Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TAMARA ABRAAMIAN BOUKHANIAN VS KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN, INC.
On September 05, 2019 a premise liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Kristin S. Escalante presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 05, 2019
Last Refreshed
January 24, 2024
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Serena R. Murillo;Category
Premise Liability (e.g., dangerous conditions of property, slip/trip and fall, dog attack, etc.) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Premises Liability
Case Outcome Type
Unknown disposition
Status
Want of Prosecution
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR:
Negligence – Premises Liability
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 19STCV31361 Hearing Date: January 24, 2024 Dept: 61 Defendant Citimortgage, Inc.s Motion for Spoliation Sanctions is DENIED.. Defendant to give notice. I. MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS M... | |
September 01, 2022 | hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
September 01, 2022 | hearing |
Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by Tamara Abraamian Boukhanian on , entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action |
|
March 04, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
March 04, 2021 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 04, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 03/04/2021 | ||
March 04, 2021 | Order - Dismissal | ||
March 04, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL) | ||
March 04, 2021 | hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial |
|
March 04, 2021 | hearing |
Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Final Status Conference) | |
February 18, 2021 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 18, 2021 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) | ||
February 18, 2021 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 02/18/2021 | ||
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 29, Serena R\. Murillo, Presiding Final Status Conference - Held Judge: Serena R. Murillo |
|
February 18, 2021 | hearing |
Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 18, 2021 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Final Status Conference) of 02/18/2021) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 18, 2021 | hearing |
Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
February 18, 2021 | hearing |
Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Address for Armen Aslanian (Attorney) null | |
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 02, 2019 | PI General Order | ||
October 02, 2019 | hearing |
PI General Order Filed by Clerk |
|
October 02, 2019 | hearing |
Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 05, 2019 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tamara Abraamian Boukhanian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Tamara Abraamian Boukhanian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 05, 2019 | hearing | Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 | |
September 05, 2019 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 2 | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 2 Spring Street Courthouse | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tamara Abraamian Boukhanian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) |
|
September 05, 2019 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
September 05, 2019 | Complaint | ||
September 05, 2019 | hearing |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
September 05, 2019 | hearing |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Tamara Abraamian Boukhanian (Plaintiff) |
|
September 05, 2019 | hearing |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Tamara Abraamian Boukhanian (Plaintiff) |
|
September 05, 2019 | hearing |
Complaint Filed by Tamara Abraamian Boukhanian (Plaintiff) |
|