Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROSHNI S LAL and BARINDER KUMAR
A Dv Prevention W/O Minor Children case was filed by Lal, Roshni S, against Kumar, Barinder, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. Judge Ernst A. Halperin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 09, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 15, 2023
Filing Location
San Mateo County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Padilla, Jr;Category
DV Prevention w/o Minor Children
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Domestic Violence
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Signed By: HON. ERNST A\. HALPERIN Date Signed: 04/12/2023 Mailed to petitioner |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation for Court Commissioner to Act as Temporary Judge for All Purposes (Petitioner consents ORALLY) |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Returned: CAD INCIDENT REPORT returned to PETITIONER Reason: NEEDS TO BE ON PLEADING FORM |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration SEE ATTACHED POLICE REPORT |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing Granted Mailed to both parties |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Padilla, Jr., Rosendo |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by DV-200 PROOF OF SERVICE IN PERSON of DV-110 WITH DV-100 AND A BLANK DV-120 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING; REQUST FOR ORDER; BLANK ANSWER TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER served on RESPONDENT with a service date of N/A |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of OTHER: READ ORDER VERBATIM |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of DV-110 WITH DV-100 AND A BLANK DV-120 (TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING; REQUEST FOR ORDER; BLANK ANSWER TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of OTHER: READ ORDER VERBATIM |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing Granted Mailed to Petitioner |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Padilla, Jr., Rosendo |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of DV-109 WITH DV-100 AND BLANK DV-120, DV-110, DV-116 |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Unsuccessful Service | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing Granted Mailed to petitioner |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Restraining Order Hearing
Judge: Padilla, Jr., Rosendo |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DV - Documents Picked Up | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Request to Continue Hearing Granted |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Judge: Padilla, Jr., Rosendo |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Order received | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DV - Documents Picked Up | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Partially Granted |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer
Judge: Padilla, Jr., Rosendo |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DV-TRO Ex Parte Cover Sheet | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Orders | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Confidential CLETS Information RECEIVED | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Submitted 3:20PM |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |