Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago
Lebaron, Sara Jean, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Welsh, Esq., Brian F, against The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, Llc, represented by Cohen, Esq., Adam G, in the jurisdiction of Worcester County, MA, . Worcester County, MA Superior Courts with Daniel M Lebaron presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedMay 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWorcester County, MA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
This complaint was filed by Sara Jean LeBaron against The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC. Sara Jean LeBaron is the plaintiff, residing in Fitchburg, Worcester County, Massachusetts. The defendant, The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, LLC, is a ...
Defendant's Affidavit of Compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A (E-FILED)
Date: December 18, 2023Exhibits/Appendix Index (JOINT) (E-FILED)
Date: December 18, 2023Defendant The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, Llc's Notice of Filing (E-FILED)
Date: December 18, 2023Affidavit of Compliance with Superior Court Rule 9C (E-FILED)
Date: December 18, 2023Civil action cover sheet filed.
Date: September 22, 2022Complaint electronically filed.
Date: September 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | Endorsement on Motion for summary judgment (#7.0): DENIED after hearing. Taking the evidence in the light most favorable to the plaintiff, there is a disputed issue of material fact Notices Sent 4/3/24 Judge: Wrenn, Hon. Daniel M | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled on: 03/28/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Held as Scheduled Comments: FTR 2:20 PM Hon. Daniel M Wrenn, Presiding Staff: Gregory Benoit, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Wrenn, Daniel M |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled on: 03/28/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Transferred to another session Hon. Janet Kenton-Walker, Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Rule 56 Hearing scheduled on: 02/22/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Comments: judge not available Hon. Janet Kenton-Walker, Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
The Superior Court Lebaron, Sara Jean |
|
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Event Result:: Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on: 02/15/2024 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: By Court prior to date Hon. Janet Kenton-Walker, Presiding Staff: Cheryl Riddle, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
Judge: Kenton-Walker, Janet |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant's Affidavit of Compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A (E-FILED) | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibits/Appendix Index (JOINT) (E-FILED) | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, Llc's Notice of Filing (E-FILED) | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Defendant The Stop & Shop Supermarket Company, Llc's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts Pursuant to Superior Court Rule 9A(b)(5) (E-FILED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.