Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gem Plumbing & Heating Services, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pompeo, Esq., Nicholas J, Stanganelli, Esq., Joseph L, Whiteley, Esq., Brian E, against Air Pros Ma, Llc, Hansen, Michael, Hansen, Thomas R., Neary, Paul, Roderick, Michael J., (total of 6) See All represented by Bardsley, Esq., Jeremy, Bhakhri, Esq., Ritika, Kenney, Esq., Christopher A, Leard, Esq., Michael, Zwillinger, Esq., Alexander Richard, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Norfolk County, MA, . Norfolk County, MA Superior Courts with Michael A. Uhlarik presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Business Cases |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNorfolk County, MA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is an action for fraud, unfair and deceptive business practices, conspiracy, breach of contract, and other related claims. The plaintiff, Gem Plumbing and Heating Services, LLC ("Gem"), is suing the defendants, Rusty's, Inc., Michael J...
Reply/Sur-reply -Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition (e-Filed 12/21/2023)
Date: December 22, 2023Defendant Thomas R. Hansen, Michael Hansen, Paul Neary's Notice of Filing (e-Filed 12/21/2023)
Date: December 22, 2023Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General
Date: October 05, 2023Original civil complaint filed.
Date: October 05, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: October 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE INTO THE BUSINESS LITIGATION SESSION: On the assented to motions of the parties and the order of the judge, this matter has been accepted into the Suffolk Business Litigation Session. It has been assigned to the Business Litigation Session 2 (Suffolk). Notice to participate in the BLS Discovery Pilot Project attached to notice. Also the Court will issue a Notice of Initial Rule 16 Conference for purposes of meeting with all counsel. Copies mailed 12/29/2023. Sallinger, J (Administrative Justice of the Business Litigation Session) (Dated: 12/29/2023) | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Note: Entire case sent to Business Litigation Session 2 on this date | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Case transferred to another court. | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Reply/Sur-reply -Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition (e-Filed 12/21/2023) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Opposition to P. 19.0 Defts.' Air Pros MA, LLC, Michael Hansen and Paul Neary's Motion to Stay Discovery pending the Decision on their Motion to Dismiss-OPPOSITION filed by Gem Plumbing & Heating Services, LLC(e-Filed 12/21/2023) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Thomas R. Hansen, Michael Hansen, Paul Neary's Notice of Filing (e-Filed 12/21/2023) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Air Pros MA, LLC, Thomas R. Hansen, Paul Neary's Memorandum in support of their Motion to Stay Discovery pending the Decision on their Motion to Dismiss (e-Filed 12/21/2023) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Air Pros MA, LLC, Michael Hansen, Paul Neary's Motion to Stay Discovery pending Motion to Dismiss (e-Filed 12/21/2023) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant Air Pros MA, LLC, Michael Hansen, Paul Neary's Certificate of Rule 9C (e-Filed 12/21/2023) | |
December 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion to transfer case to Business Litigation session. (#13.0): ALLOWED (dated 12/20/2023) ns ni Judge: Cahillane, Hon. Michael A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.