Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SHELIAH WARD VS 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC.
On August 02, 2019 a premise liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 02, 2019
Last Refreshed
October 21, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Premise Liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
Unknown disposition
Status
Unknown
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
November 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling DEFEMDANT 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC.?S NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
November 04, 2021 | Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING DEFEMDANT 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC.’S NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | ||
November 03, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 19STCV27132 Hearing Date: November 3, 2021 Dept: 27 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT SHELIAH WARD, Plaintiff(s), vs. 24 HOUR FITN... | |
November 03, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings: Filed By: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
November 03, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) | ||
November 03, 2021 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
October 27, 2021 | Request for Judicial Notice | ||
October 27, 2021 | Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS | ||
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply (TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS) Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition Opposition to motion for judgment on the Pleading; Filed by: SHELIAH WARD (Plaintiff) |
|
October 22, 2021 | Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADING | ||
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Opposition to motion for judgment on the Pleading) Filed by SHELIAH WARD (Plaintiff) |
|
September 30, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2021 | Request for Judicial Notice | ||
September 29, 2021 | Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | ||
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Bankruptcy Discharge; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant); As to: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
March 02, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE | ||
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Bankruptcy Discharge) Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
January 29, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
January 29, 2021 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial |
|
January 15, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
January 15, 2021 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
December 14, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
December 14, 2020 | hearing | Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
December 14, 2020 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Stay - Bankruptcy | |
December 14, 2020 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
December 14, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY) | ||
December 14, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 12/14/2020 | ||
December 14, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Held Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 12/14/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 14, 2020 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Appearance Case Review |
|
July 14, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
July 14, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
July 14, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
July 07, 2020 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
July 07, 2020 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
July 07, 2020 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
June 18, 2020 | hearing | Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
May 08, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 08, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 08, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
April 15, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
April 15, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order re: COVID-19) | |
April 15, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
April 15, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: COVID-19) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
April 15, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
April 15, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
April 15, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19) OF 04/15/2020 | ||
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: COVID-19) of 04/15/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order re: COVID-19)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 15, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Court Order Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Court Order Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
April 02, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
April 02, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production) - Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
April 02, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories) - Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories) - Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories) - Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production) - Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
March 18, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
March 18, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion was rescheduled to 01:30 PM | |
March 18, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
March 18, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 18, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion was rescheduled to 01:30 PM | |
March 18, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion was rescheduled to 01:30 PM | |
March 18, 2020 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) | ||
March 18, 2020 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020 | ||
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/18/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 18, 2020 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Court Order Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Edward B\. Moreton, Presiding Court Order Judge: Edward B. Moreton |
|
February 28, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Special Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
February 28, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Form Interrogatories scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
February 28, 2020 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff's Responses to Demand for Production scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
February 28, 2020 | Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion | ||
February 28, 2020 | hearing |
Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
February 19, 2020 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant); As to: SHELIAH WARD (Plaintiff) |
|
November 20, 2019 | Answer | ||
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 15, 2019 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES | ||
August 15, 2019 | PI General Order | ||
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk |
|
August 05, 2019 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4B | |
August 05, 2019 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4B | |
August 05, 2019 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 4B | |
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 4B Spring Street Courthouse | |
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SHELIAH WARD (Plaintiff); As to: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SHELIAH WARD (Plaintiff); As to: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: SHELIAH WARD (Plaintiff); As to: 24 HOUR FITNESS USA, INC. (Defendant) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
August 02, 2019 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
August 02, 2019 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by SHELIAH WARD (Plaintiff) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by SHELIAH WARD (Plaintiff) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by SHELIAH WARD (Plaintiff) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|