Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Michael McKenney v. Roman Catholic Bishop of Portland
On December 20, 2022 a civil case was filed in the jurisdiction of Penobscot County, ME. Judge McKeon, Thomas presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 20, 2022
Last Refreshed
December 18, 2023
Filing Location
Penobscot County, ME
Judge
Hon. McKeon, Thomas
Category
Civil
Status
Active
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | motion - OTHER MOTION - filed | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | order - COURT ORDER - entered | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Granted | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | responsive pleading - REPLY MEMORANDUM - filed | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | responsive pleading - OPPOSING MEMORANDUM - filed | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | other filing - AFFIDAVIT - filed | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | other filing - AFFIDAVIT - filed | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | motion - OTHER MOTION - filed | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | order - COURT ORDER - entered | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Denied | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | brief - REPLY BRIEF - filed | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | responsive pleading - OPPOSING MEMORANDUM - filed | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | certify/notification - NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE TO BCD - issued | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | service - PROOF OF SERVICE - filed | |
December 23, 2022 | Docket Event | order - TRANSFER TO BCD ACCEPTED - entered | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Sent electronically to BCD | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | other filing - APPLICATION TO TRANSFER TO BCD - filed | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | motion - MOTION TO DISMISS 12(B)(6) 12(C) - filed $225 | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | filing document - COMPLAINT - filed |