Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ROMERO, NOE ALIRIO -CONSERVATORSHIP
On December 12, 2023 a limited conservatorship (general jurisdiction) case was filed by De Tobar Deisi Elizabeth Romero, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Deborah L. Christian presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 12, 2023
Last Refreshed
January 27, 2024
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk
Category
Limited Conservatorship (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 | hearing |
Probate Department 44 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012 Appointment Hearing - Conservator |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Petition Denied | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation to Issue | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
in Probate Department 44, Christian, Deborah L., Presiding Appointment Hearing - Temp Conservatorship - Held Judge: Christian Deborah L. |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event | PI Temp Cons'r Report | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report - Court Appointed Counsel Filed by Subject |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance - Scheduled Filed by Subject |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing (Temporary ) Filed by Subject |
|
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice - Hearing Filed by Subject |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Appointing Counsel | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Info Sheet Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Ltd Conservator of Person/P&E (Initial) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Consent (to Serve ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint a Temporary Conservator (Subsequent) Filed by Petitioner |
|
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Cover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CAC Appointment Required | |
December 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 Filed by Petitioner |