Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Chui, Jessica, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited Class Action case represented by Bibiyan, David, against Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Evans, Aicha, Hireart Inc., A Delaware Corporation, Zoox, Inc., Zoox Labs, Inc., A Delaware Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Siegel, Adam, Wallin, Allison S., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with Healy, Nicole S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 20, 2024 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited Class Action |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This class action lawsuit filed by Jessica Chui on behalf of herself and others against Zoox Labs, Inc., Hireart Inc., Aicha Evans, and unidentified defendants alleges various labor law violations in California. The complaint asserts joint liability ...
98163Joint000ec4
Date: May 17, 202497983Notic00c475
Date: May 15, 2024Summons Issued / Filed
Date: February 20, 2024Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 02, 2024Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: February 21, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 20, 2024Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: April 22, 2024Case Management Order
Date: February 26, 2024Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: March 13, 2024Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 29, 2024Complaint
Date: February 20, 202497509CaseM009d67
Date: May 07, 202497223Answe008599
Date: May 02, 202496962DEFEN00a806
Date: April 29, 202496462Proof018576
Date: April 22, 202496462Proof005aed
Date: April 22, 202493863Notic00c49a
Date: March 13, 202492315Summo02151c
Date: February 20, 202492315Civil012138
Date: February 20, 202492315Compl00940e
Date: February 20, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management and Trial Setting Conference
Judge: Healy, Nicole S. |
|
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event | 98163Joint000ec4 | |
May 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 97983Notic00c475 | |
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | 97509CaseM009d67 | |
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Answer (Unlimited) TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
|
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | 97223Answe008599 | |
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT Answer (Unlimited) TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT |
|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | 96962DEFEN00a806 | |
April 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS; ETC... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.