Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Shasta County. This case was filed in Shasta County Superior Courts Superior with Bigelow, Molly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2023 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationShasta County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 | Hearing |
Further Proceedings
Judge: Wood, Tamara L |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Temporary | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
October 09, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing - Guardianship/Conservatorship
Judge: Bigelow, Molly |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment of Fees | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | *Investigative Report | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing - Guardianship/Conservatorship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.