Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ VS KASRA MIZBAN, ET AL.
On January 22, 2021 a motor vehicle - personal injury/property damage/wrongful death (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge William A. Crowfoot presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 22, 2021
Last Refreshed
April 26, 2024
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Motor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
1 FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION NEGLIGENCE 2
23 SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION 24 NEGLIGENT ENTRUSTMENT
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Brief - BRIEF JOINT BRIEF FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE
Date: Apr 03, 2023Complaint
Date: Jan 22, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Jury Trial |
|
April 26, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: April 26, 2024 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez, v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion for Authorization of Taking Deposition HEARING DATE: 4/26/2024 ... | |
April 22, 2024 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Final Status Conference |
|
April 05, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: April 5, 2024 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion for a Protective Order HEARING DATE: 4/5/2024 Legal Standard A pa... | |
March 29, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: March 29, 2024 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez, v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion to Compel Further Responses HEARING DATE: 3/29/2024 Legal Stand... | |
March 15, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: March 15, 2024 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez, v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion to Compel Release of Unredacted DMV Records HEARING DATE: 3/15/... | |
March 01, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: March 1, 2024 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion for Sanctions HEARING DATE: 3/1/2024 Legal Standard Discovery San... | |
February 22, 2024 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Order DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN?S AND NASSER MIZBAN?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO RELEASE UNREDACTED RECORDS FROM THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES |
|
January 30, 2024 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Appointing Referee |
|
January 19, 2024 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal |
|
January 04, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | CASE NUMBER: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion for Terminating Sanctions HEARING DATE: 01/04/2024 Background On January 22, 2021, plaintiff Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) filed this action against defendants... | |
December 07, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions |
|
November 16, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) |
|
November 09, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) |
|
October 26, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: October 26, 2023 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion to Compel Initial Discovery Responses HEARING DATE: 10/26/2023... | |
October 26, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") |
|
October 26, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted |
|
October 20, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: October 20, 2023 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Docum... | |
October 20, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses |
|
October 19, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: October 19, 2023 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez, v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories HEARING D... | |
October 19, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses |
|
October 13, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: October 13, 2023 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez, v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories HEARIN... | |
October 13, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses for S...) | |
October 13, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses for Special Interrogatories (Set Three) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Mark A\. Young, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (for Special Interrogatories (Set Three)) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (for Special Interrogatories (Set Three)) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Mark A. Young |
|
October 12, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses To Request For Production Of Documents, Set One, To Cross-Defendant Gabriel Sanchez And Request For Monetary Sanctions; scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 12, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses To Request For Production Of Documents, Set One, To Cross-Defendant Veronica Garcia and Request For Monetary Sanctions; scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 12, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set One, To Cross-Defendant Gabriel Sanchez And Request For Monetary Sanctions; scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 12, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted Set One, To Cross-Defendant Gabriel Sanchez And Request For Monetary Sanctions; scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 12, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses To Special Interrogatories, Set One, To Cross-Defendant Veronica Garcia And Request For Monetary Sanctions; scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order) | |
October 12, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses To Special Interrogatories, Set One, To Cross-Defendant Gabriel Sanchez And Request For Monetary Sanctions; scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply Defendant Nasser Mizbans Reply To Plaintiffs Consolidated Opposition To Motions To Compel Further Responses To Defendants Form Interrogatories, Set Two, And Request For Production, Set One; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Mark A\. Young, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Mark A. Young |
|
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Notice Of Resetting Defendants Kasra Mizbans And Nasser Mizbans Motion For Terminating Sanctions Based Upon Plaintiffs Fraud Upon The; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
October 10, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Order DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN?S AND NASSER MIZBAN?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR COURT ORDER TO RELEASE UNREDACTED RECORDS FROM THE CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
October 10, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Order For Court Order To Release Unredacted Records From The California; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply To Plaintiffs Opposition Response To Motion To Compel Plaintiff Gabriel; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition Plaintiff?s Consolidated Opposition To Motions To Compel Form Interrogatories Set Two And Request For Production Set One, And Opposition To Request For Sanctions; Plaintiff?s Request For Sanctions; De; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
October 09, 2023 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Protective Order scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Response Plaintiff?s Response To Defendant Nasser Mizban?s Motion To Compel Response To Special Interrogatories Set Three & Opposition To Request For Sanctions; Memorandum Of Points & Authorities; Plaintiff?s; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (for Form Interrogatories (Set Two)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (for Form Interrogatories (Set Two)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
October 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 03, 2023 | hearing | There being no judge available this date, Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 03, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply Defendants Kasra Mizban?s And Nasser Mizban?s Reply In Further Support Of Their Motion For Terminating Sanctions Based Upon Plaintiff?s Fraud Upon The Court; Or In The Alternative, Issue Sanctions; An; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Informal Discovery Conference; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Objection Defendants Kasra Mizban?s And Nasser Mizban?s Objections To Plaintiff?s Opposition To And/Or Evidence In Support Of Plaintiff?s Opposition To Defendants? Motion For Terminating Sanctions Based Upon Pl; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
September 26, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
September 26, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Cross-Defendant) |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: VERONICA GARCIA (Cross-Defendant) |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition Plaintiff?s Opposition To Defendants Kasra Mizban And Nasser Mizban?s Motion For Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Cross-Complainant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Cross-Defendant) |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Cross-Complainant); As to: VERONICA GARCIA (Cross-Defendant) |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses To Special Interrogatories Set Five: Name Extension: To Special Interrogatories Set Five ; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion to Compel (DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN?S AND NASSER MIZBAN?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO CENTRO MEDICO OASIS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel (DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN?S AND NASSER MIZBAN?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO CENTRO MEDICO OASIS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
September 11, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Appointing Referee scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Order Motion for Order Appointing Referee; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 11, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
September 07, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
August 29, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Association of Attorney; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Cross-Defendant); VERONICA GARCIA (Cross-Defendant) |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | / Amended; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Protective Order; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
July 31, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Protective Order scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction: As To Parties: | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Association of Attorney: Filed By: Nasser Mizban (Defendant),Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Result: Withdrawn - Filed in Error ; As To Parties: |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Association of Attorney; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
July 10, 2023 | hearing | Jury Trial scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
July 10, 2023 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
July 10, 2023 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Mark A\. Young, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held Case Management Conference - Held Judge: Mark A. Young |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
July 06, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication |
|
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
June 26, 2023 | hearing | There being no judge available this date, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
June 15, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Case Management Conference |
|
June 14, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application To Specially Set And or Advance The Hearing Of Defendants Motion For Sanctions Against Plaintiff: Filed By: Kasra Mizban (Defendant),Nasser Mizban (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: |
|
June 14, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Specially Set And or Advance The Hearing Of Defendants Motion For Sanctions Against Plaintiff scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
June 14, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses for Form Interrogatories (Set Two) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
June 14, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses for Form Interrogatories (Set Two) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM | |
June 14, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Specially Set And or Advan...) | |
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Mark A\. Young, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Specially Set And or Advance The Hearing Of Defendants Motion For Sanctions Against Plaintiff) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Specially Set And or Advance The Hearing Of Defendants Motion For Sanctions Against Plaintiff) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Mark A. Young |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application To Specially Set And or Advance The Hearing Of Defendants Motion For Sanctions Against Plaintiff; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
June 13, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Specially Set And or Advance The Hearing Of Defendants Motion For Sanctions Against Plaintiff scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
June 13, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion for Order (Enforcing Compliance with Deposition Subpoena For Production of Business Records to Centro Medico Oasis) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion for Order (Enforcing Compliance with Deposition Subpoena For Production of Business Records to Centro Medico Oasis) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
June 13, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion for Order Enforcing Compliance with Deposition Subpoena For Production of Business Records to Centro Medico Oasis |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Cross-Defendant); VERONICA GARCIA (Cross-Defendant) |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Appendix Of Non-California Authorities In Support Of Defendants Kasra Mizban’s And Nasser Mizban’s Motion For Terminating Sanctions Based On Plaintiff’s Fraud Upon The Court; Or In The Alternative For; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibit List; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Of Andrew S. Hollins In Support Of Defendants’ Motion For Terminating Sanctions Against Plaintiff Gabriel Sanchez; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
June 07, 2023 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Order Enforcing Compliance with Deposition Subpoena For Production of Business Records to Centro Medico Oasis scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Cross-Defendant); VERONICA GARCIA (Cross-Defendant) |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Cross-Defendant); VERONICA GARCIA (Cross-Defendant); As to: Kasra Mizban (Cross-Complainant) |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Cross-Defendant); VERONICA GARCIA (Cross-Defendant) |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Cross-Defendant); VERONICA GARCIA (Cross-Defendant) |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two;) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two;) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
May 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: May 31, 2023 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez, v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion to Compel Second Session of Neuropsychological Examination HEARIN...
Judge: Timothy Lee Johnson |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Plaintiff To Attend Second Session Of Neuropsychological: Filed By: Nasser Mizban (Defendant),Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Lisa Marie Parker, CSR #13441; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff To Attend Second Sessio...) | |
May 31, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff To Attend Second Session Of Neuropsychological Examination scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Mark A\. Young, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff To Attend Second Session Of Neuropsychological Examination) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff To Attend Second Session Of Neuropsychological Examination) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Mark A. Young |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses To Special Interrogatories, Set Three, And Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff And His Attorneys Peter Hakim And Downtown L.A. Law Group; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
May 26, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses for Form Interrogatories (Set Two) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
May 26, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses for Special Interrogatories (Set Three) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
May 26, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses for Production of Documents (Set One) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set Two, And Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff And His Attorneys Peter Hakim And Downtown L.A. Law Group; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Separate Statement In Support Of Motion To Compel Plaintiff Gabriel Sanchez’s Responses To Special Interrogatories, Set Three, And Request For Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff And His Attorneys Peter Hakim And Downtown L.A. Law Group; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply Defendants Kasra Mizbans And Nasser Mizbans Reply To Plaintiff Gabriel Sanchezs Opposition To Defendants Motion To Compel Plaintiff To Attend Second Session Of Neuropsychological Examination; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ATTEND SECOND SESSION OF NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION OF PETER; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
May 11, 2023 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) | |
May 11, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on | |
May 11, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
May 11, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Mark A\. Young, Presiding Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held Judge: Mark A. Young |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Brief Joint Brief For Informal Discovery Conference: Name Extension changed from JOINT BRIEF FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE to Joint Brief For Informal Discovery Conference ; As To Parties: | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief JOINT BRIEF FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Cross-Complainant); As to: VERONICA GARCIA (Cross-Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
May 02, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO ATTEND SECOND SESSION OF NEUROPSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration Of Ari Kalechstein, Ph.D. In Support Of Defendants' Motion To Compel; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Plaintiff To Attend Second Session Of Neuropsychological; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
April 26, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted |
|
April 26, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") |
|
April 25, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
April 25, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...) | |
April 25, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two; scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
April 25, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Mark A\. Young, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two;) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two;) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Mark A. Young |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") (Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three) - Held - Motion Granted |
|
April 25, 2023 | hearing |
Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401 Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") |
|
April 25, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY...) | ||
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
April 20, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
April 19, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial or, in the Alternative, to Specially set the Hearing Date of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Case Management Conference) | |
April 19, 2023 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
April 19, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial (or, in the Alternative, to Specially set the Hearing Date of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial (or, in the Alternative, to Specially set the Hearing Date of Defendants' Motion for Summary Adjudication) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Mark A\. Young, Presiding Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Case Management Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Mark A. Young |
|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion to Continue (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion to Continue (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
April 19, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) | ||
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
April 14, 2023 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR | ||
April 12, 2023 | hearing | Updated -- Event scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Type changed from Hearing on Motion to Continue (name extension) to Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
April 06, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Mark A\. Young, Presiding Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held Judge: Mark A. Young |
|
April 06, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)) | ||
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Address for David Azizi (Attorney) customer request | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- David Azizi (Attorney): First Name changed from Farid to David; Last Name changed from YAGHOUBTIL to Azizi; Organization Name: DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2023 | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information | ||
April 04, 2023 | Case Management Statement | ||
April 03, 2023 | Brief - BRIEF JOINT BRIEF FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE | ||
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief JOINT BRIEF FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Address for Jang Kang (Attorney) updated | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Jang Kang (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Ropers Majeski PC to Messner Reeves LLP | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for Order Appointing Referee) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for Order Appointing Referee) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for Order Appointing Referee) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion for Order (Motion for Order Appointing Referee) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party |
|
March 17, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Appointing Referee scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on | |
March 17, 2023 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of moving party, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 10:00 AM | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING DISCOVERY REFEREE OFF CALENDAR; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
March 16, 2023 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING DISCOVERY REFEREE OFF CALENDAR | ||
March 14, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
March 13, 2023 | hearing | Updated -- Event scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M Type changed from Hearing on Motion to Compel (name extension) to Hearing on Motion for Order (name extension) | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 13, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO CENTRO MEDICO OASIS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
March 13, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
March 13, 2023 | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order | ||
March 13, 2023 | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) | ||
March 08, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: March 8, 2023 Dept: M CASE NAME: Sanchez v. Mizban, et al. CASE NO.: 21STCV02647 MOTION: Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint Motion for Leave to Amend Answe... | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
March 08, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff); GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ (Cross-Defendant); VERONICA GARCIA (Cross-Defendant) |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Hearin...) | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M, Mark A\. Young, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Held Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Held Judge: Mark A. Young |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department M Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) - Held Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) - Held |
|
March 08, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT; HEARIN...) | ||
March 08, 2023 | Cross-Complaint | ||
March 08, 2023 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
March 08, 2023 | Answer | ||
March 07, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
March 07, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 07, 2023 | hearing | Case Management Conference scheduled for in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
March 07, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses to Special Interrogatories, Set Three scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
March 07, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") Responses to Form Interrogatories, Set Two; scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 07, 2023 | Notice of Case Management Conference | ||
March 07, 2023 | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order | ||
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
February 24, 2023 | Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | ||
February 23, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Continue NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
February 23, 2023 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Deemed PI Complicated | |
February 23, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
February 23, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
February 23, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Appointing Referee scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department M | |
February 23, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order re: PI Complicated Transfer) | |
February 23, 2023 | hearing | Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: PI Complicated Transfer) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Santa Monica Courthouse in Department M - Hon. Mark A\. Young; Reason: Deemed PI Complicated | |
February 23, 2023 | hearing | Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Kerry Bensinger, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Kerry Bensinger |
|
February 23, 2023 | Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order | ||
February 23, 2023 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PI COMPLICATED TRANSFER) OF 02/23/2023 | ||
February 23, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PI COMPLICATED TRANSFER) | ||
February 21, 2023 | hearing | Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
February 17, 2023 | Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts | ||
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO CENTRO MEDICO OASIS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS;: Name Extension changed from DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO CENTRO MEDICO OASIS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF JANG KANG to DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO CENTRO MEDICO OASIS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; ; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) | |
February 15, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO CENTRO MEDICO OASIS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO CENTRO MEDICO OASIS; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; DECLARATION OF JANG KANG; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
February 15, 2023 | Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO CENTRO MEDICO O | ||
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PETER HAKIM, ESQ., EXHIBITS; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
February 06, 2023 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PETER HAKIM, ESQ., EXHIBITS | ||
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order ((1) Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; (2...) | |
February 03, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01:30 PM | |
February 03, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
February 03, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01:30 PM | |
February 03, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Kerry Bensinger, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Hearing on Motion for Leave (to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Judge: Kerry Bensinger |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion |
|
February 03, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ((1) HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT; (2...) | ||
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Order MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Order APPOINTING REFEREE: Name Extension changed from MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE to APPOINTING REFEREE ; As To Parties: | |
January 31, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Appointing Referee scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
January 31, 2023 | Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER APPOINTING REFEREE | ||
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBAN'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
January 27, 2023 | Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBAN'S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT | ||
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion for Order (MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LOS ANGELES CITY LAW, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST LOS ANGELES CITY LAW AND HADI RAMSEY, ESQ.) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion for Order (MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LOS ANGELES CITY LAW, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST LOS ANGELES CITY LAW AND HADI RAMSEY, ESQ.) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition To Motion for Leave to File Cross Complaint; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
January 23, 2023 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT | ||
January 09, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied | |
January 09, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Kylie Shepherd #13756); Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL SANCHEZS RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND HIS ATTORNEYS PETER HAKIM AND DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL SANCHEZS RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET THREE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND HIS ATTORNEYS PETER HAKIM AND DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
January 09, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion re: DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SETS TWO, TO PLAINTIFF GABRIEL SANCHEZ ADMITTED AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND HIS ATTORNEYS PETER HAKIM AND DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROU; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL SANCHEZS RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND HIS ATTORNEYS PETER HAKIM AND DOWNTOWN L.A. LAW GROUP; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Motion Denied Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions) | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Defendants Kasra Mizban and Nasser Mizban’s Notice of Motion and Motion for Terminating Sanctions, Issue Sanctions, and/or Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s Counsel: Filed By: Nasser Mizban (Defendant),Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Result: Denied ; Result Date: |
|
January 09, 2023 | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE (KYLIE SHEPHERD #13756) | ||
January 09, 2023 | Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL SANCHEZS RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCT | ||
January 09, 2023 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) | ||
January 09, 2023 | Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL SANCHEZS RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET THREE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY | ||
January 09, 2023 | Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL SANCHEZS RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR | ||
January 09, 2023 | Motion re: - MOTION RE: DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SETS TWO, TO PLAINTIFF GABRIEL SANCHEZ ADMITTED AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST | ||
December 27, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Order MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LOS ANGELES CITY LAW, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST LOS ANGELES CITY LAW AND HADI RAMSEY, ESQ. scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging Defendants Kasra Mizban and Nasser Mizban's Notice of Lodging of December 9, 2022 Hearing Transcript; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
December 14, 2022 | Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBAN'S NOTICE OF LODGING OF DECEMBER 9, 2022 HEARING TRANSCRIPT | ||
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Order DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LOS ANGELES CITY LAW; FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST LOS ANGELES CITY LAW: Name Extension changed from DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LOS ANGELES CITY LAW, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST LOS ANGELES CITY LAW AND HA to DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LOS ANGELES CITY LAW; FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST LOS ANGELES CITY LAW ; As To Parties: | |
December 13, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Order MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LOS ANGELES CITY LAW, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST LOS ANGELES CITY LAW AND HADI RAMSEY, ESQ. scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Order DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LOS ANGELES CITY LAW, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST LOS ANGELES CITY LAW AND HA; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
December 13, 2022 | Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR AN ORDER ENFORCING COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS TO LOS ANGELES CIT |
|
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions) | |
December 09, 2022 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01:30 PM
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Continued Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Continued Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
December 09, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
December 09, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) | ||
December 09, 2022 | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore | ||
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Continue DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: Name Extension changed from NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION to DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION ; As To Parties: | |
December 06, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Continue NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
December 06, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Continue NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
December 06, 2022 | Motion to Continue - MOTION TO CONTINUE DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SPECIALLY SET THE HEARING DATE OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR | ||
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition PLAINTIFF’S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Brief Supplemental Brief in Further Support of Motion of Defendants Kasra Mizban and Nasser Mizban for Terminating Sanctions, Issues Sanctions and/or Monetary Sanctions against Plaintiff and Plaintiffs Counsel; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
November 18, 2022 | Brief - BRIEF SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBAN FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUES SANCTIONS AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND P | ||
November 18, 2022 | Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF’S SUPPLEMENTAL OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL | ||
November 04, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: November 4, 2022 Dept: 27 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ, Plaintiff(s), vs. KASRA ... | |
November 04, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Defendants Kasra Mizban’s and Nasser Mizban’s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer to Plaintiff’s Complaint: Exact Name changed from DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT to Defendants Kasra Mizban’s and Nasser Mizban’s Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer to Plaintiff’s Complaint; As To Parties: removed | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions) | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Defendants Kasra Mizban and Nasser Mizban’s Notice of Motion and Motion for Terminating Sanctions, Issue Sanctions, and/or Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s Counsel: Exact Name changed from DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS, AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL to Defendants Kasra Mizban and Nasser Mizban’s Notice of Motion and Motion for Terminating Sanctions, Issue Sanctions, and/or Monetary Sanctions Against Plaintiff and Plaintiff’s Counsel; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff); Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
November 04, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01:30 PM
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Continued Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Held - Continued Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
November 04, 2022 | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore | ||
November 04, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS) | ||
November 02, 2022 | hearing |
Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)) | |
November 02, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC)) | ||
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
October 31, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 28, 2022 | Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND | ||
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 25, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBAN’S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS, AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL; MEMORANDUM; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
October 24, 2022 | Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBAN’S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS, AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTI | ||
October 21, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: October 21, 2022 Dept: 27 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ, Plaintiff(s), vs. KASRA ... | |
October 21, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ’S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS;: Filed By: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: ; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Held Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
October 21, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY")) | ||
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
October 17, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBANS NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZS RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Response PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBAN’S MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION. SET THREE AND OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR SANCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
October 14, 2022 | Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBANS NOTICE OF NO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZS RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY | ||
October 14, 2022 | Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF’S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBAN’S MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION. SET THREE AND OPPOSITION TO REQUEST FOR SANCTION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; PLAI | ||
October 13, 2022 | hearing |
Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 12, 2022 | Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts | ||
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBANS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 04, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
October 04, 2022 | Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint | ||
October 04, 2022 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBANS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT | ||
September 30, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: Exact Name: DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; As To Parties: removed | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Jang H. Kang ISO Defendants Motion for Summary Adjudication - Part 2; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 30, 2022 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG ISO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION - PART 2 | ||
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Jang H. Kang ISO Defendants Motion for Summary Adjudication - Part 1; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT: Name Extension: blank; Exact Name: DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT; As To Parties: removed | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendants Kasra Mizban's And Nasser Mizban's Compendium Of Exhibits in Support of Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 29, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Leave Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
September 29, 2022 | Separate Statement | ||
September 29, 2022 | Request for Judicial Notice | ||
September 29, 2022 | Proof of Service - No Service | ||
September 29, 2022 | Motion for Summary Adjudication - DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
September 29, 2022 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG ISO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION - PART 1 | ||
September 29, 2022 | Exhibit List - DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN'S AND NASSER MIZBAN'S COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
September 28, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Leave Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Memo of P&A In Support Thereof; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration of Jang H. Kang in Support of Defendants Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 28, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 01:30 PM
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS, AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS, AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL: Exact Name: DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS, AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
September 28, 2022 | Motion for Leave - DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN’S AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT | ||
September 28, 2022 | Declaration - DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | ||
September 28, 2022 | Motion for Terminating Sanctions - DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBAN’S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS, AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF | ||
September 28, 2022 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ISSUE SANCTIONS, AND/OR MONETARY SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAI | ||
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
September 06, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
August 31, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: August 31, 2022 Dept: 27 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ, Plaintiff(s), vs. KASRA M... | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Held Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication - Held Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Summary Adjudication: Filed By: Nasser Mizban (Defendant),Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: ; As To Parties: removed |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication;) | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - Cesar Rodriguez #13269; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
August 31, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
August 31, 2022 | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE - CESAR RODRIGUEZ #13269 | ||
August 31, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION;) | ||
August 31, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S REPLY/RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AND PLAINTIFF’S ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN DISPUTE: Name Extension: blank; Exact Name: DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S REPLY/RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AND PLAINTIFF’S ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN DISPUTE; As To Parties: removed | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: Name Extension: blank; Exact Name: DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; As To Parties: removed | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF’S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION: Name Extension: blank; Exact Name: DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF’S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; As To Parties: removed | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S REPLY/RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AND PLAINTIFF’S ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN DISPUTE; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
August 26, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Objection DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF’S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ’S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS: Name Extension: PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ’S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ’S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET FOUR, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS: Name Extension: PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ’S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET FOUR, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) | |
August 26, 2022 | Separate Statement | ||
August 26, 2022 | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses | ||
August 26, 2022 | Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
August 26, 2022 | Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF’S EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
August 26, 2022 | Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBAN’S REPLY/RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AND PLAINTIFF’S ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN DISPUTE | ||
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Response PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AND PLAINTIFFS ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN DISPUTE; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PETER HAKIM, ESQ. EXHIBITS; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
August 18, 2022 | Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF PETER HAKIM, ESQ.; EXHIBITS | ||
August 18, 2022 | Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AND PLAINTIFFS ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS IN DISPUTE | ||
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
July 22, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Non-Jury Trial Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ’S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS;: Name Extension: PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ’S RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET THREE, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS;; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) | |
July 14, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
July 14, 2022 | Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion | ||
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
July 08, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
June 29, 2022 | hearing |
Updated -- Event scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
June 29, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Signed and Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
June 29, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 10:00 AM
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
June 29, 2022 | [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO | ||
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
June 08, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of moving party, Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
June 07, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: June 7, 2022 Dept: 27 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ, Plaintiff(s), vs. KASRA MIZB... | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
June 07, 2022 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial) | |
June 07, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) | ||
June 07, 2022 | Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 06/07/2022 | ||
June 07, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
June 06, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
May 31, 2022 | Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL | ||
May 31, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBAN AND NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 27, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of moving party, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 10:00 AM
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 27, 2022 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, Michael E\. Whitaker, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial Date) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial Date) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
May 27, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date) | |
May 27, 2022 | hearing |
Pursuant to the request of moving party, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 08:30 AM
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 27, 2022 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date: Filed By: Kasra Mizban (Defendant),Nasser Mizban (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: |
|
May 27, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE) | ||
May 27, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 27, Michael E\. Whitaker, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial Date) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: Michael E. Whitaker |
|
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date)) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 26, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application to Continue the Trial Date; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
May 26, 2022 | Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE | ||
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (to Continue the Trial Date) Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 13, 2022 | Notice of Ruling | ||
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 09, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 21STCV02647 Hearing Date: May 9, 2022 Dept: 27 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ, Plaintiff(s), vs. KASRA MIZBA... | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Held - Motion Denied Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 09, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 09, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint) | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint: Filed By: Nasser Mizban (Defendant),Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Result: Denied; Result Date: |
|
May 09, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT) | ||
May 09, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint - Held - Motion Denied Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint)) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 04, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 04, 2022 | Motion to Continue Trial Date | ||
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue Trial Date Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
May 02, 2022 | Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG | ||
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply (DEFENDANTS KASRA MIZBANS AND NASSER MIZBANS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG) Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
April 26, 2022 | Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT | ||
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint) Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
April 05, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF KASRA MIZBAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF NASSER MIZBAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Request for Judicial Notice | ||
April 04, 2022 | Separate Statement | ||
April 04, 2022 | Motion for Summary Adjudication | ||
April 04, 2022 | Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
April 04, 2022 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NASSER MIZBAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
April 04, 2022 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KASRA MIZBAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
April 04, 2022 | Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION | ||
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice (DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF NASSER MIZBAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF JANG H. KANG IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration (DECLARATION OF KASRA MIZBAN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
March 25, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
March 25, 2022 | Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint | ||
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Leave to File a Cross-Complaint Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Edward Ramsey (Attorney): First Name changed from Hadi to Edward; Organization Name changed from Los Angeles City Law, APLC to Los Angeles City Law; Middle Name: blank | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
March 15, 2022 | Substitution of Attorney | ||
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Attorney's Lien; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
March 10, 2022 | Notice of Lien - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S LIEN | ||
March 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Attorney's Lien Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
January 24, 2022 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
January 04, 2022 | hearing |
Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS: Filed By: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Result: Off Calendar; Result Date: |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS: Name Extension: blank; Exact Name: MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) | |
January 04, 2022 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses) | |
January 04, 2022 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES) | ||
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 04, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBANS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZS FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
December 17, 2021 | Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBANS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZS FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETA | ||
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBANS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZS FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS) Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (DEFENDANT KASRA MIZBANS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZS FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS) Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS: Name Extension: PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) | |
November 30, 2021 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
November 29, 2021 | Separate Statement | ||
November 29, 2021 | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ’S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND RE | ||
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS) Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (off calenar by moving party by way of Notice of Withdrawal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (off calenar by moving party by way of Notice of Withdrawal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
November 09, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 27 Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (off calenar by moving party by way of Notice of Withdrawal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
November 09, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (off calenar by moving party by way of Notice of Withdrawal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
November 04, 2021 | hearing |
Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses off calenar by moving party by way of Notice of Withdrawal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Vacated by Court on
Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZS FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
October 25, 2021 | Notice - DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZS FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS | ||
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT NASSER MIZBANS NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZS FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS Filed by Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS: Name Extension: TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; As To Parties changed from Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) to Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) | |
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 01, 2021 | hearing | Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 | |
October 01, 2021 | Separate Statement | ||
October 01, 2021 | Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses | ||
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS) Filed by Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses (TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF GABRIEL R. SANCHEZ?S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO, AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS) Filed by Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Andrew Stewart Hollins (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Messner Reeves to Messner Reeves, LLP | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Address for Andrew Stewart Hollins (Attorney) updated | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information: As To Parties: removed | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Andrew Stewart Hollins (Attorney) |
|
August 18, 2021 | Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information | ||
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Address for Andrew Stewart Hollins (Attorney) updated | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 26, 2021 | Substitution of Attorney | ||
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Filed by Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
April 01, 2021 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant); As to: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2021 | Answer | ||
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 149.99; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Nasser Mizban (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
February 10, 2021 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
February 10, 2021 | Proof of Personal Service | ||
February 10, 2021 | Notice of Posting of Jury Fees | ||
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Personal Service Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
January 22, 2021 | Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT | ||
January 22, 2021 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case | ||
January 22, 2021 | Complaint | ||
January 22, 2021 | hearing |
Final Status Conference scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: Edward B. Moreton, Jr. |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2021 | hearing |
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: Edward B. Moreton, Jr. |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff); As to: Kasra Mizban (Defendant); Nasser Mizban (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Edward B\. Moreton in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse | |
January 22, 2021 | hearing |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
Judge: Edward B. Moreton, Jr. |
|
January 22, 2021 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Gabriel R. Sanchez (Plaintiff) |
|