Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Murfin Drilling Company, Inc. vs. Mai Oil Operations, Inc.
A Cv Other Contract case was filed in the jurisdiction of Trego County, KS.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 06, 2023
Last Refreshed
September 16, 2023
Filing Location
Trego County, KS
Category
CV Other Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PLE: Answer | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | INF: Information (Generic) | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOT: Summary Judgment | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOT: Notice - No Sheriff Service Required | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | INF: Information (Generic) | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | INF: Entry of Appearance | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | PLE: Answer - Counter | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | PLE: Answer - Counter | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORD: Order (Generic) | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | PLE: Amended Petition | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | ORD: Order (Generic) | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | RET: Return of Service | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORD: Order (Generic) | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | INF: Entry of Appearance | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOT: Notice - No Sheriff Service Required | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | PLE: Summons | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOT: Motion (Generic) | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PLE: Petition |