Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Giang, Sendy, Nisar, Gaurav, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bergmark, Rett D., against Deharo Ramirez Corp, Does 1 To 25, Inclusive, Nisar, Gaurav, Valenzuela, Crispin, represented by Millington, Kimberly A., Wood, Douglas K., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2021 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a personal injury, property damage, and wrongful death case filed by Sendy Giang against defendants Gaurav Nisar, Crispin Valenzuela, and Deharo Ramirez Corp. The case is filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Mate...
Cross Complaint
Date: April 01, 2021Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: January 25, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: March 04, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 06, 2021Complaint
Date: January 21, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: May 03, 2021Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 01, 2021Answer
Date: May 28, 202110 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: June 29, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: January 21, 2021Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: February 04, 2021ADR Referral
Date: June 03, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: February 05, 2021Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of
Date: February 09, 2021Summons Issued / Filed
Date: January 21, 2021Demand For Jury Trial
Date: March 04, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: May 24, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: May 10, 2021Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: July 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Complete ADR Process
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION AS TO COMPLAINT Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION AS TO COMPLAINT |
|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CMC - Failure to Comply - 90 day ADR | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
OSC Needs to be set Failure to Comply with ADR Neither Statement of Nonagreement, Request for Dismissal, or Notice of Settlement filed. |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
ADR Stipulation Follow Up 10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Referral | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer TO CROSS-COMPLAINT Answer TO CROSS-COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.