Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Flaherty James F. Iii, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Kennedy Tracey Adano, against Colony Capital Inc. Now Known As Digitalbridge Group Inc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Wilson Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryPetition To Compel/Confirm/Vacate Arbitration (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 23, 2021Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: October 12, 2021Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 12, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.