Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF MICHIGAN vs. LAUREN MORGAN ELIZABETH GROGAN-LOVETT
A Statute Misdemeanor Criminal case was filed against Grogan-Lovett, Lauren Morgan Elizabeth, represented by Gust, James F., in the jurisdiction of Saginaw County, MI. Judge Fichtner, Elian E.H. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 23, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 28, 2024
Filing Location
Saginaw County, MI
Category
Statute Misdemeanor Criminal
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
General Criminal
Status
Non-Jury Verdict
Parties
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing with Remote Participation BENCH TRIAL WITHOUT WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL |
|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing with Remote Participation BENCH TRIAL WITHOUT WAIVER OF JURY TRIAL |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | FILE SENT TO COURTROOM FOR ARRAIGNMENT | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNED ON BENCH WARRANT | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
BOND CONDITION ISSUED - IN LEIN NO CONTACT W/ VICTORIA JANELLE GROGAN-LOVETT |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | REPRESENTED BY RETAINED COUNSEL AT ARRAIGNMENT | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
MITTIMUS 3000 PR, P/NG, W/ATTY J GUST, SFBT, NO CONTACT W/ VICTORIA JANELLE GROGAN-LOVETT |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
WARRANT CANCELLED IN LEIN BY COURT SYSID #49735189 |
|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | WARRANT CANCELLED | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
WARRANT ENTERED INTO LEIN SYSI #49735189 |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ACTIVE WARRANT | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT - FILED | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | PROTECTED PERSONAL IDENTIFYING INFO-CONFIDENTIAL | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | WARRANT ISSUED |