Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
People vs. SIMS, RAY RAZNOR
On April 12, 2024 a probate case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. Judge Robert M. LaForge presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 12, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 17, 2024
Filing Location
Sonoma County, CA
Judge
Category
Mental Competency - PC 1368
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
General Probate
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Placement
Judge: LaForge, Robert M |
|
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
In Chambers Minutes SELLS Judge: LaForge, Robert M |
|
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Firearms Prohibition Reported via MHRS to DOJ | |
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mental Health Report Filed PC1368 Court Report dated 5/08/2024 - Dr. Wilson |
|
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendant found mentally incompetent | |
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
PC 1368 Mental Competency Hearing
Judge: LaForge, Robert M |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Doctor's Report Due; Appointment pursuant to PC 1368 |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Doctor appointed to examine defendant Dr. S. Wilson Judge: LaForge, Robert M |
|
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Plea Set PX Judge: LaForge, Robert M |