Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support et al vs. J Rougeau Rehab Inc et al
On September 11, 2019 an other tortious action case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Berkshire County, MA. Judge John A. Agostini presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 11, 2019
Last Refreshed
May 31, 2024
Filing Location
Berkshire County, MA
Category
Torts
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Status
Consolidation
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I Contribution
COUNT II Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress
COUNT II Intentional damage to advantageous relations
COUNT IV. (Nuisance)
COUNT V damage to property
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint involves multiple parties and various claims. The plaintiffs, Brian Doyle and Michael Milazzo, are individuals who operate an aircraft repair business called Midnav Aircraft Support. They leased a portion of an aircraft hangar from…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Affidavit of Derek Rougeau FILED Applies To: Rougeau, Derek (Defendant)
Date: Mar 22, 2024Exhibits/Appendix Exhibit D. FILED
Date: Feb 27, 2024ORDER: Order on Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification, entered (Wilkins, J).
Date: Sep 16, 2020Original civil complaint filed.
Date: Sep 11, 2019Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: Sep 11, 2019Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 09/11/2019
Date: Sep 11, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for a date certain for Trial by J. Rougeau Rehab, Inc., Derek Rougeau, Jacqueline Rougeau, and Dodd Rougeau, the parties bringing this Motion request any one of the following trial weeks: October 28, 2024, November 18, 2024, December 9, 2024, or December 16, 2024 (#79.0): ALLOWED Case set for Date Certain 2/18/2024 (Mulqueen, J) Judge: Mulqueen, Hon. Jane E | |
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 05/09/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Held via Video/Phone via Zoom - case on for Defendant's Motion for Trial Date Certain - counsel reports that trial will last at least one week - after hearing, Jury Trial scheduled for 2/18/25 - motions in limine to be filed by 2/3/25 and any discovery related motions to be filed by 6/14/24 - hearing dates to be scheduled once motions are received (Mulqueen, J.) Hon. Jane E Mulqueen, Presiding
Judge: Mulqueen, Jane E |
|
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 02/18/2025 Time: 09:00 AM | |
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 06/03/2024 03:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. Jane E Mulqueen, Presiding
Judge: Mulqueen, Jane E |
|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 04/01/2024 03:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Not reached by Court Hon. Francis E Flannery, Presiding
Judge: Flannery, Francis E |
|
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply Reply of J. Rougeau Rehab, Inc., Derek Rougeau, Jacqueline Rougeau & Dodd Rougeau to Opposition filed by Doyle & Milazzo, with Certificate of Service FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a date certain filed by of Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff David Rhinemiller signed by Attorney Edward Carman FILED | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendants Motion for a date certain filed by Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo with Certificate of Service Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Memorandum in support of Motion for a date certain for Trial with Certificate of Service FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Motion for a date certain for Trial by J. Rougeau Rehab, Inc., Derek Rougeau, Jacqueline Rougeau, and Dodd Rougeau, the parties bringing this Motion request any one of the following trial weeks: October 28, 2024, November 18, 2024, December 9, 2024, or December 16, 2024, with Certificate of Service FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed Rule 9A Request of Hearing, with Certificate of Service FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing and List of Documents 1. Moving Parties' Rule 9A Notice of Filing (this document) 2. Moving Parties' Motion for a Date Certain for Trial; 3. Moving Parties' Memorandum in support of Motion for a date certain for Trial; 4. Affidavit of Derek Rougeau in support of Moving Parties' Moiton ; 5. Exhibits in support of Moving Parties' Motion labeled "A" and "B"; 6. Opposition submitted by Brian Doyle and Michael Milazzo; 7. Opposition submitted by David Rhinemiller; 8. Reply of J. Rougeau Rehab, Inc., Derek Rougeau, Jacqueline Rougeau & Dodd Rougeau to Opposition Filed by Doyle & Milazzo; 9. Moving Parties' Request for Hearing; 10. Moving Parties' Affidavit of Compliance with Rule 9A; and 11. Moving Parties' Rule 9C Certification FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9C by Attorney Hussain Hamdan, with Certificate of Service FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Derek Rougeau FILED Applies To: Rougeau, Derek (Defendant) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A by Attorney Hussain Hamdan, with Certificate of Service FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | List of exhibits Exhibit A and Exhibit B FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
March 08, 2024 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Letter from Attorney Bruce Green with request to attach documents as an exhibit to the plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to compel, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER: on Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery entered (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing and List of Documents: 1. Defendants' Rule 9A Notice of Filing 2. Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery 3. Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Compel Discovery 4. Exhibits in Support of Defendants' Motion labeled "A" through "D" 5. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel 6. Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery 7. Defendants' Request for Hearing 8. Defendants' Affidavit of Compliance with Rule 9A 9. Defendants' Rule 9C Certification With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Compliance Superior Court Rule 9C With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Request for Hearing (Rule 9A) With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Opposition to to Defendant's Motion to Compel. With Certificate of Service. FILED filed by Applies To: Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff); Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery. With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Exhibit D. FILED | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Exhibit C (Plaintiffs' Answer to Request for Electronically Stored Information and Tangible Things Dated December 29, 2021) FILED | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Exhibit B (Plaintiff's Answer to Interrogatories by Michael Milazzo Dated December 20, 2023 Served January 5, 2024) FILED | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Exhibit A (Plaintiff's Answer to Interrogatories by Brian Doyle Dated December 20, 2023 Served January 5, 2024) FILED | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Motion to Compel Discovery. With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Hussain A Hamdan, Esq.J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Memorandum in support of Their Motion to Compel Discovery (#65). With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Note: ******Amended complaint has not been filed-- allowance of motion to add party was allowed on 7/6/2021.***** | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Exhibit D. FILED | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Exhibit B (Plaintiff's Answer to Interrogatories by Michael Milazzo Dated December 20, 2023 Served January 5, 2024) FILED | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Hussain A Hamdan, Esq.J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Memorandum in support of Their Motion to Compel Discovery (#65). With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Exhibit A (Plaintiff's Answer to Interrogatories by Brian Doyle Dated December 20, 2023 Served January 5, 2024) FILED | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Defendants J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Motion to Compel Discovery. With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Exhibit C (Plaintiffs' Answer to Request for Electronically Stored Information and Tangible Things Dated December 29, 2021) FILED | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Counterclaim filed. Defendants J. Rougeau Rehab, Inc., Derek Rougeau and Dodd Rougeau vs. Brian Doyle d/b/a Midnav Aircraft Support and Michael Milazzo with Certificate of Service, FILED. | |
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to Leave to Serve a Party Late (#57.0): ALLOWED Allowed (Agostini, J) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing And List of Documents. With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) 1. Plaintiff's Rule 9A Notice of Filing 2. Plaintiff's Motion to Serve a Party Late 3. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion and Exhibit 4. Plaintiff's Request for a Hearing 5. Plaintiff's Affidavit of Compliance with Rule 9A 6. Plaintiff's Rule 9C Certification | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9C With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hussain A Hamdan, Esq.J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Memorandum in opposition to Defendants' and Non-Party Jacqueline Rougeau's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Serve a Party Late. With Certificate of Service and Exhibits A & B. FILED Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Rougeau, Derek (Defendant); Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Motion for Leave to Serve a Party Late. With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Hussain A Hamdan, Esq.J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Memorandum in opposition to Defendants' and Non-Party Jacqueline Rougeau's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Serve a Party Late. With Certificate of Service and Exhibits A & B. FILED Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Rougeau, Derek (Defendant); Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9C With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 12/13/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held via Video/Phone via Zoom - case on for Plaintiff's Motion to Disclose Expert Five Days Late - after hearing, motion is ALLOWED (Agostini, J.) Plaintiff will also be filing a new motion to add a party - there is a consolidated case also in which there is an opposition to a motion in that case that is due by 1/5/24 - both motions in both cases can be heard on the same day once they are filed and ready to be scheduled for hearing (Agostini, J.) Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Disclose Expert Five Days Late (Plaintiff's Motion) (#51.0): ALLOWED (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 12/13/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held via Video/Phone via Zoom - case on for Plaintiff's Motion to Disclose Expert Five Days Late - after hearing, motion is ALLOWED (Agostini, J.) Plaintiff will also be filing a new motion to add a party - there is a consolidated case also in which there is an opposition to a motion in that case that is due by 1/5/24 - both motions in both cases can be heard on the same day once they are filed and ready to be scheduled for hearing (Agostini, J.) Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding Doyle, Brian Judge: Agostini, |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed with Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9C with Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A with Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing 1. Plaintiffs' Rule 9A Notice of Filing; 2. Plaintiffs' Motion to Disclose Expert Five Days Late; 3. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion and Affidavits; 4. Plaintiffs' Request for Hearing; 5. Plaintiffs' Affidavit of Compliance with Rule 9A; 6. Plaintiffs' Rule 9A Certification Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Hussain A Hamdan, Esq.J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Memorandum in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to disclose expert five days late with Certificate of Service with Exhibit A, FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Motion to disclose expert five days late with Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Hussain A Hamdan, Esq.J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Memorandum in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to disclose expert five days late with Certificate of Service with Exhibit A, FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9C with Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed with Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing 1. Plaintiffs' Rule 9A Notice of Filing; 2. Plaintiffs' Motion to Disclose Expert Five Days Late; 3. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion and Affidavits; 4. Plaintiffs' Request for Hearing; 5. Plaintiffs' Affidavit of Compliance with Rule 9A; 6. Plaintiffs' Rule 9A Certification Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A with Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Motion to disclose expert five days late with Certificate of Service, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Amend Tracking Order, FILED. (#49.0): DENIED Given the age of this case, this motion is DENIED (Agostini, J). Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Amend Tracking Order, FILED. filed by Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Rougeau, Derek (Defendant); Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Amend Tracking Order, FILED. filed by Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Rougeau, Derek (Defendant); Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Companion case - 2076CV0142 scheduled for a hearing today was addressed - during the hearing in that case, the parties also addressed Defendant's emergency motion to expand time in this companion case - the Plaintiff will have one week to file a response to that emergency motion (Agostini, J.) | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Attorney Hamden has one week to file a response to Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Amend Tracking Order (Agostini, J). Notice emailed to attorneys on 10/11/2023. | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's EMERGENCY Motion to Amend Tracking Order (by 60 days). With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's EMERGENCY Motion to Amend Tracking Order (by 60 days). With Certificate of Service. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Trial Conference scheduled on: 08/14/2023 02:00 PM Has been: Held via Video/Phone via Zoom - Attorney Green and Attorney Hamdan present via Zoom - Plaintiffs Brian Doyle and Michael Milazzo present via Zoom - outstanding discovery to be completed within 60 days - parties are not ready for trial for 8/21/23 - case will be placed on the April 2024 trial list (Manitsas, J.) Hon. James M Manitsas, Presiding
Judge: Manitsas, James M |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Jury Trial scheduled on: 08/21/2023 09:00 AM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. James M Manitsas, Presiding
Judge: Manitsas, James M |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: Revised Pre-Trial Order, ENTERED (Manitsas, J). Certified copy to counsel. Scheduling Order: Experts named and disclosure by October 13, 2023; Discovery completed by October 13, 2023; Dispositive motion s filed with Court by November 1, 2023; Jury Trial on April Trial List. Plaintiff Rougeau Rehab to comply with Rule 9A and 9C on its Motion for Determination of Proper Service. (Manitsas, J). | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Conference Memorandum Joint Preliminary Trial Conference Report signed by Defendants only, FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER: Revised Pre-Trial Order, ENTERED (Manitsas, J). Certified copy to counsel. Scheduling Order: Experts named and disclosure by October 13, 2023; Discovery completed by October 13, 2023; Dispositive motion s filed with Court by November 1, 2023; Jury Trial on April Trial List. Plaintiff Rougeau Rehab to comply with Rule 9A and 9C on its Motion for Determination of Proper Service. (Manitsas, J). | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Conference Memorandum Joint Preliminary Trial Conference Report signed by Defendants only, FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Trial Ready scheduled on: 08/07/2023 03:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Joint request of parties Hon. James M Manitsas, Presiding
Judge: Manitsas, James M |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Offers Plaintiff's Offer of Judgment pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 68 and Defendants response declining the Offer filed. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Offers Plaintiff's Offer of Judgment pursuant to Mass. R. Civ. P. 68 and Defendants response declining the Offer filed. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER: Order on Joint Motion of Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff David Rhinemiller and Third Party Defendants Brian Doyle D/B/A Midnav Aircraft Support and Michael Milazzo to Consolidate Action ENTERED (Wilkins, J.) | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 08/21/2023 Time: 09:00 AM Result: Rescheduled | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER: Order on Joint Motion of Defendant/Third Party Plaintiff David Rhinemiller and Third Party Defendants Brian Doyle D/B/A Midnav Aircraft Support and Michael Milazzo to Consolidate Action ENTERED (Wilkins, J.) | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 08/21/2023 Time: 09:00 AM Result: Rescheduled 1976CV00202 Judge: Manitsas, |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Scheduled: Event: Jury Trial Date: 08/21/2023 Time: 09:00 AM | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding request regarding filing of Application for Final Judgment. RECEIVED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff) | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding request regarding filing of Application for Final Judgment. RECEIVED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff) | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Bruce Green FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, J Rougeau Rehab Inc's Application for Judgment and Dismissal pursuant to MRCP Rule 33(a)(4), FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Bruce Green FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, J Rougeau Rehab Inc's Application for Judgment and Dismissal pursuant to MRCP Rule 33(a)(4), FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Bruce Green, Esq.'s Memorandum in support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Jacqueline Rougeau in Relation to Bruce Green's Prior Representation. FILED. | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. (#38.0): ALLOWED (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint filed by J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Jacqueline Rougeau in Relation to Bruce Green's Prior Representation. FILED. | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Bruce Green, Esq.'s Memorandum in support of Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint filed by J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to the counterclaim Supplemental, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to the counterclaim Supplemental, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Rougeau, Dodd: Defendants' Supplemental Answer to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Claims with claim for trial by jury; FILED Applies To: Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of Rougeau, Derek (Defendant) | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Rougeau, Derek: Defendants' Supplemental Answer to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Claims with claim for trial by jury; FILED Applies To: Rougeau, Derek (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of Rougeau, Derek (Defendant) | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant J Rougeau Rehab Inc: Supplemental Answer to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Claims with claim for trial by jury; FILED Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant Rougeau, Dodd: Defendants' Supplemental Answer to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Claims with claim for trial by jury; FILED Applies To: Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of Rougeau, Derek (Defendant) | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support: Answer to the Counterclaim; and supplemental claims, FILED. | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended: SUPPLEMENTAL Complaint, FILED. amended complaint filed by Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended: SUPPLEMENTAL Complaint, FILED. amended complaint filed by Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support: Answer to the Counterclaim; and supplemental claims, FILED. | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Amended Tracking Order mailed to counsel Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Answer Defendants' (Counterclaim Plaintiffs') Second Amended and Supplemental Answer and Counterclaims. FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) With claim for Trial by Jury. | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Amended Answer Defendants' (Counterclaim Plaintiffs') Second Amended and Supplemental Answer and Counterclaims. FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) With claim for Trial by Jury. | |
February 23, 2021 | |||
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Defendant's Supplemental Pleading and Counterclaims filed. Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Rougeau, Derek (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 02/23/2021 10:00 AM Has been: Held as Scheduled Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for leave to file a supplemental pleading and for amendment of the deadlines set forth in the tracking order (#25.0): ALLOWED the court will set new tracking order dates (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Defendant's Supplemental Pleading and Counterclaims filed. Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Rougeau, Derek (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear 02/23/2021 at 10:00 a.m. for Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counts II through VII of Defendant's Counterclaims, Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading and to amend tracking deadlines Sent On: 02/04/2021 09:03:32 Notice Sent To: Bruce Green, Esq. Attorney at Law 110 Airport Rd Rm 114, Westfield, MA 01085 Notice Sent To: Hussain A Hamdan, Esq. 45 Pudding Hollow Rd, Hawley, MA 01339 | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant J Rougeau Rehab Inc: Answer with a counterclaim; | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant J Rougeau Rehab Inc: Answer with a counterclaim; | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading. filed by Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Pleading and for Amendment of the Deadlines Set Forth in the Civil Tracking Order and Standing Order 1-88. FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Hussain A Hamdan, Esq.'s Memorandum in support of their Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Pleading and for Amendment of the Deadlines Set Forth in the Civil Tracking Order and Standing Order 1-88. FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | List of exhibits Affidavits and Exhibits In Support of Defendant's Motion for Supplemental Pleading. FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing and List of documents. FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Hussain A Hamdan, Esq.'s Memorandum in support of their Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Pleading and for Amendment of the Deadlines Set Forth in the Civil Tracking Order and Standing Order 1-88. FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading. filed by Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for hearing filed FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau, Dodd Rougeau's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Pleading and for Amendment of the Deadlines Set Forth in the Civil Tracking Order and Standing Order 1-88. FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | List of exhibits Affidavits and Exhibits In Support of Defendant's Motion for Supplemental Pleading. FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule 9A notice of filing and List of documents. FILED. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 04, 2021 | |||
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 01/04/2021 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled via Zoom - Attorney Green and Attorney Hamdan present via Zoom - Plaintiffs Brian Doyle and Michael Milazzo present via Zoom - Defendants present with Attorney Hamdan via telephone on Zoom - Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum NOT filed - Attorney Hamdan indicated that his clients are requesting that he ask for leave of the court to file supplemental pleadings, which may present new claims - Motion to Dismiss not to be filed, because it was not filed in accordance with Rule 9A - parties to file papers and then the Court will issue an order regarding time standards to file the Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum (Agostini, J.) Hon. John A Agostini, Presiding
Judge: Agostini, |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Demand for Hearing filed by Defendants' via EMAIL Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Hussain A. Hamdan in Relation to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss FILED via EMAIL Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attorney Hussain A. Hamdan in Relation to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss FILED via EMAIL Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and Demand for Hearing filed by Defendants' via EMAIL Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Email from Attorney Hamdan regarding recent Motion to Dismiss filed by Attorney Greene. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Motion to Dismiss Counts II through VII of the Defendant's counterclaim. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Email from Attorney Hamdan regarding recent Motion to Dismiss filed by Attorney Greene. FILED Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Motion to Dismiss Counts II through VII of the Defendant's counterclaim. FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss FILED Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER: Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification, entered (Wilkins, J). | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER: Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification, entered (Wilkins, J). | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Motion for clarification of court's ruling on February 12, 2020, FILED. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear for Final Pre-Trial Conference on 01/04/21 at 2:00 p.m. Sent On: 08/10/2020 14:02:24 Notice Sent To: Bruce Green, Esq. Attorney at Law 110 Airport Rd Rm 114, Westfield, MA 01085 Notice Sent To: Hussain A Hamdan, Esq. 10 West Hawley Rd, Hawley, MA 01339 | |
February 12, 2020 | |||
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (#9.0): No Action Taken No Action taken on Motion for Preliminary Injunction at the request of the parties (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A
Judge: Agostini, John |
|
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Defendant J. Rougeau Rehab Inc.'s Cross Motion) (#10.0): No Action Taken No Action taken on Motion for Preliminary Injunction at the request of the parties. (Agostini, J.) Judge: Agostini, Hon. John A Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant)
Judge: Agostini, John A |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | General correspondence regarding Letter received by fax from Attorney Hussain A. Hamdan concerning the Rule 9A packet filed by Attorney Green, received. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition to to plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed. filed by J Rougeau Rehab Incfiled. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition to to defendant's request for preliminary injunction, filed. filed by Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Supportfiled. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | The following form was generated: Notice to Appear 02/12/2020 at 2:00 p.m. for Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Cross Motion for Preliminary Injunction Sent On: 01/28/2020 12:50:46 | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Hussain A Hamdan, Esq.'s Memorandum in support of defendant J. Rougeau Rehab, Inc.'s cross motion for a preliminary injunction, filed. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Dodd Rougeau in relation to preliminary injunction, filed. Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Motion for preliminary injunction (copy of original motion #9 filed on 12/31/2019), filed. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Defendant J Rougeau Rehab Inc's Cross Motion for preliminary injunction, filed. Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Jacqueline Rougeau in relation to preliminary injunction, filed. Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Derek Rougeau in relation to preliminary injunction, filed. Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Affidavits and exhibits supporting defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction and defendants' cross motion for preliminary injunction, filed. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Opposition to to defendant's request for preliminary injunction, filed. filed by Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Supportfiled. Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Milazzo, Michael (Plaintiff) | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff(s) Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support, Michael Milazzo's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed. (Clerk called Atty. Green-told him no action will be taken on this motion; not filed as an emergency; not filed in accordance with rule 9A-also Asst. Clerk Denault spoke with opposing counsel who indicated that he has an opposition with a cross motion; he was advised to contact plaintiff's counsel so that this can be filed appropriately) Applies To: Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff); Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant) | |
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Received from Plaintiff Milazzo, Michael: Answer to the Counterclaim with request for jury trial; | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED on 9/14/2019 last and usual place of abode of Derek E. Rougeau, 27 Savoy Road RFD#2 North Adams, MA Applies To: Rougeau, Derek (Defendant) | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED on 9/14/2019 last and usual place of abode of Dodd Rougeau, 32 Miner Street, Apt 2 North Adams, MA Applies To: Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons, returned SERVED on 9/14/2019 last and usual place of abode of J. Rougeau Rehab, Inc, 27 Savoy Road RFD#2 North Adams, MA and by first class mail Applies To: J Rougeau Rehab Inc (Defendant); Green, Esq., Bruce (Attorney) on behalf of Brian Doyle Doing Business as Midnav Aircraft Support (Plaintiff) | |
October 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. as to counterclaim, filed. Applies To: Hamdan, Esq., Hussain A (Attorney) on behalf of J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Rougeau, Derek, Rougeau, Dodd (Defendant) | |
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Counterclaim filed. -- See paper #3 | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Hussain A Hamdan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Dodd Rougeau | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Hussain A Hamdan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Derek Rougeau | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Received from Defendant J Rougeau Rehab Inc, Derek Rougeau and Dodd Rougeau: Answer with a counterclaim; by their Attorney Hussain A. Hamdan, filed. | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Hussain A Hamdan, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant J Rougeau Rehab Inc | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Demand for jury trial entered. | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Original civil complaint filed. | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil action cover sheet filed. | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 09/11/2019 | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Bruce Green, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Michael Milazzo | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Bruce Green, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Brian Doyle |