Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Rogers Farm, LLC v. Versant Power
On March 01, 2022 a civil case was filed in the jurisdiction of Penobscot County, ME. Judge McKeon, Thomas presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 01, 2022
Last Refreshed
December 18, 2023
Filing Location
Penobscot County, ME
Judge
Hon. McKeon, Thomas
Category
Civil
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | order - HEARING/CONFERENCE RECORD - entered | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | discovery - DISCOVERY DEADLINE - entered | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Granted | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY - filed | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | order - COURT ORDER - entered | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | order - COURT ORDER - entered | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION FOR LEAVE - filed | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Granted | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Granted | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | order - COURT ORDER - entered | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | discovery - DISCOVERY DEADLINE - entered | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY - filed | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | other filing - ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - filed | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | order - HEARING/CONFERENCE RECORD - entered | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | discovery filing - RULE 26(G) LETTER - filed | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | order - REPORT OF ADR CONF / UNRESOLVED - entered | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | adr - REPORT OF ADR CONFERENCE / MEDIATION - filed | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | order - COURT ORDER - entered | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Granted | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | other filing - ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - filed | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | jury filing - DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - filed | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | motion - WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - filed | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Granted | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | order - COURT ORDER - entered | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION TO ENLARGE - filed | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | other filing - ENTRY OF APPEARANCE - filed | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Granted | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | order - COURT ORDER - entered | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | motion - WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - filed | |
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | adr - NOTICE OF ADR PROCESS/NEUTRAL - filed | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION TO ENLARGE - filed | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | discovery - DISCOVERY DEADLINE - entered | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Granted | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | order - COURT ORDER - entered | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | assignment - SINGLE JUDGE/JUSTICE - assigned to justice | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | discovery - DISCOVERY DEADLINE - entered | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | order - SCHEDULING ORDER - entered | |
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event | other filing - PROPOSED ORDER - filed | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | order - HEARING/CONFERENCE RECORD - entered | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | certify/notification - NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE TO BCD - issued | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | assignment - SINGLE JUDGE/JUSTICE - assigned to justice | |
April 13, 2022 | Docket Event | order - TRANSFER TO BCD ACCEPTED - entered | |
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Sent electronically to BCD | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event | service - PROOF OF SERVICE - filed | |
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event | responsive pleading - ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE - filed | |
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | other filing - APPLICATION TO TRANSFER TO BCD - filed | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | filing document - COMPLAINT - filed |