Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
xxxxxxx I. xxxxxx and xxxxxx H. xxxxxx
On July 30, 2015 a dissolution w/ minor case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. Judge Charles F. Adams presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 30, 2015
Last Refreshed
December 01, 2021
Filing Location
Santa Clara County, CA
Filing Court House
Santa Clara
Judge
Category
Dissolution w/ Minor
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Judgment on the Pleadings
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2021 | hearing | Conference: Status | |
March 08, 2021 | hearing | Request for Order: Quash | |
February 24, 2021 | hearing | Conference: Status | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference 2/24/21 D65 | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 28, 2021 | hearing | Request for Order: Mod Support | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Quash Request for Order to Quash Two Subpoenas Duces Tecum & for Case Management Order |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities Respondent's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Resp.'s Request for Order to (1) Quash or Modify Two Subpoenas and (2) Issue Case Management Order |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice: Status Conference | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail oah (p; r; Katharine Teuschler) |
|
December 07, 2020 | hearing |
Request for Order: Other/no fee
Judge: Charles F. Adams |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing heard 10/14/20 Judge: Roberta S. Hayashi |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation: Temporary Judge/Commissioner | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Motion in Limine, One |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections to Evidence Offered by Avner to Request for Order for Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Order: Submitted Matter | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply Brief Reply to Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply to Objections to Evidence in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Objection |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion: In Limine | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter from D71 Judge: Jillian M. Laxton |
|
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 27, 2020 | hearing | Request for Order: Mod Spousal Support | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
October 14, 2020 | hearing |
Motion: Other (no fee)
Judge: Jillian M. Laxton |
|
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 14, 2020 | hearing | Request for Order: Mod Support | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Request: Judicial Notice in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodgment in support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Joseph Kibre in support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of David Majchrzak in support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mirit Neman in support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Order: Other (No Fee) | |
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference 9/1/20 D73
Judge: Charles F. Adams |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference 9/1/20 D73 Judge: Charles F. Adams |
|
September 01, 2020 | hearing |
Conference: Status
Judge: Charles F. Adams |
|
September 01, 2020 | hearing |
Request for Order: Other w/fee
Judge: Charles F. Adams |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | FL-NTC OF CHANGE IN COURT DATE | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail sf oah (p; r; Katharine Teuschler) |
|
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
August 25, 2020 | hearing |
Request for Order: Attorney Fees
Judge: Charles F. Adams |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 25, 2020 | hearing | Request for Order: Mod Spousal Support | |
August 25, 2020 | hearing | Request for Order: Other w/fee | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee cont stc set for 08/11/20 |
|
August 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic stmt of position; reply mpa re Davenport; reply mpa re rfo; dec iso reply mpa to mod support |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Short Form Order After Hearing (dcss) heard 8/10/2020 Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support HRG 8/25/20 - Reply Declaration of xxxxxx xxxxxx In Support of RFO to Modify Support |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Remittitur - Dismissal H048132 |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply Brief HRG 8/25/20 - Respondent's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Resp. Request for Ordrer Modifying Support |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement HRG 8/25/20 - Respondent's Statement of Position |
|
August 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply Brief HRG 8/25/20 - Respondent's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Resp. Davenport RFO |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic resp decl, memo p/a |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POS; Responsive Declaration to Request for Order 8/25/20 830am D73 Judge: Charles F. Adams |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order 8/25/20 830am D73
Judge: Charles F. Adams |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic stmt, supp decl |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
August 10, 2020 | hearing |
Motion: Other (no fee)
Judge: Jillian M. Laxton |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement Respondent's Statement of Position |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Supplemental of xxxxxx xxxxxx in Support of RFO to Modify Support and in Compliance with Notice to Produe and Appear |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee soc |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation: Temporary Judge/Commissioner | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Response to Gov NOM 8/10/20 115pm D71 Judge: Jillian M. Laxton |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic declaration of payment history |
|
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic; RFO; MPA; Dec ISO Exparte | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail; RFO; MPA; Dec ISO Exparte | |
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic (P) i&e filed 6/16/20; minute order dated 6/30/20 9am; minute order dated 6/30/20 130pm Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) (p) ost denied [set by judge], other: 6/30/20 hrg reopen evidence rsp's income correction |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Continuance order for continuance of child support issues |
|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail order for continuance of child support issues |
|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 30, 2020 | hearing | Conference: Status | |
June 30, 2020 | hearing | Request for Order: TRO | |
June 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement of Position, re: hrg 06/30/20 |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Attorney Fees RFO Re: Atty's Fees & Costs; Other: 271, 2030, Davenport , Case Mgmt |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail rsp's rfo (p; Katharine Teuschler) |
|
June 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities Memo P&A iso (R) Req for Davenport Order Under CA Family Code Sections 271, 2030, et seq. |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Reply of ptr, 6/30/20 9am D73 Judge: Charles F. Adams |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic reply dec |
|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic sstatus or case resolution conference questionnaire |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service responsive dec to rfo; rsp's opposition to ptr's rfo of pendente lite a/f; ost |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail responsive dec to rfo; rsp's opposition to ptr's rfo of pendente lite a/f; ost |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
June 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Other opposition to rfo of pendente lite atty fees & costs; ost: for 6/30/2020 court date |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Income and Expense Declaration |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Opposition Declaration of David Majchrzak In Support of Opposition to Request for Order of Pendente Lite |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Opposition to Request for Order of Pendente Lite Attorney's Fees and Costs; Order Shortening Time |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Opposition Declaration of Joseph Kibre in Support of Opposition to Request for Order of Pendente Lite |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service opposition to rfo, dec of Joseph ISO to rfo, dec of david ISO rfo |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Income and Expense Declaration |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement Updated Statement of Position of Joseph Kibre for June 30, 2020 Status Conference |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice ntc of telephonic appearance |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail mtn (p; r; Katharine Teuschler) |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (Modification) (r) modify c/s s/s |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail temp ex parte orders; rfo; p's & a's; i&e; dec iso ex parte spp for orders |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing (dcss) c/s |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice: Association/Co-Counsel Notice: Association Co-Counsel |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
May 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Designation: Respondent | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: TRO (p) ost denied [set by judge], teco denied, other: (1) enforcement of order 8/15/19 & 7/8/19, (2) pendente lite atty fees, (3) ost [incl. mpa iso ptr's request for pendente lite atty fees; dec of Katherine D Teuschler iso ptr's request for atty fees] |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Appeal: Clerk's Notice of Appeal | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Designation: Appellant appellants ntc designating record on appeal w/attachment |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail appellants ntc designating record on appeal w/attachment |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Notice of appeal |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Notice of appeal |
|
April 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal - Court of Appeal | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | FL-NTC OF CHANGE IN COURT DATE | |
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Opposition of Joseph Kibre to Ex Parte Application of Deborah Avner, Declaration of Richard B. Kendall in Opposition to Ex Parte Application |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Opposition Declaration of Richard B. Kendall in Opposition to Ex Parte Application |
|
April 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Opposition of Joseph Kibre to Ex Parte Application of xxxxxxx Avner for Order Shortening Time |
|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk Rejection Letter | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | FL-NTC OF CHANGE IN COURT DATE | |
March 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone [Richard B. Kendall, Nary Kim, and Joseph Kibre] | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | FL-NTC OF CHANGE IN COURT DATE | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) Motion: Reconsideration |
|
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities in support of motion to reconsider order filed 03/02/2020 |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to cont status conf set for 02-18-20 at 1:30pm to 04-07-20 at 1:30pm |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 18, 2020 | hearing | Conference: Status | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail and electronic of declaration, statement and ntc. of intent |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Nary Kim |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone richard B. Kendall, Nary Kim, and Joseph Kibre |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement of Position of Joseph Kibre for February 18, 2020 Status Conference |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing 12/17/19 Hrg |
|
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Findings and Ordr After Hrg |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 17, 2019 | hearing | Request for Order: Other w/fee | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Ptnr's Supplement to Atty Fee Req Re: Submission of Judicial Council Form |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Supplemental Ptnr's Supp to Atty Fee Req Re: Submission of Judicial Counsel Form FL-157 Per Leave of Court |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities ptr's memo p&a in opp to rsp's mtn to quash ptr's subpoena duces tecum |
|
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 03, 2019 | hearing | Request for Order: Other w/fee | |
December 03, 2019 | hearing | Motion: Joinder | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail stmt position of J.Kibre for 120319 status conference; Dec of J.Kibre; Dec of N.Kim (POS electronic) |
|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Dec of N.Kim (12/03/19 hrg) |
|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Dec of J.Kibre (12/03/19 hrg) |
|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement stmt position of J.Kibre for 120319 status conference |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Request: Produce Income and Expense Declaration After Judgment |
|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Request: Produce Income and Expense Declaration After Judgme | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal rfo with attachments; rsp's memo p&a iso rfo; propsed order quashing third party; blank responsive dec |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail rfo with attachments; rsp's memo p&a iso rfo; propsed order quashing third party; blank responsive dec |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic Income and Expense Declaration | |
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration |
|
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other Answer to Pleading on Joinder |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities Memo P and A |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) Quash&Sanctions |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice: Reassignment of Case | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: Peremptory Challenge 170.6 w/pos |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities in support of opposition & opposition to plaintiff's RFO & Sanctions |
|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit: Peremptory Challenge CCP 170.6 | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement/Receipt | |
September 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal RFO and supporting documents |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document: Other (P) Amended Pleading on Joinder |
|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 09, 2019 | hearing | Motion: Joinder | |
September 09, 2019 | hearing | Request for Order: Other w/fee | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document: Other (P) Pleading on Joinder |
|
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion: Joinder (P) |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail nrps (p; r; katharine Teuschler) |
|
August 29, 2019 | hearing | Request for Order: Other w/fee | |
August 29, 2019 | hearing | Motion: Joinder | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support - DCSS In | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail FL-320 |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order partial resolution and cont of hearing re: rfo enforcement |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order permanent s/s, c/s and atty fees and costs |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Request to continue hrg; order on request to continue hrg; notice of motion and declaration of joinder |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Request to continue hrg; order on request to continue hrg; notice of motion and declaration of joinder |
|
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail RFO , request for joinder |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order |
|
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to request for order | |
July 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities Respondent's Memorandum: Points and Authorities in support of opposition and opposition to plaintiff's request for order and sanctions |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone 8/1/19 9am D77 Judge: James E. Towery |
|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic ntc of intent to appear by telephone |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic; RFO; Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
July 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Reissuance c/f 7/22/19 to 8/29/2019 [incl. notice of unavailable of counsel] |
|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Order of Temprary Judge Submitted Issues | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Ntc of mtn for joinder, etc |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail ntc of mtn & dec for joinder (07/22 hrg date) |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail RFO |
|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Undocumented Action ptr $30 court reporter fee paid |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion & Declaration for Joinder | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) **$30 COURT REPORTER FEE MUST BE PAID PRIOR TO THE COURT HEARING. ** (p) Other: enforcement of jgmt filed 10/25/2018; enforcement of CCP 664.6 settlement-jv Judge: Helen E. Williams |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration: In Support | |
April 29, 2019 | hearing |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: James E. Towery |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Settlement Conference P'S MSC Statement |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice to Attend Hrg 5/14/19 and Produce Docs. | |
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic ntc to attend trial and produce docs. |
|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Consent Re electronic filing and service |
|
April 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Special Interrogatories Propounded on the Petitioner Deborah xxxxxx by Respondent xxxxxx xxxxxx Set Three |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Respondent xxxxxx xxxxxx Re Additional Special Interrogatories | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail rsp's request for production of doc. propounded to ptr / set 2 |
|
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Production of Documents Propounded to PTR / Set 2 |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Ptr I&E dec, ptr 2018 W-2, Ptr 2017 Income Tax Return |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic demand for exchange of expert witness info for trial |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Regarding Payment of Support - DCSS In | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee SOC |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee Sharon L. Roper |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail send notice for hrg. |
|
January 16, 2019 | hearing | Hearing: Review | |
January 16, 2019 | hearing | Conference: Status | |
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference for 1/16/19 hrg |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Status Conf Questionnaire |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Substitution: Attorney | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 08, 2018 | hearing | Request for Order: Other w/fee | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Jdgmnt, Dec under UCCJEA, Dec for Default, Appearnce, Stip. & Waivers, & Stip & Waiver of Final Dec of Disclosure |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail RFO, Oppositio to Motion to compel Records |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Reply MPA |
|
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document: Other Reply Declaration |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee Edward Mills |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Seek Work Order |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee JSM |
|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order R-re: 11/8/18 hrg-mag |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Judgment w/POS | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration for default filed | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration: Under UCCJEA | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement HRG 10/30/18 Stmnt of Issues for Mediation |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POS Re P's Judicially Supervised Mediation Stmnt on OP |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POS Re P's Judicially Supervised Mediation Stmnt on Redding |
|
October 24, 2018 | hearing | Hearing: Review | |
October 24, 2018 | hearing | Conference: Status | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement Wife's Mediation Statement of Issues |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Status or Case Resolution Conference Questionnaire |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference HRG: 10/23/18 Status or Case Resolution Conference Questionnaire |
|
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic rfo re: mtn to compel; mpa iso ptr's mtn to compel records sought in ntc to appear and produce and request for sanctions; sepaarate statement iso ptr's mtn to compel records sought in ntc to appear and produce and request for sanctions; dec of atty Katherin Teuschler iso ptr's mtn to compel records sought in ntc to appear and produce and request for sanctions; dec of atty Michelle Forres iso ptr's mtn to compel records sought in ntc to appear and produce and request for sanctions |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POES Re RFO re MTC on OP |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement Separate Statement |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic RFO; Declaration. |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) Motion to Compel |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration: In Support | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Limited Scope Representation | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic stip for confidentiality and protective order; order thereon |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order confidentiality and protective order; order thereon |
|
August 06, 2018 | hearing |
Hearing: Other
Judge: James E. Towery |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice: Limited Scope Representation HRG 8/20/18 Notice: Limited Scope Representation |
|
July 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order cont |
|
June 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Substitution of Attorney |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order: Qualified Domestic Relations Simpson, Thacher & BVartlett LLP Cash or Deferred Plan for Senior Counsel |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Petition (Family) POS Re Ntc to R to Attend Trial on OC |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Fax POS (Fax) Re Ntc to R to Attend Trial on OC |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 14, 2018 | hearing | Hearing: Other | |
June 14, 2018 | hearing | Hearing: Review | |
June 14, 2018 | hearing | Request for Order: Mod Support | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order cont 6/11/18 hearings |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order HRG 6/14/18; Responsive Declaration to Request for Order |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Fax rfo re: change in s/s, c/s eeo, imputation of income |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (Modification) **$30 COURT REPORTER FEE MUST BE PAID PRIOR TO THE COURT HEARING. ** (p) modify c/s s/s, other: (1) employment efforts order, (2) imputation of income |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration for Petitioner |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic i&e dec |
|
May 14, 2018 | hearing | Hearing: Other | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections xxxxxx xxxxxx's evidentiary objections to the dec of xxxxxxx xxxxxx iso request for atty fees dated 4/12/18 |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order Hearing 5/14/18 | |
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration xxxxxx xxxxxx's responsive dec to request for fc2030, 271 atty fees against ptr; mpa; dec of xxxxxx xxxxxx and Mirit Neman |
|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic notice of unavailable counsel |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POS Re Atty Fees Brief, Atty Dec,P's Dec,I&E on Kibre&Neman |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Atty Dec ISO Request for Atty Fees/Costs |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply Brief Attorney's Fees Brief |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support Dec ISO RFO Re Atty Fees/Costs |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Party) separately filed compendium of exhibits to xxxxxx xxxxxx's request for fc 2030, 271 atty fees against xxxxxxx I xxxxxx; dec of Joseph Kibre, Mirit Neman; xxxxxx xxxxxx (volume II) |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request xxxxxx xxxxxx's request for fc 2030, 271 atty fees against xxxxxxx I xxxxxx; dec of Joseph Kibre, Mirit Neman; xxxxxx xxxxxx (compendium of exhibits separately filed) |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Party) separately filed compendium of exhibits to xxxxxx xxxxxx's request for fc 2030, 271 atty fees against xxxxxxx I xxxxxx; dec of Joseph Kibre, Mirit Neman; xxxxxx xxxxxx (volume I) |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing heard 12/18/17 Judge: Rise Jones Pichon |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Stipulation to Temp Judge for Real Estate | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee Notice: Unavailability of Counsel |
|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Notice: Unavailability of Counsel |
|
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Undocumented Action court trial date 2/6/18 |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee heard 2/6/18 Judge: Mark H. Pierce |
|
February 06, 2018 | hearing |
Court Trial: Long Cause
Judge: Mark H. Pierce |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement per diem fees; trial 2/6/18; $350; w pos |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 06, 2018 | hearing | Request for Order: Mod Support | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation (R) to Temporary Judge for Real Estate (Settlement Officer Conference) |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Party) (R) Exhibit List (Party) |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic (R) Exhibit List, Stip to Temporary Judge for Real Estate re: Sale of Texas Residence |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Brief: Trial (R) |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic (R) Trial Brief, RSP s Witness List, RSP s Notice of Lodging RSP s Deposition Transcript & PTR s Deposition Transcript |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (R) of Lodging of PTR s Deposition Transcript |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POS Re Trial Brief & MPA, Witness & Exhibit List, Exhibits on OC |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (R) of Lodging of RSP s Deposition Transcript |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion: In Limine MIL to Exclude Undisclosed Exhibits and Witnesses |
|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Brief: Trial and Points and Authorities | |
January 22, 2018 | hearing |
Conference: Settlement
Judge: James E. Towery |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail POS Re P's FDD on OC |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POS RE MSC on Kibre & Neman |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POS Re P's MSC on OC |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Settlement Conference Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) (R) |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POS Re Ntc to Attend Trial on OC |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to R to Attend Trial and Produce Docs | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Notice: Change Address/Firm Name |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice: Change Address/Firm Name | |
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Statement: Settlement Conference hrg 1/22/18 |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List (Party) Exhibits to MSC |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 18, 2017 | hearing | Request for Order: Mod Support | |
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Other mtn to strike ptr's unauthorized memo of ps&as served 12/15/17 Judge: Rise Jones Pichon |
|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic mtn to strike ptr's unauthorized memo of ps&as served 12/15/17 Judge: Rise Jones Pichon |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POS Ntc of Intent,Mtn to Strike, MPA on Kibre & Neman |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities P's MPA RE R's RFO Modify Support |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections P's Obj and Motion to Strike R's Dec ISO RFO RE Modify Support |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service reply dec to rfo, xxxxxx xxxxxx's objection to ptr's 12/4/17 responsive dec, proposed order, ntc to appear by telephone |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections xxxxxx xxxxxx's objection to ptr's 12/4/17 responsive dec |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration reply dec to rfo, hrg 12/18/17 |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail POS Re Ntc Change of Address on OC |
|
December 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Change Address/Firm Name | |
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order Responsive Dec to RFO Re 12/18/17 Hearing |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic POS Re Responsive Dec to RFO, I & E on Kibre & Neman; hearing 12/18 9:00am |
|
November 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal Proof of Service RFPD#2,Special Rogs#1,P's Dec,Ntc to R on OC |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Reissuance cont rsp motion set for 11/27/17 |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Personal RFO filed under Seal; I&E; Memo P&A; Dec; Proposed Order |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order to ex parte w/pos |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order (Modification) (r) child support, spousal/partner support -evc |
|
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail sub of atty; hrg 5/4/17 @ 9:00am in D77
Judge: James E. Towery |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order cont of msc and trial |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Substitution of Attorney |
|
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re: division of fidelity retirement account; order thereon |
|
July 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Case Status | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee Jacqueline Anderson |
|
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order - No Fee Settlement Officer Conference |
|
June 15, 2017 | hearing | Request for Order: Other w/fee | |
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing heard 5/31/17 Judge: Thomas E. Kuhnle |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Objection to respondent motion to strike |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Objection to respondent motion to strike |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Reply |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Objection to and Motion to Strike petitioner's xxxxxxx xxxxxx's late served |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re: agreed protective order |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order hrg 6/15/17 |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Responsive Declaration to Request for Order |
|
May 31, 2017 | hearing |
Conference: Status
Judge: James E. Towery |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Fiduciary Duties and Remedies for Breach | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Notice of Fiduciary Duties and Remedies for Breach |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order release of funds from blocked Lex Machina account as advance community distribution for payment of 2016 taxes |
|
May 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing heard 5/4/17 Judge: Thomas E. Kuhnle |
|
May 04, 2017 | hearing |
Request for Order: Other w/fee
Judge: James E. Towery |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Proposed Proposed Order |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Objections and Motion to Strike... |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections and Motion to Strike..... |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Objection to Proposed Exhibit B |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections Objection to Declaration |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Petitioner's Reply Declaration |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail RFO.... |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Petitioner's Reply Declaration |
|
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Memorandum: Points and Authorities |
|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) for Equal distribution of Lex Machine Funds - see attachment 8 |
|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order Responsive Declaration to RFO; HRG 5/4/17 9:00a |
|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Appear by Phone | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone |
|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) Amended Declaration Regarding Service of Dec of Disclosure Final |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final - Amended) |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail amended final decl dislosure, hearing: 5/4/2017 @9:00am in D77 Judge: James E. Towery |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail rfo; hearing: 5/4/2017 @ 9:00am in D77 Judge: James E. Towery |
|
March 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) determination of support arrearages and repayment; payment of support by EFT |
|
February 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re: modification of discovery req and agreement to vacate 3/2/17 hearing |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic Resp. DEC to RFO |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order Resp. DEC to RFO; HRG 3/2/17 9:00a |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration DEC of ATTY Katharine Teuschler |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Electronic DEC of Kate Teuschler; P&A; Docs lodged under conditional seal |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities P&A in Opp. to MTN to Quash Deposition Subpoena |
|
February 15, 2017 | hearing |
Conference: Status
Judge: James E. Towery |
|
February 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re: payment of alternative resolution centers fees for mediation from blocked joint Lex machina Acct |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Amended Proof of Service |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Quash (r) other: to quash and/or modify employment business records subpoenas |
|
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Ex Parte application to issue and earnings assignment order, Child support case registry form, Original income withholding order/Notice for support. |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Order: Income Withholding for Support | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application: Ex Parte (No Fees) issue earnings assignment order |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Signed penalty of perjury and errata sheet... |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Substitution of Attorney |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing heard 11/14/16 Judge: Erica R. Yew |
|
November 14, 2016 | hearing | Request for Order: Other w/fee | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Missing Page from I&E e-received |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration Reply Declaration to Request for Order; Hearing 11/14/16 8:30a |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Other RFO ADDITIONAL PAGES INCLUDING EXHIBITS AND I&E |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order Responsive Dec to RFO; Hearing 11/14/16 9:00a |
|
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) | |
October 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail RFO; I&E |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Other (Fee Applies) Request for Order (Other) |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Income and Expense Declaration |
|
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Request: Trial | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney with pos served 8/26/16 Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request: Trial Request for Trial (Family Law) |
|
July 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Substitution: Attorney | |
June 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re: release of funds from blocked Lex Machina Acct as advance community distribution |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Questionnaire: Case Status/Resolution Conference | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order "reply" decl to rfo |
|
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Responsive Declaration to Request for Order | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: TRO (R) tro denied, a/f and costs, temp emergency court order, other: see attachment 8 |
|
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order exparte |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Pendency of Texas Child Custody Litigation |
|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document UCCJEA - Copy (Rsp) |
|
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous: Converted Document Response - Dissolution Copy |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) | |
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re pendente lite c/s and s/s; retroactive support, a/f |
|
December 17, 2015 | hearing |
Request for Order : Support
Judge: James E. Towery |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes Non-Criminal |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections rsp's opposition to ptr's motion in limine; memo of ps & as; decl of rsp's atty in support thereof |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections ptr's evidentary objections/motion to strike portions of decl of rsp's counsel |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion: In Limine | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Memorandum ptr's memo in reply, reply decl and reply decl of ptr's atty |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ptr's evidentary objections/motion to strike portions of decl of rsp's counsel |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service motion in limine |
|
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service ptr's memo in reply, reply decl and reply decl of ptr's atty |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for confidentiality and protective order; theron |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re: proceeds of pending sale/exchange of |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail responsive decl to rfo |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service I&E |
|
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration: Income and Expense | |
December 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
Responsive Declaration to Request for Order hrg 12/17/15 |
|
November 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration Text = of greene in support of ptr req for atty f/c Legacy Name = FL Declaration Decision = M Closed = 11/23/2015 |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Order: Child Support Text = (p)atty fees, other: notice requirements Legacy Name = FL Req for Ord:Support |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Income and Expense Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 10/15/2015 |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Response: Dissolution Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 10/14/2015 |
|
October 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Under UCCJEA Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 10/14/2015 |
|
September 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition: Amended Text = first Legacy Name = FL Amend Petition |
|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed Text = petition Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/02/2015 |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Petition: Dissolution w/minor Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2015 |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Residence Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2015 |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons: Issued/Filed Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2015 |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Bulk Scanned Documents Bulk Scan - 12-04-15 to 12-15-15 |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Under UCCJEA Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 07/30/2015 |
|
July 30, 2015 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |