNESS LIST FURTHER UPDATED JOINT WITNESS LIST
Date: July 07, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: July 02, 2021Witness List - WITNESS LIST UPDATED JOINT WITNESS LIST
Date: July 07, 2021Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT
Date: July 07, 2021Status Report - STATUS REPORT STATUS REPORT RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: July 07, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: July 07, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO KIA'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.14
Date: September 15, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 15, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO KIA'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: September 15, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT KIA’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8
Date: September 15, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT KIA’S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15
Date: September 15, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO KIA'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO.16
Date: September 15, 2021Opposition - OPPOSITION STATEMENT BY PLAINTIFF RE DEFENDANT KIA'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10
Date: September 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 28, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: September 28, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 01, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: October 12, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 14, 2021Trial Brief - TRIAL BRIEF MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: October 15, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS PLANTIFF’S [PROPOSED] SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION NO. 6
Date: October 15, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: October 18, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 18, 2021Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17 RE OTHER CUSTOMER COMPLAINTS
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EVIDENCE CODE SECTION 402 HEARING (ANTHONY MICALE).)
Date: October 18, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 21, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS NO. 16
Date: October 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)
Date: October 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: October 25, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: October 26, 2021Special Verdict
Date: October 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)
Date: October 27, 2021Jury Instructions - JURY INSTRUCTIONS (GIVEN)
Date: October 27, 2021Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: October 27, 2021Objection - OBJECTION KA'S OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: November 15, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/15/2021
Date: November 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 15, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: December 06, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 06, 2021Brief - BRIEF BY PLAINTIFF RE KIA'S OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: December 13, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: December 16, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 16, 2021Notice of Lien
Date: December 21, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/05/2022
Date: January 05, 2022Notice of Lien
Date: December 22, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: March 29, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: March 29, 2022Order - RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER
Date: March 29, 2022Judgment - AMENDED JUDGMENT
Date: April 18, 2022Judgment
Date: April 18, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - (AMENDED)
Date: April 19, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER - F
Date: April 20, 2022Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: April 29, 2022Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: May 06, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: May 06, 2022Order - RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER
Date: June 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: June 22, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: June 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE 6.28.22 DE LEON NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER (COSTS) - F
Date: June 28, 2022Order - RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER
Date: June 28, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER
Date: June 28, 2022Abandonment of Appeal Submitted APP-005/107 CR-137/145
Date: July 05, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER (AMENDED JUDGMENT) - F
Date: July 06, 2022Complaint
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-04-03T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice (of Case Management Conference)
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Demurrer to the Fourth and Fifth Causes of Action of Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Demurrer of Defendant, Kia Motors America, Inc., to the Fourt...))
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Notice (of Motion to Strike Portions Of Plaintiff?s First Amended Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Request for Refund / Order
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/23/2020)
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Defendant, Kia Motors America, for Protective Order))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00Order (Confidential Protective Order)
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Ruling on Submitted Matter])
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Lien; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Brief by Plaintiff Re Kia's Objections to Proposed Judgment; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Amended Judgment (Civil Unlimited); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Updated -- Judgment: Filed By: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff); As to: Kia Motors America, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-03-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of , Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-28T00:00:00Ruling on Submitted Matter; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Sonia De Leon (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued NOA: B321056; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Demurrer of Defendant, Kia Motors America, Inc., to First Ame...))
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/23/2020)
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-03-23T00:00:00Answer (KIA MOTORS AMERICA, INC.?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/28/2020)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/07/2020)
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-23T00:00:00Request (BY PLAINTIFF TO USE A POWERPOINT IN OPENING STATEMENT)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Request (BY PLAINTIFF TO PERMIT ALL COUNSEL TO GIVE A BRIEF MINIOPENING STATEMENT BEFORE VOIR DIRE)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Objection (Of Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. To Plaintiff?s Special Jury Instructions)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Objection (OBJECTIONS BY PLAINTIFF TO KIA?S PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTIONS)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Witness List (JOINT)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Jury Instructions (JOINT)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Joint List Of Stipulated Facts)
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Kia Motors America, Inc., ...))
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2021-02-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/03/2021)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Kia Motors America, Inc., ...))
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Regarding Trial Procedures))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Special Verdict (JOINT PROPOSED SPECIAL VERDICT FORM)
Date: 2021-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/19/2021)
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for an Order Compelling Vehicle Inspection to Take Place on Friday, May 7, 2021
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/29/2021)
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order Granting Ex Parte Compelling VI on May 7, 2021)
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Kia Motors America, Inc., ...))
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference and Trial Procedures Conference))
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Brief (Updated Joint Trial Plan)
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Witness List (UPDATED JOINT WITNESS LIST)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Witness List (FURTHER UPDATED JOINT WITNESS LIST)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Kia America, Inc., for: 1...))
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Status Report (STATUS REPORT RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE)
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Declaration (of Jacqueline Bruce Chinery in Support of Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 15)
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT KIA?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (Statement by Plaintiff Re Defendant KIA's Motion in Limine No. 10)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Kia's Motion in Limine No. 13)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT KIA?S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Kia's Motion in Limine No.16)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Reply (In Support Of Motion In Limine No. 13 Of Kia America, Inc.; Declaration Of Erin Tallent)
Date: 2021-09-21T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Kia's Motion in Limine No.14)
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2021-10-01T00:00:00Jury Instructions (PLANTIFF?S [PROPOSED] SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION NO. 6)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions (DEFENDANT?S [PROPOSED] SPECIAL JURY INSTRUCTION NO. 15)
Date: 2021-10-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing Regarding Jury Instructions and Scheduling of Evidenc...))
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 17 re other customer complaints)
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Trial Brief (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Objection (by Plaintiff to Defendant's Special Jury Instruction No. 15 Negative Equity)
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (JURY TRIAL;))
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-10-20T00:00:00Brief (-Defendant Kia America, Inc.s Designations Re Thomas Leppers Deposition Testimony)
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions (NO. 16)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial in Progress))
Date: 2021-10-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial in Progress))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial in Progress))
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Jury Instructions ((given))
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Objection (KA's Objections to Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing Regarding Proposed Judgment))
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 11/15/2021)
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-12-06T00:00:00Brief (by Plaintiff Re Kia's Objections to Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2021-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2021-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Lien
Date: 2021-12-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing Regarding Proposed Judgment))
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/01/2022)
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Temporary Stay of Enforcement of Money Judgment
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing Regarding Proposed Judgments))
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Notice (KA's Notice of Intent to Move for Motion for JNOV.pdf)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/05/2022)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Opposition (OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT KIAS MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL)
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Defendant, Kia America, Inc. for Temp...))
Date: 2022-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2022-02-22T00:00:00Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: 2022-02-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/22/2022)
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: January 05, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENTS)
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: January 18, 2022Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: January 31, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/01/2022
Date: February 01, 2022Notice - NOTICE KA'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO MOVE FOR MOTION FOR JNOV.PDF
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 01, 2022Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: February 02, 2022Motion for New Trial
Date: February 10, 2022Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: February 10, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, KIA AMERICA, INC. FOR TEMP...)
Date: February 18, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT KIAS MOTION FOR A NEW TRIAL
Date: February 18, 2022Motion to Tax Costs
Date: February 22, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 22, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/22/2022
Date: March 22, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: March 25, 2022Separate Statement
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/16/2020)
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 7 of Defendant KMA re Subsequent Year Vehicle Registration)
Date: 2020-06-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice (OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ATTENDANCE OF A PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Motion of Plaintiff, Sonia De Leon, to Compel Motion to Compe...))
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Ruling
Date: 2020-09-10T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00JOINT TRIAL PLAN [PURSUANT TO THE COURT?S OCTOBER 30, 2020 MINUTE ORDER]
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/30/2020)
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.6 To Prohibit Testimony)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.4)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.5)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.7 To Prohibit Testimony)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Conference Regarding Trial Procedures))
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.11)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.8)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.10)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 1)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.9)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.3)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No.2)
Date: 2020-12-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for an Order to Continue Trial
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition by Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 3)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition by Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 4)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition by Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 5)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition by Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 7)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition by Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 1)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition by Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 6)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Opposition (Opposition by Plaintiff to Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 2)
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Defendant Kia Motors America,...))
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (KMA's Ex Parte for Order Compelling Vehicle Inspection on May 7, 2021)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.