Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
County Of San Mateo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Child Support Services, against Carlos, Mario, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Halperin, Ernst A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 20, 2023 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment and Proof of Service by Mail | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment and Proof of Service by Mail | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Regarding Parental Obligations | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment sent to Judicial Officer for signature
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default or Uncontested Judgment | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default Judgment | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of Summons and Complaint Regarding Parental Obligations |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint regarding Parental Obligations | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.