Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CALIFORNIA HOUSING DEFENSE FUND, A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT PUBLIC BENEFIT CORPORATION VS CITY OF CITY OFLA CANADA FLINTRIDGE
On July 25, 2023 a writ - administrative mandamus (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Mitchell L. Beckloff presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 25, 2023
Last Refreshed
May 15, 2024
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
James C. Chalfant;Category
Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction)
Status
Appealed
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF
MANDATE
(Code of Civ. Proc. § 1094.5; Gov. Code
§ 65589.5)
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY
RELIEF
(Code of Civ. Proc. § 1060)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: Apr 16, 2024Overruling Demurrer; Denying Motion to Strike; Filed by: Clerk
Date: Nov 22, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- WITH PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund (Respondent) |
|
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- WITH PROOF OF SERVICE "U1": Name Extension changed from WITH PROOF OF SERVICE to WITH PROOF OF SERVICE "U1" ; Exact Name: blank | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- WITH PROOF OF SERVICE: Status Date changed from to | |
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice Notice Requesting Transmittal of Administrative Record; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | WITH PROOF OF SERVICE "U1"; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Appellant) |
|
April 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Stipulation - No Order Stipulation To Extend Deadline For Motion(S) And/Or Memorandum For Attorneys' Fees And/Or Costs; Filed by: The People of the State of California, Ex. Rel. Rob Bonta (Plaintiff in Intervention); As to: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Mandate; Issued by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) | |
April 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Writ of Mandate Writ of Mandate; Issued by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice NOTICE OF PROOF OF SERVICE VIA FIRST-CLASS MAIL RE: NOTICE OF APPEAL; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); As to: The People of the State of California, Ex. Rel. Rob Bonta (Plaintiff in Intervention); California Department of Housing and Community Development (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed WITH PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Appellant); As to: The People of the State of California, Ex. Rel. Rob Bonta (Respondent); California Department of Housing and Community Development (Respondent); Payment Option: I will pay my fees in person at later date | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration DECLARATION OF PETER SHERIDAN IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT CITY OF LA CAADA FLINTRIDGES OBJECTION TO PETITIONERS NOTICE OF LODGING; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection TO PETITIONERS [PROPOSED] FORM OF JUDGMENT AND [PROPOSED] PEREMPTORY WRIT; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff in Intervention The People of the State of California, Ex. Rel. Rob Bonta and Plaintiff in Intervention California Department of Housing and Community Development against Defendant City of La Canada Flintridge on the Petition filed by California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation on for a total of $0.00. | |
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Judgment - Court Finding - After Court Trial - entered for Plaintiff in Intervention The People of the State of California, Ex. Rel. Rob Bonta; Plaintiff in Intervention California Department of Housing and Community Development against Defendant Cit... Filed by: Clerk | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: 600 Foothill Owner LP, a limited partnership (Real Party in Interest) |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging Petitioner's Notice of Lodging; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) | |
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Declaration of Alexander Gourse In Support Of Petitioner's Notice of Lodging; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Order on Petitions for Writ of Mandate and Complaints for Declaratory Relief; Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter-Hearing on Petition for Writ of Ma...) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter-Hearing on Petition for Writ of Ma...) of , ORDER ON PETITIONS FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND COMPLAINTS FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; PROPOSED JUDGMENT REQUIREMENTS-DEPARTMENT 86(PETITIONER ONLY); Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Department 86, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding Ruling on Submitted Matter Ruling on Submitted Matter |
|
March 01, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 23STCP02614 Hearing Date: March 1, 2024 Dept: 86 600 FOOTHILL OWNER, LP v. CITY OF LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE Case Number: 23STPC02575 Related to Case No. 23STCP02614 CALIFORNIA HOUSING DEFE... | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Department 86, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Held - Taken under Submission Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate - Held - Taken under Submission |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: |
|
March 01, 2024 | hearing | Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate) | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Department 86 Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Response TO PETITIONER?S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF COUNCILMEMBER TERESA WALKER; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Response TO PETITIONERS-INTERVENORS? OBJECTIONS TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Response TO PETITIONERS-INTERVENORS? OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF SUSAN KOLEDA AND SUPPORTING EXHIBITS; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Response TO CALIFORNIA HOUSING DEFENSE FUNDS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF SUSAN KOLEDA AND EXHIBITS; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Response TO CALIFORNIA HOUSING DEFENSE FUND?S OBJECTION TO THE DECLARATIONS OF KEITH EICH, KIM BOWMAN, AND LYNDA JO- HERNANDEZ; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Response TO CALIFORNIA HOUSING DEFENSE FUND?S OBJECTION TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging of Joint Appendix (Volumes 1 Through 4 ); Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING EXTENSION TO LODGE JOINT APPENDIX: Filed By: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING EXTENSION TO LODGE JOINT APPENDIX; Signed and Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); As to: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); The People of the State of California, Ex. Rel. Rob Bonta (Plaintiff in Intervention); California Department of Housing and Community Development (Plaintiff in Intervention) |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation and Order APPROVING EXTENSION TO LODGE JOINT APPENDIX: Status Date changed from to ; Name Extension changed from STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER APPROVING EXTENSION TO LODGE JOINT APPENDIX to APPROVING EXTENSION TO LODGE JOINT APPENDIX ; Result Date changed from to | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Approving Augmentation of the Administrative Record; Signed and Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation and Order Approving Augmentation of the Administrative Record: Filed By: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); Result: Granted ; Result Date: |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection People Of The State Of California's, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, And California Department Of Housing And Community Development's Objections To Declaration Of Susan Koleda And Supporting Exhibits; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply TO RESPONDENTS OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF DYLAN S. CASEY; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply TO RESPONDENTS OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection TO DECLARATION OF SUSAN KOLEDA AND EXHIBITS; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); 600 Foothill Owner LP, a limited partnership (Real Party in Interest) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply TO RESPONDENTS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection TO DECLARATION OF TERESA WALKER AND EXHIBITS; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ISSUE WRIT OF MANDATE; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection TO RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration OF ALEXANDER GOURSE IN SUPPORT OF CALHDFS RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply People Of The State Of California's, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, And California Department Of Housing And Community Development's Reply Brief; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibit List; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection TO DECLARATIONS OF KEITH EICH, KIM BOWMAN, RICHARD B. GUNTER III, AND LYNDA-JO HERNANDEZ; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Lodging OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection People Of The State Of California's, Ex Rel. Rob Bonta, And California Department Of Housing And Community Development's Objections To Respondents' Request For Judicial Notice; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection TO PETITIONERS OPENING BRIEF; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection TO PETITIONERS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration COUNCILMEMBER KIM BOWMAN IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT?S ANSWERS TO PETITIONER AND PETITIONERS - INTERVENORS? OPENING BRIEFS; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); As to: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration OF COUNCILMEMBER KEITH EICH IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT?S ANSWERS TO PETITIONER AND PETITIONERS - INTERVENORS? OPENING BRIEFS; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration OF SUSAN KOLEDA IN SUPPORT OF LA CA¿ADA FLINTRIDGE?S ANSWERS TO PETITIONERS-INTERVENORS? AND PETITIONER?S OPENING BRIEFS; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection TO DECLARATION OF DYLAN S. CASEY; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration OF LYNDA-JO HERNANDEZ IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT?S ANSWERS TO PETITIONER AND PETITIONERS- INTERVENORS? OPENING BRIEFS; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration OF COUNCILMEMBER RICHARD B. GUNTER III, IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT?S ANSWERS TO PETITIONER AND PETITIONERS - INTERVENORS? OPENING BRIEFS; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration OF COUNCILMEMBER TERESA WALKER IN SUPPORT OF RESPONDENT?S ANSWERS TO PETITIONER AND PETITIONERS- INTERVENORS? OPENING BRIEFS; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Objection TO DECLARATION OF MELINDA Y. COY; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition Petitioner California Housing Defense Fund's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Consolidate; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2024 | hearing |
Department 86 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Department 86 Hearing on Motion to Strike (Hearing on Motion To Strike) Hearing on Motion to Strike (Hearing on Motion To Strike) |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Department 86 Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) |
|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Department 86 Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA'S, EX REL. ROB BONTA, AND CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT'S OPENING BRIEF; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); 600 Foothill Owner LP, a limited partnership (Real Party in Interest) |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Dylan S. Casey In Support of Petitioner's Motion to Issue Writ of Mandate; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion AND MOTION TO ISSUE WRIT OF MANDATE; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); As to: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 86 Hearing on Motion - Other (To Intervene) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court Hearing on Motion - Other (To Intervene) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court |
|
December 20, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion - Other To Intervene scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE FILING OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION: Filed By: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE FILING OF COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION; Signed and Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); As to: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
December 14, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Motion - Other To Intervene scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 | |
December 14, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO INTERVENE scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Hearing on Proposed Intervenor Ex Parte Application to Intervene) | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 86, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( TO INTERVENE) - Held Hearing on Ex Parte Application ( TO INTERVENE) - Held Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition TO PEOPLE OF THE ST ATE OF CALIFORNIA, EX REL. ROB BONT A, AND CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO INTERVENE; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration OF PETER SHERIDAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Application TO INTERVENE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
December 12, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO INTERVENE scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 | |
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Order; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
November 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Case Number: 23STCP02614 Hearing Date: November 22, 2023 Dept: 86 CALIFORNIA HOUSING DEFENSE FUND v. CITY OF LA CANADA FLINTRIDGE Case Number: 23STCP02614 Related to Case No. 23STPC02575 Hearing Da... | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Overruling Demurrer; Denying Motion to Strike; Filed by: Clerk | |
November 22, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
November 22, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Petition for Writ of Mandate scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Order Overruling Demurrer; Denying Motion to Strike: Name Extension: Overruling Demurrer; Denying Motion to Strike ; Exact Name: blank | |
November 22, 2023 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference; Hearing on Demurrer with Motion to ...) | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 86 Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Held Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Held |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 86, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held Trial Setting Conference - Held Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply of Respondent City of La Canada Flintridge in Support of its Demurrer; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Portions of Petitioner California Housing Defense Fund's Verified Petition; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition Petitioner's Opposition to Respondent's Demurrer; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition Petitioner's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Strike Portions of Petition; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 85 Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
October 27, 2023 | hearing |
Department 86 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Trial Setting Conference |
|
October 27, 2023 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:30 AM | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference) | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Association of Attorney; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
October 27, 2023 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 | |
October 27, 2023 | hearing | Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09:30 AM | |
October 27, 2023 | hearing | Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 86, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); 600 Foothill Owner LP, a limited partnership (Real Party in Interest) |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration OF CHRISTOPHER DACUS IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Respondents Notice Of Errata; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); As to: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
August 29, 2023 | hearing |
Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86
Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration OF MICHELLE L. VILLARREAL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
August 23, 2023 | hearing |
Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86
Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Preparation of Administrative Record; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Objection TO CALIFORNIA HOUSING DEFENSE FUND’S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND NOTICE OF SPECIAL APPEARANCE; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Deemed Not Related | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 86 - Hon. Mitchell L. Beckloff; Reason: Other | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of ; Filed by: Clerk |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) | |
August 07, 2023 | hearing |
On the Court's own motion, Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 85 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09:30 AM at Department 86
Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
August 07, 2023 | hearing |
Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86
Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Case numbers 23STCP02614, 23STCP02575 are related; case number 23STCP02575 is the lead case. | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 86, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Mitchell L. Beckloff |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Related Case: As To Parties: | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner) |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case; Filed by: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Related Case: As To Parties: | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case; Filed by: 600 Foothill Owner LP, a limited partnership (Real Party in Interest) |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: 600 Foothill Owner LP, a limited partnership (Real Party in Interest); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); 600 Foothill Owner LP, a limited partnership (Real Party in Interest) |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant); Service Date: ; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- 600 Foothill Owner LP, a limited partnership (Real Party in Interest): Last Name: blank | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Updated -- City of La Canada Flintridge (Defendant): First Name: blank; Organization Name changed from City ofLa Canada Flintridge to City of La Canada Flintridge | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Address for Dylan Casey (Attorney) updated | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 25, 2023 | hearing |
Trial Setting Conference scheduled for in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 85
Judge: James C. Chalfant |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Hon. James C\. Chalfant in Department 85 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Judge: Hon. James C. Chalfant |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Petition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of City ofLa Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by: Clerk |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: California Housing Defense Fund, a California nonprofit public benefit corporation (Petitioner); As to: City of City ofLa Canada Flintridge (Defendant) |
|
July 25, 2023 | Petition for Writ of Mandate | ||
July 25, 2023 | Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon | ||
July 25, 2023 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
July 25, 2023 | Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case |