Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Murillo Marylyn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Medina Ivan Perez, Richlin Stewart Edward, against 1 Through 10 Inclusive Does, Corren Marc A., represented by Newell Christina J., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Gregory Wilson Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE; Filed by: Marc A. Corren (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Marc A. Corren (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice OF CASE REASSIGNMENT; Filed by: Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff); As to: Marc A. Corren (Defendant)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-07-18T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Marc A. Corren (Defendant); As to: Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-05-17T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE) Filed by Marc A. Corren (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Marc A. Corren (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) Filed by Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Marc A. Corren (Defendant)
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service) Filed by Marylyn Murillo (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2021-09-30T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-27T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE)
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2022-01-26T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
October 18, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
September 29, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
September 20, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Jury Trial (4-5 Day Time Estimate) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Jury Trial (4-5 Day Time Estimate) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
September 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Jury Trial |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 36 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
August 30, 2023 | Hearing |
Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Final Status Conference |
|
August 25, 2023 | Hearing | Pursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
August 25, 2023 | Hearing | Pursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial 4-5 Day Time Estimate scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.