Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
22-047888-CZ
A General Civil case was filed by Stone Street Originations Llc, represented by Grand, Joel E., in the jurisdiction of Saginaw County, MI. Judge Andre R. Borrello presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 12, 2022
Last Refreshed
October 01, 2022
Filing Location
Saginaw County, MI
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION
Judge: Borrello, Andre R. |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT LIST | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION
Judge: Borrello, Andre R. |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OF HEARING | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL INFORMATION | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ADDITIONAL INFORMATION | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FILED WITH CIRCUIT COURT |